Utah Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joel T Marker
Case #: 2:14-bk-22424
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2014
Creditor Meeting:Apr 17, 2014
Dismissed:Sep 11, 2014
Terminated:Jan 26, 2016

Debtor
Whipple Service Champions, Plumbing, Heating, & Air Conditioning, LLC
2856 Wood Hollow Way
Bountiful, UT 84010-1238
Represented By
J. David Milliner
J.D. Milliner & Associataes, P.C.
contact info
Joshua M Green
J.D. Milliner & Associates
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Stephen W. Rupp tr
15 West South Temple, Suite 1000
Salt Lake City, UT 84101
Represented By
Mark C. Rose
Mckay, Burton & Thurman, P.C.
contact info
Stephen W. Rupp
Mckay Burton & Thurman
contact info
Trustee
Duane H. Gillman tr
Durham Jones & Pinegar 111 East Broadway Suite 900 P.O. Box 4050
Salt Lake City, UT 84110
Represented By
Duane H. Gillman
Durham Jones & Pinegar
contact info
Kenneth L. Cannon, II
Durham Jones & Pinegar, P.C.
contact info
Penrod W. Keith
Durham Jones & Pinegar
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Ken Garff Bldg. 405 South Main Street Suite 300
Salt Lake City, UT 84111
Represented By
James Vincent Cameron tr
Office Of United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/14/2014 12:15 PM MDT
Thursday, March 13, 2014
Creditor(s) uploaded (27 creditors). (Green, Joshua) (EOD: 03/13/2014)
Related: [-]
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 14-22424 [misc,volp7a] ( 306.00). Receipt number 14255000, amount 306.00. (U.S. Treasury) (EOD: 03/13/2014)
Related: [-]
Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Stephen W. Rupp tr, with 341(a) meeting to be held on 04/17/2014 at 405 South Main. (EOD: 03/13/2014)
Related: [-]
1 1 Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition. Filed by Whipple Service Champions, Plumbing, Heating, & Air Conditioning, LLC (Green, Joshua) (EOD: 03/13/2014)
Related: [-]
2 2 Statement of Financial Affairs and Schedules Filed by Whipple Service Champions, Plumbing, Heating, & Air Conditioning, LLC (Green, Joshua) (EOD: 03/13/2014)
Related: [-]