Keilee Fant, et al v. City of Ferguson
Original Case: 4:15-cv-00253
Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-02939 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 10, 2019 |
Terminated: | Oct 10, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 22, 2023 9:41 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellant
City of Ferguson, Missouri
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tonya DeBerry
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Keilee Fant, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Roelif Carter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Allison Nelson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Herbert Nelson, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Alfred Morris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Anthony Kimble
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Donyale Thomas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Shameika Morris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Daniel Jenkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Ronnie Tucker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
John R. Narayan, personal representative of the estate of Tony DeBerry, Deceased
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 02/22/2023 9:41 AM CST |
Tuesday, September 10, 2019 | ||
7 pgs Civil case docketed. [4828538] 19-2939 (AEV) | ||
2
pgs
BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 10/21/2019. BRIEF APPELLANT, City of Ferguson due 10/30/2019. Appendix due 10/30/2019 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4828542] 19-2939 (AEV) |
||
30+ pgs Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Memorandum and Order 8/6/19, docket entries, [4828548] 19-2939 (AEV) | ||
1 pgs APPEARANCE filed by John M. Reeves for Appellant City of Ferguson w/service 09/10/2019 [4828617] 19-2939 (JMR) | ||
2 pgs Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant City of Ferguson. No Transcript[4828673] 19-2939 (JMR) | ||
3 pgs STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant City of Ferguson - w/service 09/10/2019. [4828830] 19-2939 (JMR) |