Mandeville City v. Purdue Pharma LP, et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45753 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Aug 30, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Louisiana Eastern, 2:19-cv-11726 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:18 PM EST |
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Morris & Dickson Co LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreen Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan Sales, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Elizabeth LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Kadian LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis South Atlantic LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Totowa LLC
874 Walker Road, Suite C
Dover, DE 19904 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Indivior Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Mandeville City
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/04/2019 2:33 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 17, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 22nd Judicial District Court, St. Tammany Parish, case number 19-12787 D (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7758366) filed by McKesson Corporation.Attorney Stacey Denise Williams added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft).(Williams, Stacey) Modified text on 7/18/2019 (mm). [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.] | |
Att: 1 223 pgs Exhibit State Court Pleadings, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Insys Therapeutics, Inc. bankruptcy pleading, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Insys Therapeutics, Inc. bankrputcy pleading, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Collateral Proceedings by McKesson Corporation . (Williams, Stacey) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.] | |
4 | 4 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by McKesson Corporation (Williams, Stacey) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.] | |
Thursday, July 18, 2019 | ||
5 | 5 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re:1 Notice of Removal filed by McKesson Corporation. By the Clerk. (mm) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.] | |
6 | 6 SUPPLEMENTAL Notice of Removal by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP .(Simon, Paul) Modified text on 7/18/2019 (mm). [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
Monday, July 22, 2019 | ||
7 | 7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by CVS Health Corporation (Flanagan, Thomas) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.] | |
Tuesday, July 23, 2019 | ||
8 | 8 NOTICE by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation of Deadline to Respond to Complaint per State Court Order .(Williams, Stacey) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
9 | 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re8 Notice (Other). **Document contains incorrect Section. All future pleadings must reflect Section R Judge Sarah S. Vance.** (mm) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.] | |
Wednesday, July 24, 2019 | ||
10 | 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond re1 Notice of Removal by Walmart, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreen Company, CVS Health Corporation(Knight, Kathryn) Modified linkage/filers on 7/24/2019 (mm). [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
11 | 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. **1. Filing attorney did not enter additional filer(s) in the blank text box on the docket text screen. Clerk added filer(s). 2. Filing attorney should have linked document to Document 1. Clerk properly linked document.** (mm) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.] | |
Thursday, July 25, 2019 | ||
12 | 12 ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond re1 Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/25/2019. (mm) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.] | |
13 | 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond re1 Notice of Removal by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation.(Williams, Stacey) Modified text on 7/25/2019 (mm). [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
14 | 14 ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to move, answer or otherwise respond re1 Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/25/2019. (mm) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.] | |
Friday, July 26, 2019 | ||
15 | 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Mandeville City. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/6/2019.(Leger, Walter) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Submission, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
16 | 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Notice of Removal,, or Otherwise File Responsive Pleadings as to Joining Manufacturing Defendants by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Rookard, Kelly) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, July 29, 2019 | ||
17 | 17 ORDER GRANTING16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Notice of Removal, and that the joining Manufacturing Defendants1 be and hereby are granted a twenty-one (21) day extension of time to file a responsive pleading after a decision by the JPML regarding transfer of this matter to the MDL. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/29/2019. (jeg) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.] | |
Wednesday, July 31, 2019 | ||
18 | 18 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond re1 Notice of Removal by Mallinckrodt, LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, Specgx LLC.(Rosenberg, Harry) Modified text on 8/1/2019 (mm). [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 01, 2019 | ||
19 | 19 ORDER granting18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or otherwise Respond to the Petition re1 Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 8/1/2019. (mm) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.] | |
20 | 20 Notice of Compliance by McKesson Corporation re1 Notice of Removal.(Williams, Stacey) Modified linkage on 8/8/2019 (mm). [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
Thursday, August 08, 2019 | ||
21 | 21 ORDER: As stated herein, IT IS ORDERED that all proceedings in this case are hereby stayed pending the decision of the Multidistrict Litigation Panel regarding transfer. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 8/8/2019.(mm) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.] | |
22 | 22 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re20 Notice of Compliance. **Filing attorney should have linked document to Document 1. Clerk properly linked document.** (mm) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.] | |
Friday, August 23, 2019 | ||
23 | 23 Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2804. (mm) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.] | |
Monday, August 26, 2019 | ||
24 | 24 Order of MDL Transfer to District of Ohio Northern. MDL case number is 2804. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent.(jeg) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Transmittal Letter | ||
Friday, August 30, 2019 | ||
25 | 25 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Louisiana Eastern. Case number 2:19-cv-11726. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |