Bond, et al. v. Halcon Energy Properties, Inc.
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 4:14-cv-00566 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2014 |
Terminated: | Apr 15, 2014 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 21, 2015 3:46 PM EST |
Defendant
Halcon Energy Properties, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janet M. Brown
|
|
Defendant
Anne C. Campbell
|
|
Defendant
William R. Campbell
|
|
Defendant
Mary Jo Cox
|
|
Defendant
D. Jean Grosz
|
|
Defendant
Susan K. Jansheski
|
|
Defendant
Clifford J. Tims
|
|
Defendant
James E. Tims
|
|
Defendant
James H. Tims
|
|
Defendant
Joan E. Tims
|
|
Defendant
John V. Tims
|
|
Defendant
Walter J. Tims
|
|
Plaintiff
Bryce Bond
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Bond
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Friday, March 15, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 03/15 11:40 AM
Dismissal Order Plaintiffs14 Amended Complaint does not plead diversity of citizenship so this Court does not have jurisdiction over this action. Further, this case has been closed for almost five years. Plaintiffs cannot simply file an Amended Complaint to re-open a closed case. Should Plaintiffs wish to proceed, they should file a new case and one that alleges a basis for federal jurisdiction. Accordingly, this case is dismissed. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 3/15/2019. (K,K) |
|
Thursday, March 14, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 03/14 12:51 PM
Amended complaint against All Plaintiffs and adding new party defendant(s) Pin Oak Energy Partners. Filed by Bryce Bond, Mary Bond. (Phillips, Molly) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Deed to Property, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Oil and Gas Lease, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Assignment to Halcon, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Proposed Amendment to Oil and Gas Lease, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - DNR Well Completions Report, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Letter from T2 Land Resources, Halcon's Agent, to Plaintiffs | ||
Wednesday, April 16, 2014 | ||
13 | 13 1 pgs Certified copy of order of remand and docket mailed to Mahoning County Court of Common Pleas w/acknowledgement. Related document(s)12 . (C,KA) | |
Tuesday, April 15, 2014 | ||
12 | 12 1 pgs Remand Order . Diversity having been destroyed by the filing of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (ECF #11 ), this case is hereby remanded to the Mahoning County Court of Common Pleas. Judge Dan A. Polster(C,KA) | |
11 | 11 Amended complaint against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) Walter J. Tims, Joan E. Tims, James E. Tims, Susan K. Jansheski, John V. Tims, Mary Jo Cox, Clifford J. Tims, James H. Tims, Janet M. Brown, Anne C. Campbell, D. Jean Grosz, and William R. Campbell. Filed by Bryce Bond. (Phillips, Molly) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Deed to Property, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Oil and Gas Lease, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Assignment to Halcon, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Proposed Amendment to Oil and Gas Lease, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - ODNR Well Completions Report, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Letter from T2 Land Resources, Halcon's Agent, to Plaintiffs | ||
Friday, April 11, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 Minutes of Case Management Conference and Remand Order . Case Management Conference held 4/10/14. The Court directed Plaintiffs to file an amended complaint adding the indispensable defendants. Once defendants added, diversity will be destroyed, and the Court directs the Clerk of Court to remand case to the Mahoning County Court of Common Pleas. Time: 2 hrs. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 4/11/14. (P,R) | |
Tuesday, April 08, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and LR 16.3(b)(3) , parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Halcon Energy Properties, Inc.. (Lutz, Heather) | |
Thursday, April 03, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 Attorney Appearance by Molly Johnson Phillips filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Phillips, Molly) | |
Friday, March 28, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 Notice of Appearance filed by All Plaintiffs. (Johnson, Eric) | |
Monday, March 24, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 21 pgs Case Management Conference Scheduling Order . Case management conference to be held on 4/10/2014 at 1:30 PM at Chambers 18B before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 3/24/14. (P,R) | |
Copy of6 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order mailed to Plaintiff's counsel at 12 W. Main St. Canfield, OH 44406 on 3/24/14. Related document(s)6 . (P,R) | ||
Friday, March 21, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 8 pgs Answer to Complaint filed by Halcon Energy Properties, Inc.. (Lutz, Heather) | |
Monday, March 17, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 4 pgs Defendant Halcon Energy Properties, Inc. Notice of Filing Supplement to Exhibit A to Notice of Removal filed by Halcon Energy Properties, Inc.. Related document(s)1 .(Lutz, Heather) | |
Notice to Attorney Molly Johnson Phillips. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Notice sent to attorney by U.S. Mail on 3/17/2014. Related document(s)1 . (P,G) | ||
Friday, March 14, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (S,L) | |
2 | 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Halcon Energy Properties, Inc.. (Lutz, Heather) | |
1 | 1 Notice of Removal from Mahoning County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2014-CV-287 Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0647-6450008.. Filed by Halcon Energy Properties, Inc.. (Lutz, Heather) | |
Att: 1 68 pgs Exhibit A-Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit B-Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Declaration of Thaddeus Andrews, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Declaration of Michael Hammond, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. (S,L) | ||
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy A. Vecchiarelli. (S,L) |