Fouts et al v. Becerra
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Roger T Benitez |
Referred: | Jill L Burkhardt |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-01662 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 42:1983bv Bivens Non-Prisoner |
Case Filed: | Sep 01, 2019 |
Re-opened: | Oct 17, 2022 |
Terminated: | Feb 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Feb 28, 2020 12:28 AM PST |
Defendant
Xavier Becerra
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Russell Fouts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tan Miguel Tolentino
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
93 | 93
appeal
Transcript Designation and Ordering Form
Wed 03/27 11:51 AM
TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM by Rob Bonta for proceedings held on 12/12/2022 re88 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit,. (Echeverria, John) (dim) |