EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION v. BCD RESTAURANTS, LLC d/b/a ZAXBY'S
North Carolina Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Loretta C Biggs |
Referred: | Joe L Webster |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-00903 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Sep 05, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 16, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 03, 2020 3:24 AM EST |
Defendant
BCD RESTAURANTS, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
J. ANDERSON LITTLE
|
|
Plaintiff
EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION
Charlotte District Office 129 West Trade Street, Suite 400
Charlotte, NC 28202 |
Represented By
|
1. | Lawsuit: Zaxby's worker fired for reporting sex harassment (abcnews.go.com) |
Submitted Thu 09/12/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Thursday, January 16, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
![]() CONSENT DECREE signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 1/16/2020 as set out herein. (Sheets, Jamie) |
|
Wednesday, January 15, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Joint MOTION for Entry of Consent Decree by EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION.(BROCK, YOLANDA) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
utility
Motions Submitted
Wed 01/15 10:28 AM
Motion Submitted:12 Joint MOTION for Entry of Consent Decree to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. (Blay, Debbie) |
||
Friday, October 18, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ORDER Appointing J. ANDERSON LITTLE, as the Mediator pursuant to LR 83.9d(a). Signed by John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Kemp, Donita) |
|
10 | 10
![]() ORDER APPROVING JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT signed by Magistrate Judge Joe L. Webster on 10/18/2019. Mediation due by 1/20/2020. Plaintiff's Amended Pleadings due by 11/18/2019. Defendant's Amended Pleadings due by 12/18/2019. Discovery due by 5/20/2020. Joinder of Parties for Plaintiff due by 11/18/2019. Joinder of Parties for Defendant due by 12/18/2019. Parties do not consent to trial before a Magistrate Judge. A jury trial has been demanded. Trial 2-3 days. Andy Little will mediate this matter. (Coyne, Michelle) |
|
9 | 9
![]() JOINT PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 10/18/2019.(Coyne, Michelle) (Main Document 9 replaced on 10/18/2019) (Coyne, Michelle) |
|
order
Mediation Scheduling Order
Fri 10/18 4:34 PM
MEDIATION SCHEDULING ORDER; Mediation due by 1/20/2020.(Kemp, Donita) |
||
Thursday, October 17, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Joint MOTION for Protective Order by EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION. Response to Motion due by 10/31/2019(BROCK, YOLANDA) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
utility
Motions Referred
Thu 10/17 9:20 AM
Motion Referred: RE:8 Joint MOTION for Protective Order , to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Blay, Debbie) |
||
utility
Motions Referred
Thu 10/17 3:35 PM
Motions Referred: RE:7 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties, to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER (Garrett, Kim) |
||
Wednesday, October 16, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION. (BROCK, YOLANDA) |
|
Tuesday, October 01, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 11/20/2019 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garrett, Kim) |
|
Thursday, September 26, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by attorney R. THOMPSON WRIGHT on behalf of Defendant BCD RESTAURANTS, LLC (WRIGHT, R.) |
|
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by attorney RICHARD TOD GRANOWSKY on behalf of Defendant BCD RESTAURANTS, LLC (GRANOWSKY, RICHARD) |
|
3 | 3
![]() ANSWER to1 Complaint by BCD RESTAURANTS, LLC. (GRANOWSKY, RICHARD) |
|
Friday, September 06, 2019 | ||
utility
Update Answer Deadline
Fri 09/06 9:17 AM
Answer deadline terminated for BCD RESTAURANTS, LLC. Incorrect event used at2 . (Sheets, Jamie) |
||
Thursday, September 05, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE of SUMMONS by EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION. BCD RESTAURANTS, LLC waiver sent on 9/5/2019, answer due 11/4/2019.(BROCK, YOLANDA) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against BCD RESTAURANTS, LLC d/b/a ZAXBY'S, filed by EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION.(BROCK, YOLANDA) |
|
utility
Case Assigned
Thu 09/05 4:22 PM
Case assigned to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle) |