New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Joanna Seybert
Referred: Gary R Brown
Case #: 2:19-cv-05031
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Sep 04, 2019
Terminated:Dec 09, 2019
Last checked: Monday Mar 02, 2020 5:11 AM EST
Counter Claimant
Jay L. Yackow
Represented By
Jay L. Yackow
Jay L. Yackow, Attorney At Law
contact info
Counter Defendant
Jason Tenenbaum
Represented By
Jason Tenenbaum
The Law Office Of Jason Tenenbaum, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Jay L. Yackow
Represented By
Jay L. Yackow
Jay L. Yackow, Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Jason Tenenbaum
130 Post Ave Apt 423
Westbury, NY 11530
Represented By
Jason Tenenbaum
The Law Office Of Jason Tenenbaum, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, December 09, 2019
10 10 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 12/09 1:35 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE re9 stipulation of discontinuance. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mark this case CLOSED. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 12/9/2019. (Coleman, Laurie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2019
9 9 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 11/13 12:22 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by Jason Tenenbaum (Tenenbaum, Jason)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Scheduling Order Wed 11/13 12:18 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 12/12/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 840 before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. See order for instructions.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 11/13/2019. (McMorrow, Karen)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2019
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Fri 10/11 2:51 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Jason Tenenbaum by Jay L. Yackow. (Yackow, Jay)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2019
order Status Report Order Thu 10/10 3:26 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER : A written Status Report is due by 11/11/2019.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 10/10/2019. (McMorrow, Karen)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2019
6 6 misc Affidavit/Affirmation Fri 09/13 3:16 PM
AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE by Jason Tenenbaum (Tenenbaum, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2019
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 09/04 4:48 PM
Summons Issued as to Jay L. Yackow. (Rodin, Deanna)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Wed 09/04 4:46 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Wed 09/04 4:41 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Wed 09/04 4:34 PM
Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. by Jason Tenenbaum (Tenenbaum, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/04 4:32 PM
COMPLAINT against Jay L. Yackow filing fee $ 400, receipt number BNYEDC-11816710 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Jason Tenenbaum. (Tenenbaum, Jason)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 09/04 4:45 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
Related: [-]