Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-07887

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael G Williamson
Case #: 8:19-ap-00455
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Sep 06, 2019
Terminated:Apr 06, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Quick Bridge Funding, LLC
410 Exchange, Suite 150
Irvine, CA 92602
Represented By
Quick Bridge Funding, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Larry Hyman
606 E. Madison Street
Tampa, FL 33602
Represented By
Daniel E Etlinger
Jennis Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, April 06, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Mon 04/06 8:41 AM
Adversary Case 8:19-ap-455 Closed. (Dianna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 17, 2020
court Compromise Cross-Reference Tue 03/17 8:06 AM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise filed in Case No. 8:17-bk-07887-MGW Doc 205 . (Dianna)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2020
court Compromise Cross-Reference Fri 02/21 1:51 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise filed in Case No. 8:17-bk-07887-MGW Doc 204 . (Dianna)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2020
13 13 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 01/13 10:16 AM
Answer to Amended Complaint Related [+]. Filed by Eric B Zwiebel on behalf of Defendant Quick Bridge Funding, LLC. (Zwiebel, Eric)
Related: [-] 11
Monday, December 30, 2019
misc Electronic Service Text Entry (TEXT ONLY) Mon 12/30 11:09 AM
Service completed via CM/ECF electronic notification. Filed by Daniel E Etlinger on behalf of Plaintiff Larry Hyman Related [+]. (Etlinger, Daniel)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, December 26, 2019
12 12 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 12/26 11:35 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Dealdines to Amend the Complaint PreTrial Continued Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 2/25/2020 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Service Instructions: Daniel Etlinger is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Dianna)
Related: [-] 9
Tuesday, December 24, 2019
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 12/24 2:04 PM
Amended Complaint. Reason for Amendment: Additional Nature of Suit. Nature of Suit: 13 Related [+] by Daniel E Etlinger on behalf of Larry Hyman against Quick Bridge Funding, LLC.. (Etlinger, Daniel)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer1
Tuesday, December 17, 2019
10 10 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Tue 12/17 4:17 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Daniel Etlinger: Pltf Atty, Ron Emanuel (telephonic): Def Atty WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: (1) Pretrial Conference - Cont. to 2/25 @ 9:30 a.m. (2) Second Motion to Extend Time to (1) Amend Complaint as a Matter of Right; and (2) Repond to Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Quick Bridge Funding, LLC Filed by Daniel E Etlinger on behalf of Plaintiff Larry Hyman Related [+]. (Etlinger, Daniel) Doc #9 - Granted, 7 days to Amend Complaint & Def will have 21 days to respond, order by Etlinger Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-] 4
Friday, November 15, 2019
court Fri 11/15 8:20 AM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 12/17/2019 09:30 AM Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Re: Second Motion to Extend Time to (1) Amend Complaint as a Matter of Right; and (2) Repond to Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Quick Bridge Funding, LLC Doc9 . This entry will serve as the official notification of hearing from the court. Related [+]. (Dkt)
Related: [-] 9
Monday, November 04, 2019
9 9 motion Motion to Extend Time Mon 11/04 4:28 PM
Second Motion to Extend Time to (1) Amend Complaint as a Matter of Right; and (2) Repond to Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Quick Bridge Funding, LLC Filed by Daniel E Etlinger on behalf of Plaintiff Larry Hyman Related [+]. (Etlinger, Daniel)
Related: [-] 4
Monday, October 28, 2019
8 8 motion Motion to Extend Time Mon 10/28 8:25 PM
Motion to Extend Time to (1) Amend Complaint as a Matter of Right; and (2) Respond to Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Quick Bridge Funding, LLC Filed by Daniel E Etlinger on behalf of Plaintiff Larry Hyman. (Etlinger, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2019
7 7 notice Notice (DO NOT USE for appearances or hearings) Wed 10/23 10:07 AM
Notice of Unavailability Filed by Eric B Zwiebel on behalf of Defendant Quick Bridge Funding, LLC. (Zwiebel, Eric)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2019
6 6 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Thu 10/10 8:16 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by Eric B Zwiebel on behalf of Defendant Quick Bridge Funding, LLC. (Zwiebel, Eric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2019
5 5 court Notice Of Deficient Filing Tue 10/08 4:10 PM
Notice of Deficient Filing. Statement of Corporate Ownership. Compliance required no later than 10/25/2019. (Dianna)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2019
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/07 4:38 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+]. Filed by Eric B Zwiebel on behalf of Defendant Quick Bridge Funding, LLC. (Zwiebel, Eric)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, September 10, 2019
3 3 misc Summons Service Executed Tue 09/10 3:18 PM
Service Executed on Quick Bridge Funding, LLC of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Daniel E Etlinger on behalf of Plaintiff Larry Hyman Related [+]. (Etlinger, Daniel)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, September 09, 2019
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 09/09 12:30 PM
Summons issued on Quick Bridge Funding, LLC along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 10/09/2019. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A Pretrial/Status Conference will be held in Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Ave., Tampa, FL 33602, on December 17, 2019, at 09:30 AM. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint - Original Fri 09/06 4:11 PM
Complaint by Larry Hyman against Quick Bridge Funding, LLC. Filing Fee Deferred. Nature of Suit: [12 Related [+]],[13]. (Etlinger, Daniel)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer