California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:19-cr-03131
Case Filed:Aug 15, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Sep 14, 2019 1:01 AM PDT
Defendant
Vikram Anilkumar Desai (1)
Represented By
Jose G Badillo
Law Offices Of Jose Garza Badillo
contact info
Defendant
Christopher Lee Kettler (2)
Represented By
Timothy Robert Garrison
contact info
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Material Witness
Juan Carlos Gutierrez-Chaparro
Represented By
Heather L. Beugen
contact info
Material Witness
Manuel Hernandez-Perez
Represented By
Heather L. Beugen
contact info
Material Witness
Jose Luis Jimenez-Sanchez
Represented By
Heather L. Beugen
contact info
Material Witness
Maribel Lopez-Lagunas
Represented By
Heather L. Beugen
contact info
Material Witness
Kevin Alejandro Moreno-Silvestre
Represented By
Heather L. Beugen
contact info
Material Witness
Daniel Palma-Cruz
Represented By
Heather L. Beugen
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Andrew L. Liao
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Ashley E. Goff
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Jan 09 2020
JUDGMENT as to Christopher Lee Kettler (2), Count(s) 1-4, 6, Dismissed by the Government. Count(s) 5, Bureau of Prisons for a period of TIME SERVED, Three(3)Years Supervised Release, Assessment $100.00, Fine waived. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia (jrm)
GPO Aug 18 2020
JUDGMENT as to Vikram Anilkumar Desai (1), Count(s) 1-6, Govt's oral motion to dismiss - granted; Count(s) 1s, BOP for a term of 60 days; Special Assessment $10 Waived; Fine Waived; Count(s) 2s-6s, Probation for a term of three years to be served concurrently. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez (mme)

Docket last updated: 09/14/2019 2:13 AM PDT
Thursday, July 18, 2019
Arrest of Vikram Anilkumar Desai, Christopher Lee Kettler (no document attached) (ccc) [2:19-mj-10106-RBM]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2019
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Vikram Anilkumar Desai, Christopher Lee Kettler. (Copies provided to Counsel in Court). Initial Appearance set for 7/19/2019 in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. Preliminary Hearing set for 8/1/2019 01:30 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. Arraignment set for 8/15/2019 01:30 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro.(ccc) [2:19-mj-10106-RBM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Rap Sheet
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro: Initial Appearance as to Vikram Anilkumar Desai, Christopher Lee Kettler held on 7/19/2019. Appointed Attorney Heather L. Beugen for Material Witnesses Daniel Palma-Cruz, Kevin Alejandro Moreno-Silvestre, Maribel Lopez-Lagunas,Jose Luis Jimenez-Sanchez, Manuel Hernandez-Perez, Juan Carlos Gutierrez-Chaparro,Jose G Badillo for Vikram Anilkumar Desai,Federal Defenders for Christopher Lee Kettler. Bond set as to Vikram Anilkumar Desai (1) $15,000.00 P/S + 1 FRRA and Christopher Lee Kettler (2) $20,000.00 P/S + 1 FRRA + 10% Cash Deposit. Defendant Rule 5 objection denied without prejudice. Preliminary Hearing set for 08/01/19 at 1:30 pm. Arraignment set for 08/15/19 at 1:30 pm. (CD# 7/19/2019 RBM:19-2:08-2:45). (Plaintiff Attorney Andrew Chiang). (Defendant Attorney Jo Anne Tyrell). (tar) [2:19-mj-10106-RBM]
Related: [-]
3 3 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Vikram Anilkumar Desai, Christopher Lee Kettler (no document attached) (tar) [2:19-mj-10106-RBM]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Vikram Anilkumar Desai (1) $15,000.00 P/S. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro on 07/19/19. (mme) [2:19-mj-10106-RBM]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Christopher Lee Kettler (2) $20,000.00 P/S + 1 FRRA + 10% Cash Deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro on 7/19/2019. (smd) [2:19-mj-10106-RBM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2019
6 6 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Vikram Anilkumar Desai, Christopher Lee Kettler: Arraignment of MW set for 7/23/2019 before Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis. (no document attached) (jjg) [2:19-mj-10106-RBM]
Related: [-]
9 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis: Arraignment of Material Witnesses Daniel Palma-Cruz, Kevin Alejandro Moreno-Silvestre, Jose Luis Jimenez-Sanchez, Manuel Hernandez-Perez, Juan Carlos Gutierrez-Chaparro held on 7/23/2019. The Court confirms the appointment of attorney Heather Beugen(n/a). Material Witness bail set as to each at $5,000 PS secured by 1 FRRA w/10% percent cash deposit, M/W must be able to legally remain in the U.S. and follow PTS supervision. (Interpreter Salvador Castellanos). (CD# 7/23/2019 PCL 19-1:3:43-3:54). (Plaintiff Attorney Christopher Alexander AUSA-S/A). (Defendant Attorney n/a). (no document attached) (aje) [2:19-mj-10106-RBM]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Material Witness as to Daniel Palma-Cruz. Material Witness Bond set for $5,000 PS secured by 1 FRRA w/10% percent cash deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 7/23/19. (als) [2:19-mj-10106-RBM]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Material Witness as to Jose Luis Jimenez-Sanchez. Material Witness Bond set for $5,000 PS secured by 1 FRRA w/10% percent cash deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 7/23/19. (als) [2:19-mj-10106-RBM]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Material Witness as to Juan Carlos Gutierrez-Chaparro. Material Witness Bond set for $5,000 PS secured by 1 FRRA w/10% percent cash deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 7/23/19. (als) [2:19-mj-10106-RBM]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Material Witness as to Kevin Alejandro Moreno-Silvestre. Material Witness Bond set for $5,000 PS secured by 1 FRRA w/10% percent cash deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 7/23/19. (als) [2:19-mj-10106-RBM]
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Material Witness as to Manuel Hernandez-Perez. Material Witness Bond set for $5,000 PS secured by 1 FRRA w/10% percent cash deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 7/23/19. (als) [2:19-mj-10106-RBM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2019
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Timothy Robert Garrison appearing for Christopher Lee Kettler (Garrison, Timothy)Attorney Timothy Robert Garrison added to party Christopher Lee Kettler(pty:dft) (jxv). [2:19-mj-10106-RBM]
Related: [-]
8 8 Notice of Assertion of Rights by Christopher Lee Kettler (Garrison, Timothy) (jxv). [2:19-mj-10106-RBM]
Related: [-]
10 10 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Vikram Anilkumar Desai, Christopher Lee Kettler: Arraignment of MW set for 7/24/2019 before Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis. (no document attached) (mxn) [2:19-mj-10106-RBM]
Related: [-]
16 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis: Arraignment of Material Witness Maribel Lopez-Lagunas held on 7/24/2019. The Court confirms the appointment of attorney Heather Beugen(n/a).Material Witness bail set at $5,000 PS secured by 1 FRRA w/10% percent cash deposit, M/W must be able to legally remain in the U.S. and follow PTS supervision. (Interpreter Dan DeCoursey). (CD# 7/24/2019 PCL 19-1:2:56-3:00). (Plaintiff Attorney Christopher Alexander AUSA-S/A). (Defendant Attorney n/a). (no document attached) (aje) [2:19-mj-10106-RBM]
Related: [-]
17 17 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Christopher Lee Kettler. (cdw) [2:19-mj-10106-RBM]
Related: [-]
18 18 P/S Bond Filed as to Christopher Lee Kettler in amount of $ 20,000, Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis. (Document applicable to USA, Christopher Lee Kettler.) (cdw) [2:19-mj-10106-RBM]
Related: [-]
19 19 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Material Witness as to Maribel Lopez-Lagunas. Material Witness Bond set for 5,000 PS secured by 1 FRRA w/10% percent cash deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 7/24/2019. (jrm) [2:19-mj-10106-RBM]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2019
20 20 Order on Stipulated Continuance of a Preliminary Hearing as to Christopher Lee Kettler. Preliminary Hearing set for 8/15/2019 01:30 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro on 7/26/19. (erf) [2:19-mj-10106-RBM]
Related: [-]
21 21 P/S Bond Filed as to Vikram Anilkumar Desai in amount of $ 15,000, Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis. (Document applicable to USA, Vikram Anilkumar Desai.) (als) [2:19-mj-10106-RBM]
Related: [-]
22 22 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Vikram Anilkumar Desai re21 Bond. (als) [2:19-mj-10106-RBM]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2019
23 23 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing Rule 5.1 by Vikram Anilkumar Desai (Badillo, Jose) (jxv). [2:19-mj-10106-RBM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2019
24 24 NOTICE of Vacated Hearing(s) : 8/1/19 Preliminary Hearing vacated, re23 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing Rule 5.1 (no document attached) (ccc) [2:19-mj-10106-RBM]
Related: [-]
25 25 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Andrew L. Liao appearing for USA. (Liao, Andrew)Attorney Andrew L. Liao added to party USA(pty:pla) (smd). [2:19-mj-10106-RBM]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2019
26 26 Pretrial Services Request for Modifying the Conditions of Pretrial Release and Order thereon in case as to Christopher Lee Kettler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro on 8/7/2019. (German, Y.) [2:19-mj-10106-RBM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2019
27 27 INFORMATION as to Vikram Anilkumar Desai (1) count(s) 1-6, Christopher Lee Kettler (2) count(s) 1-6. (jrm)
Related: [-]
28 28 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Vikram Anilkumar Desai (jrm)
Related: [-]
29 29 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Christopher Lee Kettler (jrm)
Related: [-]
30 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro: Arraignment as to Vikram Anilkumar Desai (1) Count 1-6 information and Christopher Lee Kettler (2) Count 1-6 held on 8/15/2019 Not Guilty plea entered. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 9/16/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. The defendant may remain in El Centro and schedule a plea before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. Alternatively, counsel is directed to contact the clerk for Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard if a Change of Plea Hearing needs to be scheduled in San Diego. (CD# 8/15/2019 RBM:19-2:34-2:43). (Plaintiff Attorney Rosario Gonzalez). (Defendant Attorney William Burgener/Eric Studebaker Fish). (no document attached) (tar)
Related: [-]