Nevada District Court
Judge:Miranda M Du
Referred: Carla Baldwin
Case #: 3:19-cv-00552
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 05, 2019
Terminated:Jul 15, 2020
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 03, 2020 12:23 AM PST
Defendant
Nicholas Baugh
Lyon County Deputy Sheriff Lyon County Sheriff's Office 911 Harvey Way
Yerington, NV 89447
Represented By
Katherine F. Parks
Thorndal, Armstrong, Delk, Balkenbush & Eisinger
contact info
Defendant
Carson-Tahoe Health
Represented By
Michael D Navratil
John H. Cotton & Associates, Ltd.
contact info
John H. Cotton
John H. Cotton & Associates, Ltd.
contact info
Defendant
Stephanie Elmquist
Represented By
Alice C Mercado
Lemons, Grundy & Eisenberg
contact info
Edward J. Lemons
Lemons Grundy & Eisenberg
contact info
Defendant
Tyrell Joyner
Lyon County Deputy Sheriff Lyon County Sheriff's Office 911 Harvey Way
Yerington, NV 89447
Represented By
Katherine F. Parks
Thorndal, Armstrong, Delk, Balkenbush & Eisinger
contact info
Defendant
Doctor Maurice Mayer
Represented By
Alice C Mercado
Lemons, Grundy & Eisenberg
contact info
Edward J. Lemons
Lemons Grundy & Eisenberg
contact info
Defendant
Al McNeil
Represented By
Katherine F. Parks
Thorndal, Armstrong, Delk, Balkenbush & Eisinger
contact info
Defendant
Sgt Brad Pope
Sergeant, Lyon County Deputy Sheriff Lyon County Sheriff's Office 911 Harvey Way
Yerington, NV 89447
Represented By
Katherine F. Parks
Thorndal, Armstrong, Delk, Balkenbush & Eisinger
contact info
Defendant
Erik Pruitt
Lyon County Deputy Sheriff Lyon County Sheriff's Office 911 Harvey Way
Yerington, NV 89447
Represented By
Katherine F. Parks
Thorndal, Armstrong, Delk, Balkenbush & Eisinger
contact info
Defendant
Lyon, County of
Represented By
Katherine F. Parks
Thorndal, Armstrong, Delk, Balkenbush & Eisinger
contact info
Defendant
Erik Maki
Plaintiff
Jeremy Lee Stutts
Represented By
Orrin J.H. Johnson
Johnson Law Practice
contact info
Kenneth V. Ward
The Law Offices Of Kenneth V. Ward
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, July 15, 2020
48 48 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation of Dismissal Order Dismissing Case Thu 07/16 9:11 AM
ORDER granting ECF No.47 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Related: [-]
47 47 motion Stipulation Dismissal Wed 07/15 3:18 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Defendants Nicholas Baugh, Tyrell Joyner, Lyon, County of, Al McNeil, Brad Pope, Erik Pruitt. (Parks, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 16, 2020
46 46 minutes Settlement Conference Tue 06/16 1:22 PM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Settlement Conference held on 6/16/2020 before Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi ; Pla Counsel: Orrin Johnson and Kenneth Ward ; Def Counsel: Katherine Parks ; Court Reporter: Liberty ; Time of Hearing: 9:00 AM ; Recording start and end times: 9:25 AM - 9:30 AM; 10:48 AM - 10:50 AM ; Courtroom: 6 ; Plaintiff is present via video conference. Present for Defendants: Jasmine Sanchez and Jeff Page. The Court conducts a settlement conference with Counsel and the County representatives in person. A settlement is reached. The settlement is placed on the record. Settlement documents are due within 30 days. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 11, 2020
45 45 minord Minute Order Thu 06/11 12:29 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 6/11/2020. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. The in-person Settlement Conference set for 6/16/2020 at 09:00 AM will be heard in Reno Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid Jr. All other provisions of the order (ECF No.43 ) setting the in-person settlement conference will apply. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 26, 2020
44 44 minord Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Tue 05/26 11:54 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 5/26/2020. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. The Court notes a settlement conference is currently set before Magistrate Judge McQuaid on June 16, 2020 at 9:00 AM42 . Therefore, this Court finds the case management conference currently set before this Court 5/29/2020 at 9:00 AM is VACATED. If the case does not settle at the settlement conference and the parties believe a case management conference is warranted, counsel have leave to file a stipulation requesting that a case management conference be scheduled. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 11, 2020
43 43 2 pgs order Order Setting Settlement Conference Tue 05/12 10:30 AM
MINUTE ORDER RE IN-PERSON HEARING. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that an in-person Settlement Conference will be conducted on Tuesday, June 16, 2020 at 9:00 A.M. , before Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr., Fifth Floor Chambers, Bruce R. Thompson U.S. Courthouse and Federal Building, 400 South Virginia Street, Reno, Nevada. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 5/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 27, 2020
42 42 4 pgs order Order Setting Settlement Conference ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/28 12:02 PM
AMENDED ORDER Scheduling a Settlement Conference for 6/16/2020at 9:00 AM in Reno Fifth Floor Chambers before Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr.. The settlement conference statements shall be received in the Reno Clerk's Office - Suite 301 not later than 4:00 PM on 6/9/2020 . DO NOT SERVE A COPY ON OPPOSING COUNSEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 4/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 17, 2020
41 41 10 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Stipulation Fri 04/17 4:01 PM
ORDERED that Defendant Carson Tahoe Regional Health Center's motion to dismiss (ECF No.8 ) is granted . It is further ordered that Defendants Maurice Mayer and Stephanie Elmquist's motion to dismiss (ECF No.17 ) is granted . It is further ordered that the parties' stipulation for extension of time for Defendants Mayer and Elmquist to file a reply (ECF No.24 ) is granted nunc pro tunc . Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 19, 2020
40 40 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Thu 03/19 10:15 AM
ORDER granting ECF No.39 Stipulation. The Settlement Conference scheduled on Tuesday, April 7, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. is VACATED and will reset as soon as the court's calendar will accommodate it. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 3/19/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 12, 2020
39 39 motion Stipulation Thu 03/12 3:20 PM
STIPULATION TO CONTINUE (First Request) by Defendant Carson-Tahoe Health. (Cotton, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2020
38 38 minord Minute Order Wed 02/05 11:31 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 2/5/2020. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. The Court has been advised that the plaintiff is currently incarcerated at the Southern Desert Correctional Center. Therefore, the deputy court clerk is directed to make the necessary arrangements for the plaintiff's video appearance for the settlement conference set before this Court on Tuesday, April 7, 2020 from 9:00 AM to 5:00 PM . IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
Related: [-]
37 37 4 pgs order Order Setting Settlement Conference Wed 02/05 11:27 AM
ORDER setting Settlement Conference. A Settlement Conference is set for 4/7/2020 at 09:00 AM in a Courtroom to be determined before Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid Jr. The settlement conference statements shall be received in the Clerk's Office, Room 301, by no later than 4:00 PM on Tuesday, March 31, 2020 . See the attached order for specifications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr. on 2/5/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2020
36 36 minutes Miscellaneous Hearing Mon 02/03 5:35 PM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Case Management Conference held on 1/30/2020 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. Crtrm Administrator: LGM ; Pla Counsel: Orrin Johnson and Kenneth Ward ; Def Counsel: Katherine Parks, Alice Mercado, and (By telephone) Michael Navratil ; Recording start and end times: 9:01:54 - 9:24:12 ; Courtroom: 1 ; The plaintiff is admonished to file documents through counsel only; therefore, the notice filed by plaintiff23 is STRICKEN. A settlement conference is set before Magistrate Judge McQuaid on April 7, 2020. The deputy court clerk is directed to issue the order scheduling settlement conference. A further case management conference is set for 5/29/2020 at 09:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. Counsel shall be allowed to appear telephonically for this case management conference and shall dial 877-336-1829 at least five (5) minutes prior to the hearing to be properly connected into the courtroom. The access code is 2809752 and the security code is 19552 . Counsel shall file a joint case management report by no later than one (1) week prior to the case management conference that outlines only the discovery that has been completed, the discovery that is outstanding, and any discovery issues for the Court's consideration. See the attached order for specifications. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2020
35 35 notice Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge Tue 01/21 10:37 AM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (KR)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2020
34 34 5 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Tue 01/21 10:37 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER approving ECF No.32 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 8/16/2020. Motions due by 9/15/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 1/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2020
33 33 misc Case Management Report Thu 01/16 1:41 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT by Defendants Nicholas Baugh, Tyrell Joyner, Lyon, County of, Al McNeil, Brad Pope, Erik Pruitt (Parks, Katherine)
Related: [-]
32 32 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Thu 01/16 1:40 PM
Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendants Nicholas Baugh, Tyrell Joyner, Lyon, County of, Al McNeil, Brad Pope, Erik Pruitt. (Parks, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2019
31 31 misc Jury Demand Fri 12/20 1:50 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendants Nicholas Baugh, Tyrell Joyner, Lyon, County of, Al McNeil, Brad Pope, Erik Pruitt. (Parks, Katherine)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Certificate Interested Parties Fri 12/20 1:48 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Nicholas Baugh, Tyrell Joyner, Lyon, County of, Al McNeil, Brad Pope, Erik Pruitt. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Parks, Katherine)
Related: [-]
29 29 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/20 1:48 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, filed by Nicholas Baugh, Tyrell Joyner, Lyon, County of, Al McNeil, Brad Pope, Erik Pruitt.(Parks, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2019
28 28 respm Reply Tue 12/10 3:50 PM
REPLY to Response to17 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Maurice Mayer. (Lemons, Edward)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2019
27 27 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 12/05 2:17 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeremy Lee Stutts re1 Complaint,,. Erik Maki served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Johnson, Orrin)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Notice 4m Dismissal Thu 12/05 1:58 PM
NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The * complaint * in this action was filed on * 9/5/2019. * To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to * Erik Maki and Al McNeil. * FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 1/4/2020. (WJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2019
25 25 misc Errata Tue 12/03 12:51 PM
ERRATA to22 Response by Plaintiff Jeremy Lee Stutts. (Johnson, Orrin)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2019
24 24 motion Stipulation Mon 12/02 1:37 PM
First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to File Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Mayer and Elmquist's Motion to Dismiss re22 Response by Defendants Stephanie Elmquist, Maurice Mayer. (Mercado, Alice)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2019
22 22 respm Response Tue 11/26 9:43 AM
RESPONSE to17 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Jeremy Lee Stutts. Replies due by 12/3/2019.(Johnson, Orrin)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2019
23 23 notice Notice Other Wed 11/27 10:43 AM
NOTICE re Magistrate Judge by Jeremy Lee Stutts. (AB)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc QC Notice Mon 11/25 1:09 PM
2nd CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No.15 . Attorney Michael D. Navratil is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (LE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2019
20 20 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 11/22 11:26 AM
ORDER granting ECF No.19 Stipulation : Response to ECF No.17 Motion to Dismiss due by 12/2/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Stipulation Thu 11/21 2:09 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) Stipulation, Request, and Order Extending Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss on Behalf of Maurice Mayer, M.D. & Stephanie Elmquist, PA-C re17 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Jeremy Lee Stutts. (Johnson, Orrin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2019
misc Docket Notes Thu 11/14 11:04 AM
***Notes: The U.S. Magistrate Judge on this case has changed her name to Judge Carla Baldwin effective immediately. (LH)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2019
18 18 misc Joinder Mon 11/11 10:03 AM
JOINDER to17 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Carson-Tahoe Health. (Cotton, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2019
17 17 motion Motion Dismiss Thu 11/07 3:34 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Stephanie Elmquist, Maurice Mayer. Responses due by 11/21/2019. (Mercado, Alice)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2019
16 16 minord Minute Order Setting Hearing Wed 11/06 2:22 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 11/6/2019. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. A case management conference is set for 1/30/2020 at 09:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. Out-of-town counsel shall be allowed to appear telephonically for this hearing and shall dial 877-336-1829 at least five (5) minutes prior to the hearing to be properly connected into the courtroom. The access code is 2809752 and the security code is 19552 . The parties shall jointly file a case management report by no later than the close of business on Thursday, January 16, 2020 . See the attached order for specifications. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2019
15 15 respm Reply Tue 11/05 10:29 AM
REPLY to Response to8 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Carson-Tahoe Health. (Cotton, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2019
14 14 misc Joinder Thu 10/31 1:43 PM
JOINDER to8 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Stephanie Elmquist, Maurice Mayer. (Lemons, Edward)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Certificate Interested Parties Thu 10/31 1:41 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Stephanie Elmquist, Maurice Mayer. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Lemons, Edward)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice Appearance Thu 10/31 1:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Edward J. Lemons on behalf of Defendants Stephanie Elmquist, Maurice Mayer. (Lemons, Edward)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2019
11 11 respm Response Tue 10/29 11:34 AM
RESPONSE to8 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Jeremy Lee Stutts. Replies due by 11/5/2019. (Johnson, Orrin)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2019
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 10/28 9:24 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeremy Lee Stutts. Nicholas Baugh served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019; Tyrell Joyner served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019; Brad Pope served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019; Erik Pruitt served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019.(Johnson, Orrin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Summons Executed-Pope,
Att: 2 Summons Summons Executed-Pruitt,
Att: 3 Summons Summons Executed-Baugh
Wednesday, October 16, 2019
9 9 misc QC Notice Wed 10/16 8:40 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Attorney Michael D. Navratil account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No.8 . Attorney Michael D. Navratil is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (LE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2019
8 8 motion Motion Dismiss Tue 10/15 2:51 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Carson-Tahoe Health. Responses due by 10/29/2019. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/29/2019. (Cotton, John)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Certificate Interested Parties Tue 10/15 2:46 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Carson-Tahoe Health. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Cotton, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2019
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/08 12:26 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeremy Lee Stutts re1 Complaint,,. Lyon, County of served on 10/4/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. (Johnson, Orrin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2019
5 5 service Request Waiver of Service Tue 09/24 12:13 PM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Carson Tahoe Health, Dr. Maurice Mayer, Erik Maki, Stephanie Elmquist on 9/24/2019 by Plaintiff Jeremy Lee Stutts.(Johnson, Orrin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Dr. Maurice Mayer,
Att: 2 Erik Maki,
Att: 3 Stephanie Elmquist
Friday, September 06, 2019
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 09/06 8:53 AM
SUMMONSES ISSUED as to All Defendants re ECF No.1 Complaint. (KR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Al McNeil,
Att: 2 Summons Tyrell Joiner,
Att: 3 Summons Erik Pruitt,
Att: 4 Summons Brad Pope,
Att: 5 Summons Nicholas Baugh,
Att: 6 Summons Carson Tahoe Health,
Att: 7 Summons Dr. Maurice Mayer,
Att: 8 Summons Erik Make,
Att: 9 Summons Stephanie Elmquist
Thursday, September 05, 2019
3 3 misc Certificate Interested Parties Thu 09/05 10:22 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jeremy Lee Stutts. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Johnson, Orrin)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Standing Order Thu 09/05 10:17 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/05 9:41 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5690667) by Jeremy Lee Stutts. Proof of service due by 12/4/2019.(Johnson, Orrin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Summons,
Att: 7 Summons,
Att: 8 Summons,
Att: 9 Summons,
Att: 10 Summons,
Att: 11 Summons
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Thu 09/05 9:46 AM
Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. (WJ)
Related: [-]