Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Rodney Smith
Case #: 0:19-cv-62258
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Sep 10, 2019
Terminated:Oct 08, 2019
Last checked: Sunday Mar 08, 2020 5:43 AM EDT
Defendant
Antonio Brown
Plaintiff
Britney Taylor
Represented By
David L. Haas
Haas Law
contact info


1. Antonio Brown Accused of Rape in a Lawsuit (nytimes.com)
Submitted Wed 09/11/2019
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, October 08, 2019
4 4 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 10/08 5:10 PM
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (dco)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Tue 10/08 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(I) by Britney Taylor (Haas, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2019
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Wed 09/11 8:07 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 09/10 6:35 PM
COMPLAINT against Antonio Brown. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11971953, filed by Britney Taylor.(Haas, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet