Purdue Pharma Manufacturing L.P.
Member Case
Lead case is: 7:19-bk-23649
Lead case is: 7:19-bk-23649
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Sean H Lane |
Case #: | 7:19-bk-23651 |
Case Filed: | Sep 15, 2019 |
Type | Partnership |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Purdue Pharma Manufacturing L.P.
One Stamford Forum 201 Tresser Boulevard
Stamford, CT 06901 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 42 minutes ago |
Sunday, July 03, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice
Mon 07/04 12:19 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment . Notice Date 07/03/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, July 01, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Case Reassignment Notice (BNC)
Fri 07/01 3:56 AM
Notice of Case Reassignment From Judge Robert D. Drain to Judge Sean H. Lane. (Gomez, Jessica) |
|
Thursday, November 07, 2019 | ||
misc
Terminate Pending Deadlines
Thu 11/07 11:59 AM
Pending Deadlines for Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual /Schedules of Assets and Liabilities Terminated. (Vargas, Ana) |
||
Friday, November 01, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Statement of Financial Affairs
Fri 11/01 2:54 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual /Statement of Financial Affairs of Purdue Pharma Manufacturing L.P. Filed by Eli J. Vonnegut on behalf of Purdue Pharma Manufacturing L.P.. (Vonnegut, Eli) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Schedules
Fri 11/01 12:09 PM
Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual /Schedules of Assets and Liabilities Purdue Pharma Manufacturing L.P. Filed by Eli J. Vonnegut on behalf of Purdue Pharma Manufacturing L.P.. (Vonnegut, Eli) |
|
Friday, September 20, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
3
pgs
order
Order RE: Application, Extend Time to File Schedules
Fri 09/20 9:05 AM
Order signed on 9/18/2019 Granting Motion Extending the Time to File Schedules of Assets and Liabilities, Schedules of Current Income and Expenditures, Schedules of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases and Statements of Financial Affairs. (Vargas, Ana) |
|
6 | 6
6
pgs
order
Order RE: Application, Appoint
Fri 09/20 9:00 AM
Order signed on 9/18/2019 Granting Application Authorizing Retention and Appointment of Prime Clerk LLC as Claims and Noticing Agent for the Debtors . (Vargas, Ana) |
|
5 | 5
order
Motion, Joint Administration
Fri 09/20 8:55 AM
Order signed on 9/18/2019 Granting Motion Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases. (Vargas, Ana) |
|
misc
Set Deficiency Deadlines
Fri 09/20 8:53 AM
Deficiencies Set: Schedule A/B due 9/30/2019. Schedule D due 9/30/2019. Schedule E/F due 9/30/2019. Schedule G due 9/30/2019. Schedule H due 9/30/2019. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 9/30/2019. Statement of Financial Affairs due 9/30/2019. Incomplete Filings due by 9/30/2019. (Vargas, Ana) |
||
misc
Case Association - Related
Fri 09/20 8:57 AM
JOINTLY ADMINISTERED CHAPTER 11 CASES UNDER 19-23649 rdd Purdue Pharma L.P. (LEAD CASE): 19-23648 rdd Purdue Pharma Inc. 19-23650 rdd Purdue Transdermal Technologies L.P. 19-23652 rdd Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P. 19-23653 rdd Imbrium Therapeutics L.P. 19-23654 rdd Adlon Therapeutics L.P. 19-23655 rdd Greenfield BioVentures L.P. 19-23656 rdd Seven Seas Hill Corp. 19-23657 rdd Ophir Green Corp. 19-23658 rdd Purdue Pharma of Puerto Rico 19-23659 rdd Avrio Health L.P. 19-23660 rdd Purdue Pharmaceutical Products L.P. 19-23661 rdd Purdue Neuroscience Company 19-23662 rdd Nayatt Cove Lifescience Inc. 19-23663 rdd Button Land L.P. 19-23664 rdd Paul Land Inc. 19-23665 rdd Quidnick Land L.P. 19-23666 rdd Rhodes Associates L.P. 19-23667 rdd Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P. 19-23668 rdd Rhodes Technologies 19-23669 rdd UDF LP 19-23670 rdd SVC Pharma LP and 19-23671 rdd SVC Pharma Inc.. (Vargas, Ana) |
||
misc
Add Claims and Noticing Agent
Fri 09/20 9:03 AM
Claims and Noticing Agent, Prime Clerk LLC, added to the case. (Vargas, Ana) |
||
Thursday, September 19, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Application, Appoint
Thu 09/19 1:42 PM
Application to Appoint /Application For An Order Appointing Prime Clerk LLC As Claims And Noticing Agent For The Debtors filed by Eli J. Vonnegut on behalf of Purdue Pharma Manufacturing L.P.. (Vonnegut, Eli) |
|
Tuesday, September 17, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Application, Extend Time to File Schedules
Tue 09/17 5:30 PM
Application to Extend Time to File Schedules / Debtors' Motion for an Order Extending the Time to File Schedules of Assets and Liabilities, Schedules of Current Income and Expenditures, Schedules of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases and Statements of Financial Affairs filed by Eli J. Vonnegut on behalf of Purdue Pharma Manufacturing L.P.. (Vonnegut, Eli) |
|
Monday, September 16, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Motion, Joint Administration
Mon 09/16 12:40 AM
Motion for Joint Administration /Motion of Debtors for Entry of an Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases filed by Eli J. Vonnegut on behalf of Purdue Pharma Manufacturing L.P.. (Vonnegut, Eli) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Mon 09/16 12:28 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 19-23651 ) [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A13420566. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Sunday, September 15, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
24
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Sun 09/15 11:57 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Filed by Marshall Scott Huebner of Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP on behalf of Purdue Pharma Manufacturing L.P.. (Huebner, Marshall) |