Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee v. Capitol Power Group, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:17-bk-52170
Lead BK case is: 5:17-bk-52170
Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Alan M Koschik |
Case #: | 5:19-ap-05091 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 06, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 09, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Capitol Power Group, LLC
20365 Exchange Street Suite 240
Ashburn, VA 20147 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee
600 Superior Avenue E Suite 2100
Cleveland, OH 44114 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Monday, March 09, 2020 | ||
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Mon 03/09 8:24 AM
Disposition of Adversary 5:19-ap-5091 (dzeme) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 03/09 8:25 AM
Adversary Case 5:19-ap-5091 Closed (dzeme) |
||
Thursday, February 20, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee. (Jericho, Ashley aty) |
|
Wednesday, January 08, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Document Fourth Stipulation Extending Time for Capitol Power Group, LLC to Answer the Complaint, and Stipulation Extending Discovery Deadlines Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee . (Jericho, Ashley aty) |
|
Monday, December 16, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Capitol Power Group, LLC. (Mazur, Louise aty) |
|
Thursday, December 12, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Document Third Stipulation Extending Time for Capitol Power Group, LLC to Answer the Complaint, and Stipulation Extending Discovery Deadlines Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee . (Carr, Maria aty) |
|
Monday, November 11, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Document Second Stipulation Extending Time for Capitol Power Group, LLC to Respond to Complaint Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee . (Carr, Maria aty) |
|
Sunday, October 27, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Notice of Order to Set Hearing Notice Date 10/27/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, October 25, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order Signed on 10/25/2019 . Hearing scheduled for 2/20/2020 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom #2 Toledo. This adversary proceeding came before the court on October 24, 2019, for an initial pretrial scheduling conference on Plaintiffs Complaint to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers and to Disallow Claims (Complaint) [Doc.# 1]. Plaintiffs Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) expert disclosure(s), if any, and report(s) are due by April 10, 2020. Defendants Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) expert disclosure(s), if any, and report(s) are due by March 11, 2020. All non-expert discovery must be commenced in time to be completed by February 20, 2020. Telephone appearances will be permitted with separate 24-hour advance notice to the court.(dzeme crt) |
|
Thursday, October 24, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Proceeding Memo Hearing held 10/24/19. Adjourned to 2/20/20 at 1:30 PM. Deadlines: Non-expert discovery: 2/10/20, Def. expert report: 3/11/20Plff. expert report: 4/10/20. (dzeme) |
|
Thursday, October 17, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Capitol Power Group, LLC. (Franklin, Bridget aty) |
|
Tuesday, October 15, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Document Stipulation Extending Time for Capitol Power Group, LLC to Respond to Complaint Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee . (Carr, Maria aty) |
|
Tuesday, September 17, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Summons Service Executed on Capitol Power Group, LLC 9/17/2019 (Carr, Maria aty) |
|
Wednesday, September 11, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Notice of Order (PDF) w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 09/11/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, September 10, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons issued on Plaintiff for service on Defendant(s) Capitol Power Group, LLC Answer due 10/10/2019. This Court has adopted a paperless procedure for issuing the summons in an adversary proceeding. The attached summons has been sealed, processed, and docketed by the Clerk. Electronic filers will only receive electronic email notice of this docket entry. No paper copy of the summons will be mailed; it must be printed from CM/ECF. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004(a) and F.R.C.P. 4, it is the responsibility of the plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel to promptly serve the summons, a copy of the complaint, and, if applicable, a copy of any pre-trial or adversary case management order on defendant(s). To be timely, the summons and a copy of the complaint must be served within seven (7) days of issuance per Bankruptcy Rule 7004(e). Service of the summons is prescribed by Bankruptcy Rule 7004 and F.R.C.P. 4. If a summons is not timely served, an ''alias'' summons must be requested from the Clerk. Certification or proof of service by plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel is made by completing the Certificate of Service portion of the original summons. Attorneys should docket the summons, once served, using the Summons Service Executed event within CM/ECF. Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/24/2019 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom #2 Toledo. (mshai) |
|
court
Case Reassigned
Tue 09/10 9:06 AM
Judge MARY ANN WHIPPLE added to case. Involvement of Judge ALAN M. KOSCHIK Terminated (mshai) |
||
Monday, September 09, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
![]() ORDER REASSIGNING ADVERSARY PROCEEDING . (spete crt) |
|
Friday, September 06, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 19-05091 Complaint by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee against Capitol Power Group, L.L.C.. Fee Amount $350 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers and Disallow Claims Nature of Suit:12 (Malloy, Sean aty) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |