Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:J P Boulee
Case #: 1:19-cv-04106
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1346(b) Inj or loss property, personal inj, death; US DFT
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2019
Re-opened:Nov 09, 2022
Terminated:Dec 30, 2022
Last checked: Monday Mar 09, 2020 4:40 AM EDT
Defendant
Lawrence Guerra
Represented By
Samuel Williams
contact info
Defendant
Six Unknown FBI Agents
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Samuel Williams
contact info
Darcy F. Coty
contact info
Plaintiff
G.W.
Represented By
Lisa Catherine Lambert
Law Office Of Lisa Lambert
contact info
Jeffrey Filipovits
Filipovits Law, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Curtrina Martin
Represented By
Lisa Catherine Lambert
Law Office Of Lisa Lambert
contact info
Jeffrey Filipovits
Filipovits Law, P.C.
contact info

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, March 03, 2025
151 151 notice Notice of Filing Mon 03/03 9:29 AM
NOTICE of Filing NOA Transmittal Letter by Hilliard Toi Cliatt, Curtrina Martin, G. W. (pjm)
Related: [-]
appeal Appeal Remark Mon 03/03 9:43 AM
Pursuant to Rule 12.7 of the Rules of the Supreme Court of the United States, the Clerk certifies that the record is complete for purposes of143 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit, Case Number 23-10062 Supreme Court of the United States, Case Number 24-362. (pjm)
Related: [-]
appeal Appeal Record Manually Compiled and Sent to USCA Tue 03/04 8:39 AM
Record on Appeal manually compiled and forwarded to the USSC via USPS re:143 Notice of Appeal, filed by Curtrina Martin, G. W., Hilliard Toi Cliatt. (4 large yellow envelopes containing documents not available electronically) (pjm)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
150 150 appeal Forthwith Letter Mon 03/03 8:52 AM
FORTHWITH LETTER from USCA re:143 Notice of Appeal, filed by Curtrina Martin, G. W., Hilliard Toi Cliatt. Case Appealed to USSC Case No. 24-362. Appeal Record due by 3/14/2025. (pjm)
Related: [-]