Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-44673

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mark X Mullin
Case #: 4:19-ap-04098
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2019
Terminated:Mar 18, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Jeffrey T. Sampson
450 S 3rd St.
Louisville, KY 40202
Represented By
Jeffrey T. Sampson
contact info
Plaintiff
Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P.
5420 W Plano Parkway Suite 210
Plano, TX 75093
Represented By
Mark C. Moore
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:10 PM CDT
Wednesday, March 18, 2020
court Close adversary case Wed 03/18 4:07 PM
Adversary case 4:19-ap-4098 closed (Spelmon, T)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 29, 2020
14 14 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Sat 02/29 11:26 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 02/29/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order dismissing case without prejudice. Entered on 2/27/2020
Thursday, February 27, 2020
13 13 order Dismiss case Thu 02/27 11:40 AM
Order dismissing case without prejudice. Entered on 2/27/2020 (Chambers, Deanna)
Related: [-]
court Hearing held Thu 02/27 10:19 AM
Hearing held on 2/27/2020. Related [+] ***TO BE DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION*** (Rueter, Karyn)
Related: [-] 4 Amended complaint by Mark C. Moore on behalf of Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P. against Sheila Meyers, as administratrix of the Estate of David Clark, Jeffrey T. Sampson No change to nature of suit. (RE: related document(s)1 Adversary case 19-04098 Complaint by Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P. against Jeffrey T. Sampson. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Cover Sheet). Nature(s) of suit: 12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference). 13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer). 14 (Recovery of money/property - other). filed by Plaintiff Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Amended Cover Sheet) filed by Plaintiff Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P.
Saturday, February 22, 2020
12 12 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Sat 02/22 11:27 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/22/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order denying motion to dismiss adversary proceeding (related document8 ) Entered on 2/20/2020.
Thursday, February 20, 2020
11 11 order Dismiss adversary proceeding Thu 02/20 4:05 PM
Order denying motion to dismiss adversary proceeding Related [+] Entered on 2/20/2020. (Chambers, Deanna)
Related: [-] 8
Tuesday, January 14, 2020
court Hearing not held Tue 01/14 10:44 AM
Hearing NOT held on 1/14/2020. Related [+] - NO PARTY APPEARED - (Calfee, J.)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding filed by Defendant Jeffrey T. Sampson filed by Defendant Jeffrey T. Sampson
Tuesday, November 12, 2019
10 10 notice Notice of hearing Tue 11/12 1:48 PM
Amended Notice of hearing filed by Defendant Jeffrey T. Sampson Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 1/14/2020 at 10:00 AM Ft. Worth, Judge Mullin's Ctrm. for8 , (Bower, Alice)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding filed by Defendant Jeffrey T. Sampson
Monday, November 11, 2019
9 9 notice Notice of hearing Mon 11/11 8:50 AM
Notice of Trial hearing (HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS) filed by Defendant Jeffrey T. Sampson Related [+]. Trial date set for 1/14/2020 at 10:00 AM at Ft. Worth, Judge Mullin's Ctrm.. (Bower, Alice)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding filed by Defendant Jeffrey T. Sampson
Thursday, November 07, 2019
8 8 motion Dismiss adversary proceeding Thu 11/07 4:56 PM
Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding filed by Defendant Jeffrey T. Sampson (Bower, Alice)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2019
7 7 cmp Summons service executed Mon 11/04 5:21 PM
Summons service executed on Jeffrey T. Sampson 10/25/2019 (Moore, Mark)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Summons service executed Mon 11/04 5:20 PM
Summons service executed on Sheila Meyers, as administratrix of the Estate of David Clark 10/25/2019 (Moore, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2019
5 5 court Summons issued Tue 10/15 12:33 PM
Summons issued on Sheila Meyers, as administratrix of the Estate of David Clark Answer Due 11/14/2019 (Calfee, J.)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2019
4 4 cmp Amended complaint Mon 10/14 3:50 PM
Amended complaint by Mark C. Moore on behalf of Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P. against Sheila Meyers, as administratrix of the Estate of David Clark, Jeffrey T. Sampson No change to nature of suit. Related [+]. (Moore, Mark)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 19-04098 Complaint by Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P. against Jeffrey T. Sampson. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Cover Sheet). Nature(s) of suit: 12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference). 13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer). 14 (Recovery of money/property - other). filed by Plaintiff Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P.
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Amended Cover Sheet
Monday, September 16, 2019
3 3 court Summons issued Mon 09/16 12:29 PM
Summons issued on Jeffrey T. Sampson Answer Due 10/16/2019 (Calfee, J.)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding Mon 09/16 12:28 PM
Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call Related [+]. Trial Docket Call date set for 2/27/2020 at 09:00 AM at Ft. Worth, Judge Mullin's Ctrm.. Entered on 9/16/2019 (Calfee, J.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P.
Friday, September 13, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/13 5:50 PM
Adversary case 19-04098 Complaint by Elizabethtown Health Facilities, L.P. against Jeffrey T. Sampson. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 12 Related [+]. 13. 14. (Moore, Mark)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Cover Sheet