Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-cv-00963

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-03433
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Sep 09, 2019
Terminated:Nov 14, 2019
Case in other court:Louisiana Eastern, 2:19-cv-10021
Last checked: Saturday Mar 07, 2020 4:18 AM EST
Defendant
BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Represented By
KEVIN MICHAEL HODGES
Williams & Connolly Llp - Washington Dc
contact info
FRANCIS M MCDONALD, JR
Mcdonald Toole Wiggins Pa - Orlando Fl
contact info
Defendant
BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC
Represented By
KEVIN MICHAEL HODGES
Williams & Connolly Llp - Washington Dc
contact info
FRANCIS M MCDONALD, JR
Mcdonald Toole Wiggins Pa - Orlando Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER LOREN LUCERO
Represented By
HOWARD L NATIONS
Howard L Nations Pc - Houston Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, November 14, 2019
9 9 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 11/14 7:30 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY, BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC. (MCDONALD, FRANCIS)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2019
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/13 3:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by FRANCIS M MCDONALD, JR on behalf of BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY, BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC (MCDONALD, FRANCIS)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2019
7 7 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Mon 09/09 3:42 PM
Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-10021. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2019
6 6 1 pgs order Order of Entry ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Mon 09/09 9:30 AM
IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 9/6/2019. (NEF: Sect J)(caa)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2019
5 5 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2019
4 4 ANSWER to1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2019
3 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS No.'s 1 and 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015.(as) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 BELO Settlement Agreement
Thursday, May 02, 2019
2 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2019
1 1 COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7614548) filed by Christopher Loren Lucero.Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Christopher Loren Lucero(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet