Board of County Commissioners for Kiowa County v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45755 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Aug 30, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Oklahoma Western, 5:19-cv-00730 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:18 PM EST |
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Keysource Medical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Morris & Dickson Co LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Physicians Total Care Inc
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, The
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceutcals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Lynn Webster
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis plc
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Amerisourcebergen Drug Coropration
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Anda Inc
|
|
Defendant
Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Perry Fine
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
GCP Pharma LLC
|
|
Defendant
Harvard Drug Group LLC The
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Board of County Commissioners for Kiowa County
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/04/2019 3:07 PM EDT |
Monday, August 12, 2019 | ||
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2976062. (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 8/30/2019.] | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Kiowa County, case number CJ-19-9 filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.(kmt) [Transferred from okwd on 8/30/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 001 - Service documents, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 002 - State-Court Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 003 - Summons to Actavis Pharma Inc, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 004 - Summons to Actavis LLC, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 005 - Summons to Actavis PLC, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 006 - Summons to Allergan PLC, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 007 - Summons to Amerisource Bergen, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 008 - Summons to Anda Pharmaceuticals, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 009 - Summons to Anda Inc, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 010 - Summons to Walgreens, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 011 - Summons to Watson Pharmaceuticals, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 012 - Summons to Watson Pharma, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 013 - Summons to Watson Laboratories, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 014 - Summons to Walgreens, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 015 - Summons to Purdue Frederick, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 016 - Summons to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 017 - Summons to Quest, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 018 - Summons to Purdue Pharma, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit 019 - Summons to Physicians Total Care, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit 020 - Summons to Perry Fine MD, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit 021 - Summons to McKesson, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit 022 - Summons to Cardinal Health, | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit 023 - Summons to Oklahoma CVS, | ||
Att: 24 Exhibit 024 - Summons to Cephalon, | ||
Att: 25 Exhibit 025 - Summons to Harvard Drug, | ||
Att: 26 Exhibit 026 - Summons to Teva Pharmaceutical Industires, | ||
Att: 27 Exhibit 027 - Summons to Physicians Total Care, | ||
Att: 28 Exhibit 028 - Summons to Purdue Pharma LP, | ||
Att: 29 Exhibit 029 - Summons to Ortho-McNeil-Janssen, | ||
Att: 30 Exhibit 030 - Summons to Mallinckrodt PLC, | ||
Att: 31 Exhibit 031 - Summons to Mallinckrodt LLC, | ||
Att: 32 Exhibit 032 - Summons to Lynn Webster MD, | ||
Att: 33 Exhibit 033 - Summons to Keysource Medical, | ||
Att: 34 Exhibit 034 - Summons to Janssen Pharmaceutica, | ||
Att: 35 Exhibit 035 - Summons to Insys Therapeutics, | ||
Att: 36 Exhibit 036 - Summons to Janssen Pharmaceuticals, | ||
Att: 37 Exhibit 037 - Summons to Johnson & Johnson, | ||
Att: 38 Exhibit 038 - Summons to Physicians Total Care, | ||
Att: 39 Exhibit 039 - Summons to GCP Pharma, | ||
Att: 40 Exhibit 040 - Summons to Endo Pharmaceuticals, | ||
Att: 41 Exhibit 041 - Summons to Morris & Dickson, | ||
Att: 42 Exhibit 042 - Summons to Endo Health, | ||
Att: 43 Exhibit 043 - Summons to CVS Pharmacy, | ||
Att: 44 Exhibit 044 - Summons to CVS Health, | ||
Att: 45 Exhibit 045 - Petition, | ||
Att: 46 Exhibit 046 - Entry of Appearance by McKesson, | ||
Att: 47 Exhibit 047 - Unopposed Motion and Special Appearance by McKesson et al, | ||
Att: 48 Exhibit 048 - Entry of Appearance by Cardinal, | ||
Att: 49 Exhibit 049 - Entry of Appearance by Harvard, | ||
Att: 50 Exhibit 050 - Entry of Appearance by Quest, | ||
Att: 51 Exhibit 051 - Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by Quest, | ||
Att: 52 Exhibit 052 - Entry of Appearance by AmerisourceBergen, | ||
Att: 53 Exhibit 053 - Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by CVS, | ||
Att: 54 Exhibit 054 - Order Granting McKesson's Motion for Enlargement of Time, | ||
Att: 55 Exhibit 055 - Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by Anda, | ||
Att: 56 Exhibit 056 - Entry of Appearance by Anda, | ||
Att: 57 Exhibit 057 - Order Granting Quest's Motion for Enlargement of Time, | ||
Att: 58 Exhibit 058 - Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time by Manufacturer Defendants, | ||
Att: 59 Exhibit 059 - Order Granting CVS's Motion for Enlargement of Time, | ||
Att: 60 Exhibit 060 - Order Granting Anda's Motion for Enlargement of Time, | ||
Att: 61 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond E Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 8/30/2019.] | |
3 | 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 8/30/2019.] | |
4 | 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Health Solutions Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 8/30/2019.] | |
Tuesday, August 13, 2019 | ||
5 | 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from okwd on 8/30/2019.] | |
6 | 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Harvard Drug Group LLC The (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from okwd on 8/30/2019.] | |
7 | 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cardinal Health Inc . (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from okwd on 8/30/2019.] | |
8 | 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Harvard Drug Group LLC The . (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from okwd on 8/30/2019.] | |
Wednesday, August 14, 2019 | ||
9 | 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp (Huntsman, Susan) [Transferred from okwd on 8/30/2019.] | |
10 | 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp . (Huntsman, Susan) [Transferred from okwd on 8/30/2019.] | |
11 | 11 ENTRY of Appearance by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp (McBride, D) [Transferred from okwd on 8/30/2019.] | |
12 | 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert G McCampbell on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (McCampbell, Robert) [Transferred from okwd on 8/30/2019.] | |
13 | 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas V Merkley on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (Merkley, Nicholas) [Transferred from okwd on 8/30/2019.] | |
14 | 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc . (Merkley, Nicholas) [Transferred from okwd on 8/30/2019.] | |
Thursday, August 15, 2019 | ||
15 | 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Stuart D Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 8/30/2019.] | |
16 | 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by McKesson Corp . (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 8/30/2019.] | |
17 | 17 SUPPLEMENT Notice of Removal by McKesson Corp.(Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 8/30/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Docket, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Summonses, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Appearance (Cardinal), | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Appearance (Harvard), | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Appearance (McKesson), | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Unopposed Motion & Appearance (McKesson), | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - Appearance (ABDC), | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - Appearance (Quest), | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - Motion for Enlargement (Quest), | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - Unopposed Motion & Appearance (CVS), | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 - Order Granting Motion (McKesson), | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 13 - Appearance (Anda), | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 14 - Motion for Enlargement (Anda), | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 15 - Order Granting Motion (Quest), | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 16 - Motion for Extension (MFs), | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 17 - Order Granting Motion (Anda), | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 18 - Order Granting Motion (CVS), | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit 19 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit 20 - LCvR7.1 | ||
Monday, August 19, 2019 | ||
18 | 18 ENTRY of Appearance by D Todd Riddles on behalf of Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc (Riddles, D) [Transferred from okwd on 8/30/2019.] | |
19 | 19 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Riddles, D) [Transferred from okwd on 8/30/2019.] | |
20 | 20 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Riddles, D) [Transferred from okwd on 8/30/2019.] | |
21 | 21 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 8/30/2019.] | |
Tuesday, August 20, 2019 | ||
22 | 22 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 8/30/2019.] | |
23 | 23 ENTRY of Appearance by Sanford C Coats on behalf of The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP (Coats, Sanford) [Transferred from okwd on 8/30/2019.] | |
24 | 24 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Purdue Pharma LP . (Coats, Sanford) [Transferred from okwd on 8/30/2019.] | |
25 | 25 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Purdue Pharma Inc . (Coats, Sanford) [Transferred from okwd on 8/30/2019.] | |
26 | 26 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by The Purdue Frederick Company . (Coats, Sanford) [Transferred from okwd on 8/30/2019.] | |
27 | 27 ENTRY of Appearance by Evan H Way on behalf of The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP (Way, Evan) [Transferred from okwd on 8/30/2019.] | |
Thursday, August 22, 2019 | ||
28 | 28 ORDER granting21 Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings,20 Defendant Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12, and22 Defendants McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., The Harvard Drug Group, LLC, and AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation's Unopposed Joint Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 (as more fully set out) re20 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 filed by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, Courtesy Copy Received,21 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Motions terminated:22 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 filed by Harvard Drug Group LLC The, Cardinal Health Inc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, McKesson Corp,21 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc,20 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 filed by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 8/22/2019. (ks) [Transferred from okwd on 8/30/2019.] | |
Wednesday, August 28, 2019 | ||
29 | 29 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to the Northern District of Ohio for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. Signed by Clerk of the Panel. (kmt) [Transferred from okwd on 8/30/2019.] | |
Friday, August 30, 2019 | ||
30 | 30 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Oklahoma Western. Case number 5:19-cv-00730. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |