Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-03448
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Sep 09, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Mar 07, 2020 5:16 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
SANTOS MARTINEZ
Represented By
THOMAS J HENRY
Thomas J Henry Law Pllc - Corpus Christi Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, October 24, 2019
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 10/24 2:57 PM
SHORT FORM AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by SANTOS MARTINEZ. (HENRY, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2019
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 09/09 4:10 PM
Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY. (sdw)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/09 3:58 PM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4614924.), filed by SANTOS MARTINEZ. (HENRY, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 09/09 4:09 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON no longer assigned to case. (sdw)
Related: [-]