Connecticut District Court
Judge:Jeffrey A Meyer
Case #: 3:19-cv-01367
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter
Case Filed:Sep 04, 2019
Terminated:Oct 03, 2019
Case in other court:Bankruptcy Court, 14-51720
Last checked: Monday Mar 02, 2020 4:14 AM EST
Appellant
O.W. Bunker USA Inc Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Natalie D. Ramsey
Montgomery, Mccracken, Walker & Rhoads - PA
contact info
Davis Lee Wright
Robinson & Cole LLP
contact info
Michael R. Enright
Robinson & Cole, Llp-Htfd
contact info
Patrick M. Birney
Robinson & Cole, Llp-Htfd
contact info
Appellee
Dolphin Marine Fuels LLC
Represented By
J. Stephen Simms
Simms Showers LLP
contact info
Bankruptcy Notice
Judge Julie A. Manning
In Re
O.W. Bunker Holding North America Inc.
In Re
O.W. Bunker North America, Inc
In Re
O.W. Bunker USA Inc.
Notice
US Trustee
U.S. Trustee Office 150 Court St., Room 302
New Haven, CT 06510
Represented By
US Trustee
U.S. Trustee Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, October 03, 2019
notice Judicial Evaluation Program Survey Thu 10/03 2:18 PM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Freberg, B)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2019
5 5 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 10/02 10:04 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Appeal Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8023 by O.W. Bunker Holding North America Inc., O.W. Bunker North America, Inc, O.W. Bunker USA Inc Liquidating Trust, O.W. Bunker USA Inc.. (Wright, Davis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2019
4 4 order Protective Order Wed 09/04 12:17 PM
Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 09/04/2019.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Electronic Filing Order Wed 09/04 12:16 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 09/04/2019.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Bankruptcy Transmittal Form Wed 09/04 12:15 PM
USBC Transmittal Form (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
1 1 appeal Bankruptcy Appeal Wed 09/04 12:12 PM
Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number(s) 14-51720 filed by O.W. Bunker USA Inc Liquidating Trust.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order # 1685,
Att: 2 Memorandum of Decision