Florida Southern District Court
Judge:James Lawrence King
Referred: Jacqueline Becerra
Case #: 1:19-cv-23693
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause42:0416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Case Filed:Sep 05, 2019
Terminated:Sep 29, 2020
Defendant
Commissioner of Social Security
Defendant
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable
Plaintiff
Javier Delgado
Plaintiff
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable

GPO Aug 26 2020
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 12 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment with Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Javier Delgado, 16 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment with Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Commissioner of Social Security; Recommending that Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment be Denied and that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment be Granted. Objections to R&R due by 9/9/2020 Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra on 8/26/2020. See attached document for full details. (nco)
GPO Sep 29 2020
ORDER Granting Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 9/29/2020. See attached document for full details. (jw)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, February 22, 2022
32 32 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Tue 02/22 10:43 AM
ORDER Granting31 Unopposed Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 2/22/2022. See attached document for full details. (jw)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 18, 2022
31 31 motion Attorney Fees Fri 02/18 11:04 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Attorney Fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act by Javier Delgado. Responses due by 3/4/2022(Palacios-Moreno, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Assignment of Fees
Thursday, November 04, 2021
30 30 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Thu 11/04 2:17 PM
ORDER on the Mandate. The Court's Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgement (DE 23) and Order of Final Judgment (DE 24) be, and the same hereby are, VACATED and set aside; the Opinion and Judgment of the appellate court shall become the law of the case; Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) of the Social Security Act, this case is REMANDED to the Commissioner of Social Security for proceedings consistent with the Eleventh Circuit Opinion (DE29 ). Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 11/4/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 02, 2021
29 29 appeal USCA Mandate Tue 11/02 11:57 AM
MANDATE of USCA (certified copy). We VACATE the judgment of the district court and REMAND to the district court with instructions to return the case to the Commissioner for further proceedings consistent with this opinion. Specifically, in determining Delgado's RFC, the Commissioner must reconsider the weight accorded to the opinion of Dr. Rodriguez-Moran and Dr. Del Rio as well as Delgado's subjective complaints re25 Notice of Appeal, filed by Javier Delgado; Date Issued: 11/2/2021; USCA Case Number: 20-14234 AA. (apz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 21, 2021
28 28 appeal Electronic Availability of ROA Thu 01/21 3:22 PM
Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Southern District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re:25 Notice of Appeal, Appeal No. 20-14234 AA. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (apz)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 13, 2020
27 27 appeal Acknowledgment of Receipt from USCA Fri 11/13 11:36 AM
Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re25 Notice of Appeal, filed by Javier Delgado. Date received by USCA: 11/10/2020. USCA Case Number: 20-14234 AA. (apz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 10, 2020
appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Tue 11/10 10:30 AM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re25 Notice of Appeal. Notice has been electronically mailed. (hh)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 08, 2020
26 26 appeal Transcript Information Form - Attorney Sun 11/08 9:14 PM
TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Javier Delgado re25 Notice of Appeal,. No Transcript Requested. (Palacios-Paredes, Katherine)
Related: [-]
25 25 appeal Notice of Appeal Sun 11/08 9:12 PM
Notice of Appeal as to24 Judgment by Javier Delgado. Filing fee $ 505.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13830924. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Palacios-Paredes, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 01, 2020
24 24 order Judgment Thu 10/01 8:37 AM
ORDER OF FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 9/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (jw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 29, 2020
23 23 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Report and Recommendations Tue 09/29 2:30 PM
ORDER Granting Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 9/29/2020. See attached document for full details. (jw)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2020
22 22 respoth Response to Objection to Report and Recommendations Mon 09/21 3:30 PM
RESPONSE TO OBJECTION to20 Report and Recommendations by Commissioner of Social Security. (Fidler, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 07, 2020
21 21 respoth Objections to Report and Recommendations Mon 09/07 5:24 PM
OBJECTIONS to20 Report and Recommendations by Javier Delgado. (Palacios-Paredes, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 26, 2020
20 20 motion Report and Recommendations Wed 08/26 11:58 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re12 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment with Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Javier Delgado,16 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment with Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Commissioner of Social Security; Recommending that Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment be Denied and that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment be Granted. Objections to R&R due by 9/9/2020 Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra on 8/26/2020. See attached document for full details. (nco)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 13, 2020
19 19 minutes Status Conference Thu 08/13 11:49 AM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra: Telephonic Oral Argument held on 8/13/2020. Order to follow. Attorney Appearance(s): Stephanie I. R. Fidler, Katherine Olivia Palacios-Paredes, Richard Blake. (Digital JB_01_8 13-2020 (dgj)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 08, 2020
18 18 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Sat 08/08 8:49 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re16 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment with Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Javier Delgado. Replies due by 8/17/2020. (Palacios-Paredes, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 06, 2020
17 17 respm Response to Motion Thu 08/06 3:26 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re12 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment with Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Commissioner of Social Security. Replies due by 8/13/2020. (Fidler, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Summary Judgment Thu 08/06 3:25 PM
Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment with Supporting Memorandum of Law by Commissioner of Social Security. Responses due by 8/20/2020 (Fidler, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2020
15 15 order Order Setting/Cancelling Hearing Wed 08/05 4:19 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE is set for a Telephonic Oral Argument on 8/13/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra (USA Toll-Free Number: 866-390-1828; Access Code: 2046890). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra on 8/5/2020. (dgj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 08, 2020
14 14 minutes Status Conference Wed 07/08 8:47 AM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra: Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/8/2020. Attorney Appearance(s): Stephanie I. R. Fidler, Katherine Olivia Palacios-Paredes, Richard Blake. (Digital JB_01_7 8-2020 (dgj)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Statement Wed 07/08 5:37 AM
Statement of: Material Facts by Javier Delgado re12 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment with Supporting Memorandum of Law (Palacios-Paredes, Katherine)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Summary Judgment Wed 07/08 5:35 AM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment with Supporting Memorandum of Law by Javier Delgado. Responses due by 7/22/2020 (Palacios-Paredes, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 07, 2020
11 11 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 07/07 12:58 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court on Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time ("Motion"). ECF No.10 . Upon consideration of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion, ECF No.10 , is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due on Monday, July 13, 2020. The deadline for Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall remain the same. Additionally, this cause is set for a Telephonic Status Hearing on Wednesday, July 8, 2020, at 8:30 a.m., in Miami Division, before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra (USA Toll-Free Number: 866-390-1828; Access Code: 2046890). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra on 7/7/2020.(jv00)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 06, 2020
10 10 motion Extension of Time Mon 07/06 10:03 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment re 9 Order,,,,, by Javier Delgado. Responses due by 7/20/2020(Palacios-Paredes, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order (also emailed to Magistrate's chambers in Word format)
Thursday, June 04, 2020
9 9 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Thu 06/04 12:07 PM
PAPERLESS SCHEDULING ORDER. THIS CAUSE has been referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge pursuant to the administrative procedures of the Court which govern the disposition of Social Security cases. In order to ensure the orderly and efficient disposition of this matter the Court hereby ORDERS the following Scheduling Order: (1) Plaintiff shall file a motion for summary judgment, setting forth the reasons for relief and including citations to the administrative record and relevant legal authorities, within thirty (30) days of this Order. (2) Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment and Defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment within thirty (30) days after Plaintiff files the motion for summary judgment. Notwithstanding Local Rule 56.1, Plaintiff is not required to file a separate statement of facts nor does the factual recitation in the motion need to be in separately-numbered paragraphs. However, all factual assertions must include specific page citations from the Administrative Record using the number provided by the ECF system on the top right corner of the page. Non-compliance with any provision of this Order may subject the offending party and its attorney(s) to sanctions, including dismissal of claims or striking of defenses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra on 6/4/2020.(jv00)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2019
7 7 misc Transcript - Social Security Tue 11/12 4:49 PM
Social Security Transcripts filed. Transcripts date: 10/17/19. Pages: 1-684 (Fidler, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 11/12 4:48 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security. (Fidler, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 11/12 4:47 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephanie I. R. Fidler on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Stephanie I. R. Fidler added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft). (Fidler, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2019
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 09/06 3:59 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katherine Olivia Palacios-Paredes on behalf of Javier Delgado. Attorney Katherine Olivia Palacios-Paredes added to party Javier Delgado(pty:pla). (Palacios-Paredes, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2019
3 3 service Summons Issued as to USA Thu 09/05 2:09 PM
Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ebz)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 09/05 2:05 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/05 12:02 PM
COMPLAINT Javier Delgado against Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11957430, filed by Javier Delgado.(Oliver, Rogelio)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)