Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-11416

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John K Sherwood
Case #: 2:19-ap-02137
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2019
Terminated:Jun 10, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Fannie Mae
3900 Wisconsin Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20016
Represented By
Fannie Mae
contact info
Plaintiff
Ariel Barel
114 Warbler Drive
Wayne, NJ 07470
Represented By
Ariel Barel
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Thursday, June 10, 2021
utility Close Adversary Case Thu 06/10 1:41 PM
Adversary Case (2:19-ap-2137) Closed. (zlh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 30, 2021
21 21 order District Court re: Appeal Thu 04/01 11:30 AM
COPY OF DISTRICT COURT ORDER AND MEMORANDUM DISMISSING NOTICE OF APPEAL, Signed by United States District Court Judge Peter G. Sheridan Related [+]. Signed on 3/30/2021. (jpp)
Related: [-] CA#20-CV-00501-PGS8 Notice of Appeal filed by Ariel Barel
Att: 1 Memorandum
Wednesday, December 09, 2020
court Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney - multi Fri 12/11 9:46 AM
The motion to withdraw as attorney filed by Sherri Smith, Esq. is approved as to both the attorney and the law firm of Phelan, Hallinan, Diamond and Jones, PC. So Ordered by Chief Judge Michael B. Kaplan on 12/9/2020.. (mhh)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 06, 2020
utility Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Remark-Multi Case (SS) Fri 11/06 8:05 AM
A motion to withdraw as attorney has been filed by Sherri Smith, Esq. and will be heard by Chief Judge Michael B. Kaplan on December 9, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. Any objection must be filed 7 days prior to the hearing date. If no objection is filed, Sherri Smith will be terminated from the case. See Case Number 20-18852 for motion documents (document number 21 ).. (mhh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 22, 2020
20 20 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Wed 09/23 3:09 PM
COPY OF DISTRICT COURT ORDER CONSOLIDATING APPELLANT'S FOUR APPEALS FROM THE DECISIONS OF THE U.S. BANKRUPTCY COURT; CIVIL ACTION NOS. 19-CV-16054, 20-CV-00488, 20-CV-00501 AND 20-CV-10695 WILL BE CONSOLIDATED UNDER CIVIL ACTION NO. 19-CV-16054 FOR ALL PURPOSES Signed by United States District Court Judge Peter G. Sheridan Related [+]. Signed on 9/22/2020. (jpp)
Related: [-] 8 Notice of Appeal filed by Plaintiff Ariel Barel - CA#20-CV-00501-PGS
Monday, July 27, 2020
order Text Order Tue 07/28 10:24 AM
DISTRICT COURT TEXT ORDER REALLOCATING AND REASSIGNING CASE. Case reallocated to Trenton and reassigned to Judge Peter G. Sheridan for all further proceedings. Judge Esther Salas no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 7/27/2020. (CA# 20-cv-00501) (jpp)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2020
utility Terminate Deadline Fri 02/14 11:43 AM
Appeal Deadline Terminated, Reason: Transmitted to District Court (lc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2020
19 19 appeal Appellee's Designation of Record - Counter Designation Mon 02/10 4:52 PM
Appellee's Designation of Record Related [+] Filed by Fannie Mae. (Smith, Sherri)
Related: [-] 8 Notice of Appeal filed by Plaintiff Ariel Barel
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, February 05, 2020
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Thu 02/06 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/05/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2020
17 17 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 02/03 5:55 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 2/3/2020. (mg)
Related: [-] 4
Thursday, January 30, 2020
16 16 misc Certificate of Service Thu 01/30 2:22 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Sherri Jennifer Smith on behalf of Fannie Mae. (Smith, Sherri)
Related: [-] 4 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Fannie Mae.Hearing scheduled for 12/17/2019 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Notice of Hearing # 3 Brief # 4 EXHIBIT A # 5 EXHIBIT B # 6 EXHIBIT C # 7 EXHIBIT D # 8 EXHIBIT E # 9 EXHIBIT F # 10 EXHIBIT G # 11 EXHIBIT H # 12 EXHIBIT I # 13 EXHIBIT J # 14 EXHIBIT K # 15 EXHIBIT L # 16 EXHIBIT M # 17 EXHIBIT N # 18 EXHIBIT O # 19 EXHIBIT P # 20 EXHIBIT Q # 21 EXHIBIT R # 22 EXHIBIT S # 23 EXHIBIT T) filed by Defendant Fannie Mae
Tuesday, January 28, 2020
15 15 appeal Designation of Record Wed 01/29 7:53 AM
Designation of Record On Appeal Related [+], Statement of Issues on Appeal Filed by Ariel Barel. Transmission of Record due 2/11/2020. Appellee designation due by 2/11/2020. (smz)
Related: [-] 8 Notice of Appeal filed by Plaintiff Ariel Barel8 Notice of Appeal filed by Plaintiff Ariel Barel
Sunday, January 26, 2020
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Mon 01/27 12:41 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/26/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2020
13 13 order Application (Generic) Fri 01/24 12:26 PM
Order Concerning Application to Waive Appeal Fee. Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 1/24/2020. (zlh)
Related: [-] 9
Tuesday, January 21, 2020
12 12 appeal Designation of Record Fri 01/24 11:36 AM
Designation of Record On Appeal Related [+], Statement of Issues on Appeal Filed by Ariel Barel. Transmission of Record due 2/4/2020. Appellee designation due by 2/4/2020. (lc)
Related: [-] 8 Notice of Appeal filed by Plaintiff Ariel Barel8 Notice of Appeal filed by Plaintiff Ariel Barel
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, January 16, 2020
11 11 court Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal Thu 01/16 8:54 AM
Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal to District Court. Case Number: 20-cv-00501. Related [+]. Judge Esther Salas assigned. (nrf)
Related: [-] 8 Notice of Appeal filed by Plaintiff Ariel Barel
Wednesday, January 15, 2020
10 10 court Transmittal of Record on Appeal Wed 01/15 12:27 PM
Transmittal of Record on Appeal to U.S. District Court Related [+] (smz)
Related: [-] 8 Notice of Appeal filed by Plaintiff Ariel Barel
utility Terminate Deadline Wed 01/15 8:53 AM
Waiver Deadline Terminated, (smz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2020
9 9 motion Application (Generic) - Only use if no other event is applicable Tue 01/14 5:21 PM
Application re: Waive the fee for Notice of Appeal Filed by Ariel Barel. (smz) Modified Text on 1/15/2020 (smz)
Related: [-]
8 8 appeal Notice of Appeal (Fee) Tue 01/14 5:18 PM
Notice of Appeal to Court. Receipt Number unpaid, Fee Amount $ 298. Filed by Ariel Barel. Appellant Designation due by 1/28/2020. Transmission of Designation Due by 2/13/2020. (smz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2020
court Hearing Held Wed 01/15 10:49 AM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME:Motion to dismiss granted Related [+] (mg)
Related: [-] 4 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Fannie Mae
court Hearing Held Wed 01/15 11:33 AM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Motion to dismiss granted Related [+] (mg)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Monday, December 30, 2019
7 7 misc Document Fri 01/03 5:54 PM
Document re: Declaration of Ariel Barel Correction of an Oversight filed by Ariel Barel. (smz)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2019
6 6 answer Opposition Mon 12/30 9:41 AM
Plaintiff's Opposition to Related [+] filed by Ariel Barel. (zlh)
Related: [-] 4 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Fannie Mae.Hearing scheduled for 12/17/2019 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark filed by Defendant Fannie Mae
Thursday, December 12, 2019
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Thu 12/12 8:34 AM
Hearing Rescheduled from 12/17/2019 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 01/07/2020 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (zlh)
Related: [-] 4 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Fannie Mae
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Thu 12/12 8:45 AM
Hearing Rescheduled from 12/17/2019 Related [+] Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 01/07/2020 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (zlh)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Tuesday, December 10, 2019
5 5 misc Document Thu 12/12 8:11 AM
Document re: Plaintiff's request for and Adjournment Related [+] filed by Ariel Barel. (dlr)
Related: [-] 4 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Fannie Mae
Wednesday, October 16, 2019
4 4 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 10/16 6:23 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Fannie Mae.Hearing scheduled for 12/17/2019 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (Rogers, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Att: 2 Notice of Hearing
Att: 3 Brief
Att: 4 EXHIBIT A
Att: 5 EXHIBIT B
Att: 6 EXHIBIT C
Att: 7 EXHIBIT D
Att: 8 EXHIBIT E
Att: 9 EXHIBIT F
Att: 10 EXHIBIT G
Att: 11 EXHIBIT H
Att: 12 EXHIBIT I
Att: 13 EXHIBIT J
Att: 14 EXHIBIT K
Att: 15 EXHIBIT L
Att: 16 EXHIBIT M
Att: 17 EXHIBIT N
Att: 18 EXHIBIT O
Att: 19 EXHIBIT P
Att: 20 EXHIBIT Q
Att: 21 EXHIBIT R
Att: 22 EXHIBIT S
Att: 23 EXHIBIT T
Monday, September 30, 2019
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Mon 09/30 5:36 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Ariel Barel. (dlr)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued to Ariel Barel for Service on Fannie Mae Answer due on 10/17/2019 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 12/17/2019 at 02:00 PM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (Attachments: # 1 Pre Trial Instructions) (dlr)
Tuesday, September 17, 2019
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 09/17 5:44 PM
Summons Issued to Ariel Barel for Service on Fannie Mae Answer due on 10/17/2019 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 12/17/2019 at 02:00 PM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (dlr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pre Trial Instructions
Thursday, September 12, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/16 11:09 AM
Adversary case 19-02137 Complaint by Ariel Barel against Fannie Mae. Receipt Number 000000, Fee Amount $ 350. (Debtor's Adversary. (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (dlr)
Related: [-]