Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-44673

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mark X Mullin
Case #: 4:19-ap-04097
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2019
Terminated:Oct 07, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
James W. Forshee
141 Holly Hills Rd.
Franklin, KY 42134
Represented By
James W. Forshee
contact info
Plaintiff
Springfield Health Facilities, L.P.
5420 W. Plano Parkway Suite 210
Plano, TX 75093
Represented By
Mark C. Moore
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:10 PM CDT
Monday, October 07, 2019
4 4 notice Notice of dismissal or stipulated dismissal in an adversary proceeding Mon 10/07 12:45 PM
Notice of dismissal in an adversary proceeding filed by Plaintiff Springfield Health Facilities, L.P.. (Moore, Mark)
Related: [-]
court Close adversary case Mon 10/07 4:18 PM
Adversary case 4:19-ap-4097 closed (Spelmon, T)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2019
3 3 court Summons issued Mon 09/16 12:27 PM
Summons issued on James W. Forshee Answer Due 10/16/2019 (Calfee, J.)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding Mon 09/16 12:25 PM
Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call Related [+]. Trial Docket Call date set for 2/27/2020 at 09:00 AM at Ft. Worth, Judge Mullin's Ctrm.. Entered on 9/16/2019 (Calfee, J.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Springfield Health Facilities, L.P.
Friday, September 13, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/13 5:47 PM
Adversary case 19-04097 Complaint by Springfield Health Facilities, L.P. against James W. Forshee. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 12 Related [+]. 13. 14. (Moore, Mark)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Cover Sheet