Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Michael L Brown
Case #: 1:19-cv-03609
Nature of Suit443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations
Cause42:3601 Fair Housing Act
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2019
Terminated:Jun 03, 2020
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 04, 2020 3:54 AM EST
Defendant
Carrington Bevier
Defendant
Collin Bevier
Defendant
Myers Boicout
Defendant
Andrew Bright
Defendant
Blake Cardwell
Represented By
Karen Eleice Woodward
Cruser Mitchell Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Does 1-5
Defendant
Hanover Buckhead Village Master Condominum Association, Inc.
Represented By
Karen Eleice Woodward
Cruser Mitchell Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Andrew B. Najjar
Defendant
Pbone Terminus, LLC
Defendant
Unknown Tenants/Occupants of Unit 1316 at Berkshire Terminus
Defendant
Unknown Tenants/Occupants of Unit 1414 at Berkshire Terminus
Plaintiff
Ian Anthony Medina
7433 Loch Ness Dr
Miami Lakes, FL 33014


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, June 12, 2020
30 30 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 06/12 1:04 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff Ian Anthony Medina moves to dismiss this case against all Defendants. (Dkt. 29.) The Court, however, already dismissed this matter for Plaintiffs failure to comply with a lawful order of the Court. (Dkt.26 .) Accordingly, the Court DENIES AS MOOT Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss (Dkt.29 ). Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 6/12/2020. (jta)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 06/12 1:05 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ian Anthony Medina re30 Order on Motion to Dismiss. (jta)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 08, 2020
29 29 motion Dismiss Tue 06/09 12:11 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Ian Anthony Medina. (bjh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 03, 2020
27 27 misc Judgment - Clerk Wed 06/03 1:16 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing w/out prejudice for failure to comply with a lawful order of the Court. (bjh)
Related: [-]
26 26 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 06/03 1:01 PM
ORDER: the Court DISMISSES this case without prejudice for failure to comply with a lawful order of the Court. See LR 41.3(A)(2), NDGa. The Court DENIES AS MOOT Defendants' Motion to Dismiss11 and Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Stay17 . Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 6/3/20. (bjh)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 06/03 1:17 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ian Anthony Medina re26 Order,27 Clerk's Judgment. (bjh)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 06/03 1:19 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (bjh)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 01, 2020
28 28 misc Mail Returned Wed 06/03 2:24 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Plaintiff re23 Notice. (bjh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 27, 2020
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/27 10:49 AM
THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 05/27 3:11 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ian Anthony Medina re24 Notice. (bjh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 26, 2020
25 25 misc Mail Returned Wed 05/27 2:09 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Plaintiff re22 Order. (bjh)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 18, 2020
utility Submission to District Judge Mon 05/18 10:30 AM
Submission of22 Order Directing Plaintiff to pay the full filing fee of $400.00 to the Clerk of Court no later than May 13, 2020, to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (bjh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 05, 2020
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 05/05 2:34 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ian Anthony Medina re23 Notice. (bjh)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 04, 2020
23 23 notice Notice (Other) Mon 05/04 1:27 PM
SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (adg) (ADI)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 15, 2020
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 04/15 8:00 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ian Anthony Medina re22 Order. (bjh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 14, 2020
22 22 3 pgs order Order on Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Report and Recommendation Wed 04/15 7:56 AM
ORDER : The Court OVERRULES Plaintiff's Objections7 , ADOPTS the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation3 , and DENIES Plaintiff's Motions to Proceed In Forma Pauperis [1;7]. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to pay the full filing fee of $400.00 to the Clerk of Court no later than May 13, 2020. Failure to comply with this order may lead to the dismissal of this action. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to submit this matter after May 13, 2020. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 4/14/20. (bjh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 02, 2020
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/02 9:32 AM
Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (aaq) (ADI)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/02 4:18 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ian Anthony Medina re21 Notice. (bjh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 25, 2020
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 03/25 3:15 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ian Anthony Medina re20 Order. (bjh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 24, 2020
20 20 4 pgs order Order Tue 03/24 10:58 AM
General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/20. (bjh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 10, 2020
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 03/10 2:31 PM
Submission of17 MOTION Lift Stay, to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (bjh)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2020
19 19 respm Response to Motion Fri 02/21 12:27 PM
RESPONSE re17 MOTION Lift Stay filed by Blake Cardwell, Hanover Buckhead Village Master Condominum Association, Inc.. (Woodward, Karen)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Leave of Absence Fri 02/21 12:15 PM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): March 9 through and including March 17, April 14 through and including April 28, and May 6, 2020, by Karen Eleice Woodward. (Woodward, Karen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2020
17 17 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 02/14 9:13 AM
MOTION Lift Stay by Ian Anthony Medina. (bjh)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2019
utility Submission to District Judge Fri 10/18 9:19 AM
Submission of11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint , to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (bjh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2019
16 16 respm Reply Brief Thu 10/17 11:27 AM
REPLY BRIEF re11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Blake Cardwell, Hanover Buckhead Village Master Condominum Association, Inc.. (Woodward, Karen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2019
15 15 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 10/07 2:10 PM
BRIEF in Opposition re11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Ian Anthony Medina. (bjh)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Change of Pro Se Address Mon 10/07 2:07 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Ian Anthony Medina: 7443 Loch Ness Dr, Miami Lakes, FL 33014. (bjh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2019
order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 09/25 12:20 PM
MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only). The Court GRANTS Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery12 . Discovery will begin after the Court has ruled on Defendants Motion to Dismiss11 . Ordered by District Judge Michael L. Brown on 9/25/19. (mlb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 09/25 12:22 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Ian Anthony Medina as to Hanover Buckhead Village Master Condominum Association, Inc. regarding Order on Motion to Stay. (mlb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2019
13 13 misc Certificate of Interested Persons Tue 09/24 3:10 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Hanover Buckhead Village Master Condominum Association, Inc.. (Woodward, Karen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2019
12 12 motion Stay Thu 09/19 9:01 AM
MOTION to Stay Discovery and Other Proceedings with Brief In Support by Blake Cardwell, Hanover Buckhead Village Master Condominum Association, Inc..(Woodward, Karen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief
Wednesday, September 18, 2019
11 11 motion Dismiss Wed 09/18 4:07 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by Blake Cardwell, Hanover Buckhead Village Master Condominum Association, Inc..(Woodward, Karen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief
Tuesday, September 17, 2019
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 09/17 11:07 AM
Submission of7 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (bjh)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2019
10 10 13 pgs order Order Mon 09/16 7:50 AM
STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/2018. (bgt)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 09/16 7:50 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ian Anthony Medina re10 Standing Order. (bgt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2019
9 9 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Case Unsealed Wed 09/04 11:05 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff responded that he does not object to the seal of this matter being lifted. (Dkts.5 ,6 .) The Court thus LIFTS the seal on this case. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 9/4/19. (bjh)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 09/04 11:07 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ian Anthony Medina re9 Order. (bjh)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Wed 09/04 3:35 PM
Submission of3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ian Anthony Medina, to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (bjh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2019
8 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Carrington Bevier, Collin Bevier, Myers Boicout, Andrew Bright, Blake Cardwell, Does 1-5, Hanover Buckhead Village Master Condominum Association, Inc., Andrew B. Najjar, Pbone Terminus, LLC, Unknown Tenants/Occupants of Unit 1316 at Berkshire Terminus, Unknown Tenants/Occupants of Unit 1414 at Berkshire Terminuswith Jury Demand filed by Ian Anthony Medina.(dob) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
Related: [-]
7 7 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ian Anthony Medina. (dob)
Related: [-]
6 6 STIPULATION to Lift Seal by Ian Anthony Medina. (dob)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2019
5 5 ORDER: The Court ORDERS Plaintiff Ian Anthony Medina to file, on or before August 30, 2019, his motion to maintain this matter under seal. If Plaintiff does not file his motion by this date, the Court may lift the seal of this matter. The Court further ORDERS Plaintiff to file, on or before August 30, 2019, an Amended Complaint that redacts the private information protected by Rule 5.2(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Court may sanction Plaintiff, including dismissing this matter, if he fails to comply with this order. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to submit this matter after August 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/16/19. (bjh)
Related: [-]
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ian Anthony Medina re3 Non-Final REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (bjh)
Related: [-]
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ian Anthony Medina re5 Order. (bjh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2019
4 4 ORDER for Service of3 Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 8/15/19. (bjh)
Related: [-]
3 3 Non-Final REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ian Anthony Medina. The Court RECOMMENDS that Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis,1 be DENIED. If the District Court adopts this recommendation, the undersigned FURTHER RECOMMENDS that Plaintiff be advised that he must, within 28 days of the District Court's adoption of the undersigned's recommendation, pay the filing fees to the Clerk of Court if he wishes to proceed with this action; otherwise this action will be dismissed and any future filing may be untimely. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 8/15/19. (bjh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2019
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (eop)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2019
2 2 NOTICE of Manual Filing Under Seal by Ian Anthony Medina. (eop)
Related: [-]
1 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Ian Anthony Medina.(eop)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Proposed Summon(s)