Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Ed Kinkeade
Referred: Paul D Stickney
Case #: 3:14-cv-00952
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2014
Terminated:May 22, 2014
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 10, 2014 9:10 PM CST
Defendant
Dan Guddendorf
Defendant
RepWest Insurance Company
Defendant
U-Haul
Plaintiff
Selina Mae King
8320 Park Ln., No. 220
Dallas, TX 75231


Docket last updated: 30 minutes ago
Friday, May 23, 2014
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9, 10. Fri May 23 08:33:03 CDT 2014 (crt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 22, 2014
10 10 JUDGMENT: It is therefore ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice for want of prosecution pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/22/2014) (skt)
Related: [-]
9 9 Order Adopting8 Findings, Conclusions and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/22/2014) (skt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2014
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Thu May 1 07:38:29 CDT 2014 (crt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2014
8 8 Findings, Conclusions and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge on Case re:7 Judge's Questionnaire. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney on 4/30/2014) (ndt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2014
7 7 Magistrate Judge's Questionnaire sent to Selina Mae King. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney on 3/18/2014) (tln)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS AND SPECIFYING THAT NO FURTHER ACTION BE TAKEN BY THE CLERK PENDING JUDICIAL SCREENING. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney on 3/18/2014) (tln)
Related: [-]
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6,7. Tue Mar 18 15:17:50 CDT 2014 (crt)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2014
5 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Selina Mae King. (tln)
Related: [-]
4 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by Selina Mae King. (tln)
Related: [-]
3 3 COMPLAINT against Dan Guddendorf, U-Haul RepWest Insurance Company filed by Selina Mae King. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] (tln)
Related: [-]
2 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (tln)
Related: [-]
1 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. File to writ clerk/staff attorney. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Stickney (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Stickney). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (tln)
Related: [-]
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Fri Mar 14 16:46:24 CDT 2014 (crt)
Related: [-]