Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:19-bk-10850

Louisiana Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John S Hodge
Case #: 5:19-ap-01022
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Sep 09, 2019
Terminated:Feb 05, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Achillea C. Kirkikis
Represented By
Achillea C. Kirkikis
contact info
Plaintiff
Jimmie D. DeRamus
Represented By
R. Joseph Naus
Wiener, Weiss & Madison
contact info
Plaintiff
Peggy C. DeRamus
Represented By
R. Joseph Naus
Wiener, Weiss & Madison
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Wednesday, February 05, 2020
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 02/05 4:56 PM
Disposition of Adversary 19AP-01022 - Granted. Judgment For Plaintiff (mitc)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 02/05 4:59 PM
Adversary Case 19AP-01022 - Closed (mitc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2019
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 10/31 11:52 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 10/31/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Judgment/Order
Tuesday, October 29, 2019
10 10 order Judgment/Order - AP Tue 10/29 4:35 PM
Consent Judgment For Jimmie and Peggy DeRamus and Against Achillea C. Kirkikis. Related [+] Filed on 10/29/2019 (jrro)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
9 9 misc Statement Tue 10/29 9:34 AM
Pre-Trial Statement Related [+] Filed by Seth Moyers on behalf of Jimmie D. DeRamus, Peggy C. DeRamus (Moyers, Seth)
Related: [-] 2 Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference Order
Friday, October 25, 2019
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Entry of Default Fri 10/25 11:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Entry of Default. Related [+]. Notice Date 10/25/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Entry of Default
Wednesday, October 23, 2019
7 7 court Entry of Default Wed 10/23 10:11 AM
Entry of Default on Achillea C. Kirkikis (jrro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2019
6 6 motion Default Judgment Request Entry Tue 10/22 10:50 AM
Request for Clerks Entry of Default with Certificate of Service Filed by Seth Moyers on behalf of Jimmie D. DeRamus, Peggy C. DeRamus (Moyers, Seth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration
Thursday, September 12, 2019
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Preliminary PreTrial Order Thu 09/12 11:59 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Preliminary PreTrial Order. Related [+]. Notice Date 09/12/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference Order
Wednesday, September 11, 2019
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 09/11 1:58 PM
Summons Service Executed on Achillea C. Kirkikis 9/11/2019 . (Naus, R.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2019
3 3 court Summons Issued Tue 09/10 11:14 AM
Summons Issued on Achillea C. Kirkikis Date Issued 9/10/2019, Answer Due 10/10/2019 (rose)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference Order - AP Tue 09/10 10:26 AM
Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference Order. Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/30/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom Four, Shreveport. Filed on 9/10/2019 (mitc)
Related: [-]
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee Payment - Adversary Proceeding (New) Tue 09/10 5:46 PM
Filing Fee Paid. Receipt Number 293685, Amount Paid $350.00. Related [+] (adiuser)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, September 09, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint (Fee) Mon 09/09 5:36 PM
Adversary case 19-01022 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)), (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)), (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)), (91 (Declaratory judgment)): Complaint Objecting To Discharge Of A Debt by Jimmie D. DeRamus (attorney R. Joseph Naus), Peggy C. DeRamus (attorney R. Joseph Naus) against Achillea C. Kirkikis. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount Due $350 (Naus, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits 1 - 3;
Att: 2 AP Cover Sheet