Bertie County v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45759 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 30, 2019 |
Case in other court: | North Carolina Eastern, 2:19-cv-00025 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:19 PM EST |
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Bertie County
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/04/2019 3:20 PM EDT |
Saturday, August 03, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 166 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5047741.), filed by Bertie County. (Seagle, J.) [Transferred from nced on 8/30/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit CIVIL COVERSHEET ADDENDUM | ||
Wednesday, August 07, 2019 | ||
Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a notice of appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from nced on 8/30/2019.] | ||
Notice to Counsel - No summons provided for issuance or waiver of service filed. (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from nced on 8/30/2019.] | ||
Thursday, August 22, 2019 | ||
2 | 2 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-107) - This case is transferred under 28 U.S.C. § 1407 to the Northern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the order of December 5, 2017, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Stouch, L.) [Transferred from nced on 8/30/2019.] | |
Friday, August 30, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of North Carolina Eastern. Case number 2:19-cv-00025. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |