Triad Health Systems, Inc. v. PURDUE PHARMA, L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45780 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 06, 2019 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:21 PM EST |
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L P
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
DepoMed Inc
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGx, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
H.D. Smith, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLS
|
|
Plaintiff
Triad Health Systems, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Collegium Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Terminated: 11/07/2019
|
Docket last updated: 09/09/2019 11:57 AM EDT |
Friday, September 06, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 180 pgs Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9509649. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:17-md-2804 . Filed by Triad Health Systems, Inc.. (Finnell, Robert) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |