New Mexico District Court
Judge:Jerry H Ritter
Referred: Steven C Yarbrough
Case #: 6:19-cv-00816
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:Sep 05, 2019
Terminated:Dec 26, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 03, 2020 2:17 AM MST
Defendant
Esurance Insurance Services Inc.
Represented By
Meena H Allen
Allen Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Andrea Abedi
Represented By
Barry Green
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Thursday, September 05, 2019
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ESURANCE INSURANCE SERVICES INC. from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2019-02029. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by ESURANCE INSURANCE SERVICES INC..(Allen, Meena)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet