New York Southern District Court
Judge:Vernon S Broderick
Case #: 1:19-cv-08456
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:451 Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2019
Terminated:Jul 10, 2020
Last checked: Monday Mar 09, 2020 5:40 AM EDT
Defendant
Chinese American Planning Council, Inc.
Represented By
Kenneth Harold Kirschner
Hogan Lovells Us Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Wayne Ho
Represented By
Kenneth Harold Kirschner
Hogan Lovells Us Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Ming Guang Hu
Represented By
Kenneth Harold Kirschner
Hogan Lovells Us Llp (nyc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Emi Iwaida
Represented By
David Harry Rosenberg
Leeds Brown Law PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, July 10, 2020
17 17 1 pgs order Order of Discontinuance Fri 07/10 2:57 PM
ORDER: It has been reported to the Court that this case was successfully mediated. Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that the above-captioned action is discontinued without costs to any party and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's docket if the application to restore the action is made within thirty (30) days. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 7/10/2020) (rro)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 28, 2020
minutes Mediation Conference Fri 06/05 9:36 AM
Minute Entry Mediation Conference held on 5/28/2020. Mediation Status due by 6/29/2020. (rpr)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 01, 2020
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Fri 06/05 9:34 AM
MEDIATION CONFERENCE RE-SCHEDULED Re-scheduled Mediation Conference scheduled for 5/28/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone conference..(rpr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 30, 2020
minutes Mediation Conference Tue 05/05 5:24 PM
Minute Entry Mediation Conference held on 4/30/2020. Mediation Status due by 6/1/2020. (rpr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 26, 2020
15 15 2 pgs order Order Thu 03/26 6:32 PM
ORDER: In light of the current public health crisis, it is hereby: ORDERED that the initial pre-trial conference set for April 10, 2020, is adjourned sine die. The parties are directed to meet and confer and, within thirty (30) days, submit a joint letter and proposed case management plan and scheduling order for the Court's review. In the parties' joint letter, the parties shall apprise the Court of any case-related issues that warrant immediate attention. The parties shall also update the Court on the status and progress of mediation in this case.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/26/2020) (rro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 25, 2020
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Wed 03/25 9:06 AM
MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED First Mediation Conference scheduled for 4/30/2020 at 10:00 AM in Counsel's Office..(rpr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 19, 2020
adr Mediation Conference Not Held Thu 03/19 3:18 PM
MEDIATION CONFERENCE NOT HELD Mediation Conference scheduled for 3/30/2020 at Counsel's Office was not held. Mediation Status due by 5/1/2020.(ah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2020
14 14 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Tue 02/04 6:40 PM
ORDER AND NOTICE INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/10/2020 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 518, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Vernon S. Broderick. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 2/4/2020) (va)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2020
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Fri 01/24 3:38 PM
MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED First Mediation Conference scheduled for 3/30/2020 at 10:00 AM in Counsel's Office.(ah)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2019
13 13 adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Fri 12/27 10:22 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 1/27/2020.(ah)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2019
12 12 6 pgs order Order of Automatic Referral to Mediation Fri 11/22 1:18 PM
ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 12/2/2019. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2015) (mf)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2019
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/18 6:37 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,. Document filed by Chinese American Planning Council, Inc..(Kirschner, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/18 6:36 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ming Guang Hu.(Kirschner, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/18 6:34 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,. Document filed by Wayne Ho.(Kirschner, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 11/18 6:31 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Chinese-American Planning Council Home Attendant Program, Inc., Other Affiliate CPC HAP Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate CPC Tenant and Building Services, Inc., Other Affiliate CPC One, LLC, Other Affiliate CPC Tribeca Center, Inc., Other Affiliate The Chinatown Planning Council Housing Development Fund Company, Inc., Other Affiliate Nan Shan Local Development Corp., Other Affiliate 16 Dutch Housing Development Fund Corp. for Chinese American Planning Council, Inc.. Document filed by Chinese American Planning Council, Inc..(Kirschner, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2019
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 09/20 4:32 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. All Defendants. Document filed by Emi Iwaida. (Rosenberg, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2019
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 09/13 2:54 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chinese American Planning Council, Inc., Wayne Ho, Ming Guang Hu. (pne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2019
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 09/12 11:00 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chinese American Planning Council, Inc., Ming Guang Hu, and Wayne Ho, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Emi Iwaida. (Rosenberg, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 09/12 10:53 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rosenberg, David)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Thu 09/12 10:14 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney David Harry Rosenberg to RE-FILE re: Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected; Chinese American Planning Council, Inc.; Ming Guang Hu and Wayne Ho must be added to the docket. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Thu 09/12 10:17 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Harry Rosenberg. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Emi Iwaida. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (sj)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Thu 09/12 10:21 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney David Harry Rosenberg to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; PDF should consist of two pages. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Add Party for Pleading Thu 09/12 10:22 AM
ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Chinese American Planning Council, Inc., Ming Guang Hu, Wayne Ho added. Party added pursuant to1 Complaint,.Document filed by Emi Iwaida. Related document:1 Complaint,.(Rosenberg, David)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 09/12 10:36 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 09/12 10:37 AM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 09/12 10:37 AM
Case Designated ECF. (sj)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 09/12 10:38 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David Harry Rosenberg to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; filing court not listed on PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2019
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 09/11 4:40 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rosenberg, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 09/11 4:38 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chinese American Planning Council, Inc., Ming Guang Hu, and Wayne Ho, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Emi Iwaida. (Rosenberg, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/11 4:33 PM
COMPLAINT against Emi Iwaida. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17583465)Document filed by Emi Iwaida.(Rosenberg, David)
Related: [-]