City of Owasso v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45718 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | No cause code entered |
Case Filed: | Sep 06, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Oklahoma Northern, 4:19-cv-00171 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:20 PM EST |
*** SELECTION REQUIRED
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., also known as Walgreen Co.
|
|
*** SELECTION REQUIRED
Medisca Inc.
|
|
*** SELECTION REQUIRED
L. & R. Distributors, Inc., doing business as SAJ Distributors
|
|
*** SELECTION REQUIRED
H.D. Smith, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joshua Livingston
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McKesson Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Morris & Dickson Co LLC
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Physicians Total Care Inc
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Officer Jeremy Thomas
D.O. 525 North Erie Street
Toledo, OH 43604 |
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lynn Webster
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Activas PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amerisourcebergen Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Anda Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Perry Fine
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
GCP Pharma LLC
|
|
Defendant
Harvard Drug Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Phamaceutica, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Keysource Medical, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Owasso
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/09/2019 9:53 AM EDT |
Friday, February 22, 2019 | ||
PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against All Defendants by City of Owasso (dlg, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | ||
Wednesday, March 27, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
2 | 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from D.C. Tulsa County, case number CJ-2019-784 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2033097) by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (With attachments) (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
3 | 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Raymond Edward Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
4 | 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions Inc.) by Endo Health Solutions Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
5 | 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.) by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
6 | 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , : Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2, the removing party(ies) shall file a Status Report on Removed Action within five (5) days of the filing of the notice of removal in the U.S. District Court. The form is available on the Court's website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
7 | 7 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
Thursday, March 28, 2019 | ||
8 | 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by D Todd Riddles on behalf of Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Riddles, D) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
9 | 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Riddles, D) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
10 | 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer , Move, or Otherwise Respond to Petition under Rule 12 by Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Riddles, D) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
11 | 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Corp. (Huntsman, Susan) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
12 | 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Other Affiliate Walgreens Boots Alliance Holdings LLC for AmerisourceBergen Corp.) by AmerisourceBergen Corp. (Huntsman, Susan) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
13 | 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Corp. (McBride, D) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
14 | 14 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (kjp, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
Friday, March 29, 2019 | ||
15 | 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stuart Douglas Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp. [Note: Attorney Stuart Douglas Campbell added to party McKesson Corp.(pty:dft).] (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
16 | 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
17 | 17 NOTICE Supplemental Notice of Removal by McKesson Corp. (With attachments) (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
18 | 18 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
19 | 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kaylee Patricia Davis-Maddy on behalf of McKesson Corp. [Note: Attorney Kaylee Patricia Davis-Maddy added to party McKesson Corp.(pty:dft).] (Davis-Maddy, Kaylee) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
Monday, April 01, 2019 | ||
20 | 20 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Family Dollar Stores of Oklahoma, LLC and Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk) Modified on 4/1/2019 - ENTERED IN ERROR (jln, Dpty Clk). [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
21 | 21 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing AmerisourceBergen Corp. and Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
22 | 22 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
23 | 23 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
24 | 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Cardinal Health, Inc., Corporate Parent Generic Drug Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent HDG Acquisition, Inc., Corporate Parent Cardinal Health 110, LLC for Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The) by Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
25 | 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cardinal Health, Inc. (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
26 | 26 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John Hunt Sparks on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Sparks, John) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
27 | 27 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael W Ridgeway on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Ridgeway, Michael) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
28 | 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Johnson & Johnson) by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Ridgeway, Michael) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
29 | 29 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or file other Responsive Pleadings by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Ridgeway, Michael) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
Tuesday, April 02, 2019 | ||
30 | 30 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing McKesson Corp. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
31 | 31 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell There being no objection, the Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings [Doc. 29] is granted ; granting29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (lah, Chambers) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
Wednesday, April 03, 2019 | ||
32 | 32 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc. and Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
33 | 33 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Allen Curran on behalf of Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. [Note: Attorney Jeffrey Allen Curran added to party Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Allen Curran added to party Anda, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Curran, Jeffrey) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
34 | 34 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. (Curran, Jeffrey) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
Thursday, April 04, 2019 | ||
35 | 35 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting34 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (kjp, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
Friday, April 05, 2019 | ||
36 | 36 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.and Anda, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
37 | 37 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent TEVA Pharmaceuticals Industries, LTD for Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc.) by Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. (Curran, Jeffrey) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
38 | 38 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by AmerisourceBergen Corp., Cardinal Health, Inc., Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
39 | 39 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting38 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (kjp, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
Monday, April 08, 2019 | ||
40 | 40 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert Garner McCampbell on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc., Cephalon, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (McCampbell, Robert) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
41 | 41 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent TEVA Pharmaceuticals Industries, LTD for Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc., Cephalon, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.) by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc., Cephalon, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (McCampbell, Robert) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
42 | 42 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Nicholas Vernon Merkley on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc., Cephalon, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Merkley, Nicholas) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
43 | 43 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ashley E Quinn on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc., Cephalon, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. [Note: Attorney Ashley E Quinn added to party Actavis LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley E Quinn added to party Actavis Pharma Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley E Quinn added to party Cephalon, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley E Quinn added to party TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley E Quinn added to party Watson Laboratories, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Quinn, Ashley) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
Tuesday, April 09, 2019 | ||
44 | 44 MOTION to Remand by City of Owasso (With attachments) (Court, Todd) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
Wednesday, April 10, 2019 | ||
45 | 45 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc., Cephalon, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
Friday, April 12, 2019 | ||
46 | 46 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Sanford C Coats on behalf of Purdue Frederick Company Inc., The, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P. (Coats, Sanford) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
47 | 47 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jennifer Nicole Lamirand on behalf of Purdue Frederick Company Inc., The, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P. [Note: Attorney Jennifer Nicole Lamirand added to party Purdue Frederick Company Inc., The(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer Nicole Lamirand added to party Purdue Pharma Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer Nicole Lamirand added to party Purdue Pharma L.P.(pty:dft).] (Lamirand, Jennifer) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
48 | 48 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Other Affiliate Purdue Pharma Inc., Other Affiliate Pharmaceutical Research Associates L.P. for Purdue Pharma L.P.) by Purdue Pharma L.P. (Lamirand, Jennifer) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
49 | 49 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Purdue Pharma Inc. (Lamirand, Jennifer) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
50 | 50 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Pharmaceutical Research Associates, Inc. for Purdue Frederick Company Inc., The) by Purdue Frederick Company Inc., The (Lamirand, Jennifer) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
Tuesday, April 16, 2019 | ||
51 | 51 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
Tuesday, April 23, 2019 | ||
52 | 52 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Mark S Cheffo, Steven A Reed, Brian M Ercole, Harvey Bartle IV, Charles C Lifland, J Matthew Donohue, Joseph L Franco, Joshua D Burns, and Jonathan S Tam to file by 5/23/2019 a Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice per Local Civil Rule 83.2. Additionally, if you intend to practice in this district in the future and want to become a member of this district, please submit an application for attorney admission. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (eaw, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
Tuesday, April 30, 2019 | ||
53 | 53 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by AmerisourceBergen Corp., Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corp. (With attachments) (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
54 | 54 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion by McKesson Corp. ; (With attachments) (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
55 | 55 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. ; (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
Tuesday, May 14, 2019 | ||
56 | 56 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion by City of Owasso ; (With attachments) (Court, Todd) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
57 | 57 REPLY to Response to Motion by City of Owasso ; (Court, Todd) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
Thursday, May 23, 2019 | ||
58 | 58 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joshua D. Burns, Jonathan S. Tam, Mark S. Cheffo to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-2057287) by Purdue Frederick Company Inc., The, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P. (With attachments) (Lamirand, Jennifer) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
59 | 59 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting admission pro hac vice for attorneys Joshua D. Burns, Jonathan S. Tam, and Mark S. Cheffo ; granting58 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
60 | 60 MOTION for Attorney(s) Harvey Bartle to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-2057430) by TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. [Note: Attorney Robert Garner McCampbell added to party Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft).] (With attachments) (McCampbell, Robert) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
61 | 61 MOTION for Attorney(s) Steven Reed to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-2057432) by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc., Activas PLC, Cephalon, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. [Note: Attorney Robert Garner McCampbell added to party Activas PLC(pty:dft).] (With attachments) (McCampbell, Robert) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
62 | 62 MOTION for Attorney(s) Brian Ercole to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-2057433) by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc., Activas PLC, Cephalon, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (With attachments) (McCampbell, Robert) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
Friday, May 24, 2019 | ||
63 | 63 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting admission pro hac vice for attorney Harvey Bartle ; granting60 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
64 | 64 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting admission pro hac vice for attorney Steven Reed ; granting61 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
65 | 65 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting admission pro hac vice for attorney Brian Ercole ; granting62 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
Tuesday, May 28, 2019 | ||
66 | 66 Joint REPLY to Response to Motion by AmerisourceBergen Corp., Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corp. ; (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
Wednesday, May 29, 2019 | ||
67 | 67 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Activas PLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
68 | 68 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) Tiffany M. Ikeda (With Notice of Motion to Withdraw) by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
69 | 69 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; terminating attorney Tiffany Ikeda ; granting68 Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s) (kjp, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
Wednesday, June 19, 2019 | ||
70 | 70 NOTICE of Filing Bankruptcy by Insys Therapeutic, Inc. (Pierce, Amy) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
Friday, June 21, 2019 | ||
71 | 71 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Insys Therapeutic, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
Thursday, June 27, 2019 | ||
72 | 72 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Insys Therapeutic, Inc. (Pierce, Amy) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
Tuesday, July 23, 2019 | ||
73 | 73 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kaylee Patricia Davis-Maddy by on behalf of McKesson Corp. (Davis-Maddy, Kaylee) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
Wednesday, July 31, 2019 | ||
74 | 74 ***Remark: Received Transfer Order re:action under Panel Rule 7.1 to vacate conditional transfer orders (jln, Dpty Clk) Modified on 8/1/2019 to correct file date (jln, Dpty Clk). [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
75 | 75 ***Remark: Received Minute Order from MDL re: transferee court to transmit a certified copy of the Panel Transfer Order (jln, Dpty Clk) Modified on 8/1/2019 to correct file date (jln, Dpty Clk). [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
Thursday, August 01, 2019 | ||
***Civil Case Terminated (see document number76 ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | ||
76 | 76 ORDER by Sarah S Vance, Chair of the MDL Panel , transferring case (terminates case) (Documents Terminated:44 MOTION to Remand ,53 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation ) (jln, Dpty Clk) [Transferred from oknd on 9/6/2019.] | |
Friday, September 06, 2019 | ||
77 | 77 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Oklahoma Northern. Case number 4:19-cv-00171. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |