Walsh et al v. International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers (I.B.E.W.) Local 503 et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Vincent L Briccetti |
Case #: | 7:14-cv-01677 |
Nature of Suit | 720 Labor - Labor/Management Relations |
Cause | 29:185 Labor: Suits by and against Labor Organizations |
Case Filed: | Mar 11, 2014 |
Terminated: | Feb 06, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 21, 2015 4:02 PM EST |
Defendant
Robert Decker
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Patrick Greaven
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Hlavec
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers (I.B.E.W.) Local 503
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Scott Jensen
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Does 1-5
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brian McPartland
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brian Scott
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
GenOn Energy Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Walsh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Worden
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
136 | 136
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 07/06 2:37 PM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to123 Notice of Appeal filed by Timothy Walsh. USCA Case Number 17-712. Ordered that the appeal is DISMISSED.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 07/06/2017. (nd) |