Washington Parish Government v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45773 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 05, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Louisiana Eastern, 2:19-cv-11626 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:20 PM EST |
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Morris & Dickson Co LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sandoz Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Smith Drug Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreen Company
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Elizabeth LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Kadian LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis South Atlantic LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Totowa LLC
874 Walker Road, Suite C
Dover, DE 19904 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Sales, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceutical Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceutical LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Anda Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
H.D. Smith LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Impax Laboratories, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Washington Parish Government
Walter J. Leger, Jr. 935 Gravier Street Suite 2150
New Orleans, LA 70112 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/09/2019 10:43 AM EDT |
Thursday, July 11, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 22nd JDC Parish of Washington, case number 113499 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7750479) filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..Attorney Richard S. Crisler added to party Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.(pty:dft).(Crisler, Richard) (Attachment 1 re-formatted on 7/15/2019) (mp). Modified attachment description on 7/15/2019 (mp). [Transferred from laed on 9/5/2019.] | |
Att: 1 153 pgs Exhibit State Court Petition, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 List of Parties & Attorneys | ||
2 | 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc) [Transferred from laed on 9/5/2019.] | |
Friday, July 12, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE by McKesson Corporation Supplemental Notice of Removal .(Williams, Stacey) [Transferred from laed on 9/5/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE by McKesson Corporation of Collateral Proceedings . (Williams, Stacey) [Transferred from laed on 9/5/2019.] | |
5 | 5 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by McKesson Corporation (Williams, Stacey) [Transferred from laed on 9/5/2019.] | |
6 | 6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent IVAX LLC, Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Corporate Parent Orvet UK, Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Holdings Cooperatieve U.A., Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceuticals Europe B.V. for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Crisler, Richard) [Transferred from laed on 9/5/2019.] | |
7 | 7 NOTICE by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Collateral Proceedings . (Crisler, Richard) [Transferred from laed on 9/5/2019.] | |
Monday, July 15, 2019 | ||
8 | 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re1 Notice of Removal. Attachment #1 uploaded in improper format. Clerk took corrective action. (mp) [Transferred from laed on 9/5/2019.] | |
9 | 9 Directive of the Clerk re1 Notice of Removal filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (mp) [Transferred from laed on 9/5/2019.] | |
Tuesday, July 16, 2019 | ||
10 | 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Lance M Africk recused. Case reassigned to Judge Jay C. Zainey. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on July 15, 2019.(mp) [Transferred from laed on 9/5/2019.] | |
11 | 11 Rico Standing Order. By Clerk. (jrc) [Transferred from laed on 9/5/2019.] | |
Thursday, July 18, 2019 | ||
12 | 12 Response/Reply by Washington Parish Government to11 Rico Standing Order (Landry, Matthew) [Transferred from laed on 9/5/2019.] | |
13 | 13 **STRICKEN. SEE R. DOC. 19** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Notice of Removal, by West-Ward Pharmaceutical, Corp.(Boyer, Nicole) Modified on 7/22/2019 (sbs). [Transferred from laed on 9/5/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A Rule 7.8 Certificate, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
14 | 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Document re13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Notice of Removal, by West-Ward Pharmaceutical, Corp.(Boyer, Nicole) [Transferred from laed on 9/5/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, July 19, 2019 | ||
15 | 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Washington Parish Government. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/7/2019.(Landry, Matthew) [Transferred from laed on 9/5/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Submission, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
16 | 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Petition as to Joining Manufacturing Defendants and Anda, Inc. by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Rookard, Kelly) [Transferred from laed on 9/5/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, July 22, 2019 | ||
17 | 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon. Judge Jay C. Zainey no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 7/22/2019. (NEF: Judge Lemmon)(ajn) [Transferred from laed on 9/5/2019.] | |
18 | 18 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer1 Notice of Removal, by CVS Health Corporation, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart, Inc. (Knight, Kathryn) Modified text on 7/22/2019 (sbs). [Transferred from laed on 9/5/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
19 | 19 ORDER granting14 MOTION to Withdraw Document re13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Notice of Removal. The Motion for Extension of Time to Answer is stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 7/22/2019.(sbs) [Transferred from laed on 9/5/2019.] | |
20 | 20 ORDER granting16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Petition. Defendants are allowed an extension of time up to, through and including 60 days after the later of: (1) a decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action to the MDL; or (2) this Court's ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 7/22/2019. (sbs) [Transferred from laed on 9/5/2019.] | |
21 | 21 ORDER granting18 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants are granted a sixty (60) day extension of time to file a responsive pleading after the later of: (1) a decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action to the MDL; or (2) this Court's ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, should Plaintiff move to remand this action to state court. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 7/22/2019. (sbs) [Transferred from laed on 9/5/2019.] | |
22 | 22 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by CVS Health Corporation (Flanagan, Thomas) [Transferred from laed on 9/5/2019.] | |
Friday, July 26, 2019 | ||
23 | 23 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission of Plaintiff's15 Motion to Remand to State Court by Actavis Elizabeth, LLC, Actavis Kadian LLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Actavis Totowa, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc.(Williams, Stacey) Modified text on 7/29/2019 (sbs). [Transferred from laed on 9/5/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, July 29, 2019 | ||
24 | 24 ORDER granting23 MOTION to Continue Submission of Plaintiff's15 Motion to Remand to State Court. The submission of Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Remand is continued without date. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 7/29/2019.(sbs) [Transferred from laed on 9/5/2019.] | |
Wednesday, July 31, 2019 | ||
25 | 25 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond re1 Notice of Removal by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc. Attorney S. Brian Perry added to party Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc.(pty:dft).(Perry, S.) Modified text on 8/1/2019 (sbs) [Transferred from laed on 9/5/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
26 | 26 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc. (Perry, S.) [Transferred from laed on 9/5/2019.] | |
Thursday, August 01, 2019 | ||
27 | 27 ORDER granting25 MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond re1 Notice of Removal filed by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc. Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc., shall have through and including 60 days after (1) this Court's ruling on the motion to remand, or (2) the JPML enters a final order granting a motion to vacate the conditional transfer order or a final decision otherwise denying transfer to the MDL, whichever is later, to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Petition for Damages. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 8/1/2019.(sbs) [Transferred from laed on 9/5/2019.] | |
Friday, August 02, 2019 | ||
28 | 28 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Deadlines by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation.(Williams, Stacey) [Transferred from laed on 9/5/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 05, 2019 | ||
29 | 29 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond re1 Notice of Removal by Smith Drug Company.(Brickman, Philip) Modified text on 8/6/2019 (sbs). [Transferred from laed on 9/5/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 06, 2019 | ||
30 | 30 ORDER granting29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Notice of Removal, as set forth herein. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 8/5/2019. (sbs) (Main Document 30 replaced on 8/6/2019) (sbs). [Transferred from laed on 9/5/2019.] | |
31 | 31 ORDER granting28 Motion for Extension of Deadlines, as set forth herein. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 8/5/2019. (sbs) [Transferred from laed on 9/5/2019.] | |
32 | 32 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by H.D. Smith, LLC identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation for H.D. Smith, LLC. (Crump, Richard) Modified text on 8/6/2019 (sbs). [Transferred from laed on 9/5/2019.] | |
33 | 33 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Notice of Removal, by H.D. Smith, LLC.(Crump, Richard) Modified text on 8/6/2019 (sbs). [Transferred from laed on 9/5/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, August 07, 2019 | ||
34 | 34 ORDER granting33 Motion for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to1 Notice of Removal. Defendant to comply as stated herein. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 8/6/2019. (sbs) [Transferred from laed on 9/5/2019.] | |
Tuesday, August 13, 2019 | ||
35 | 35 Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2804. (my) [Transferred from laed on 9/5/2019.] | |
Monday, August 19, 2019 | ||
36 | 36 Order of MDL Transfer to Northern District of Ohio. MDL case number is 2804. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent.(sbs) [Transferred from laed on 9/5/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Transmittal Letter | ||
Thursday, September 05, 2019 | ||
37 | 37 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Louisiana Eastern. Case number 2:19-cv-11626. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |