New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Shelley C Chapman
Case #: 1:14-bk-10641
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2014
Creditor Meeting:Nov 01, 2016
Terminated:May 10, 2022

Debtor
Jacoby & Meyers - Bankruptcy, LLP
420 Lexington Ave Rm 2132
New York, NY 10170-2199
Represented By
Michael L. Moskowitz
Weltman & Moskowitz, LLP
contact info
Mark A. Frankel
Backenroth Frankel & Krinsky, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Defendant
Shobhana Kasturi
Represented By
Edward L. Schnitzer
Hahn & Hessen LLP
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
Lisa J. Kristal
Represented By
Fred Stevens
Klestadt & Winters, LLP
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
Renee F. Frank
Represented By
Fred Stevens
Klestadt & Winters, LLP
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
Wm. Ward Saxton
Represented By
Fred Stevens
Klestadt & Winters, LLP
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
The Law Offices of Andrew Magdy, LLC
Represented By
Fred Stevens
Klestadt & Winters, LLP
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
The Law Offices of Steven Long, LLC
Represented By
Fred Stevens
Klestadt & Winters, LLP
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
LegalZoom.com Inc.
Represented By
Fred Stevens
Klestadt & Winters, LLP
contact info
Andrew V. Jablon
Resch Polster & Berger LLP
contact info
Trustee
Jil Mazer-Marino
Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, P.C. 990 Stewart Avenue Suite 300 P.O. Box 9194
Garden City, NY 11530
Represented By
Jil Mazer-Marino
Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, P.C.
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10004


1. Jacoby & Meyers Bankruptcy liquidation stays alive -U.S. judge (reuters.com)
Submitted Wed 05/28/2014
Docket last updated: 03/14/2014 11:46 AM EDT
Friday, March 14, 2014
1 1 8 pgs Involuntary Petition (Chapter 7) Against: Jacoby & Meyers - Bankruptcy, LLP. Filed by Petitioning Creditor(s): Lisa J. Kristal (attorney Fred Stevens), Renee F. Frank (attorney Fred Stevens), Wm. Ward Saxton (attorney Fred Stevens), The Law Offices of Andrew Magdy, LLC (attorney Fred Stevens), The Law Offices of Steven Long, LLC (attorney Fred Stevens), LegalZoom.com Inc. (attorney Fred Stevens). (Stevens, Fred)
Related: [-]