Mississippi Southern District Court
Judge:Daniel P Jordan, III
Referred: F Keith Ball
Case #: 3:19-cv-00663
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Sep 16, 2019
Terminated:Sep 29, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Mar 14, 2020 4:57 AM CDT
Defendant
City of Pearl, Mississippi
Represented By
Mallory K. Bland
Phelps Dunbar, Llp - Jackson
contact info
Gregory Todd Butler
Phelps Dunbar, Llp - Jackson
contact info
Plaintiff
David McCarley
Represented By
Shirley Payne
Horn & Payne, PLLC
contact info
Dennis L. Horn
Horn & Payne, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, September 29, 2020
41 41 1 pgs order Order Tue 09/29 2:32 PM
AGREED JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL: This case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to all parties and all claims, with the parties to bear their own costs. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on September 29, 2020. (SP)
Related: [-]
40 40 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 09/29 1:34 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by City of Pearl, Mississippi (Butler, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2020
39 39 discov Notice of Service of Disclosure Mon 09/21 2:28 PM
NOTICE of Service of Fourth Supplemental Disclosure by City of Pearl, Mississippi (Bland, Mallory)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 18, 2020
38 38 discov Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories Fri 09/18 2:44 PM
NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Supplemental Response to Interrogatory No. 2 Propounded to Plaintiff Response to Interrogatories by David McCarley (Horn, Dennis)
Related: [-]
37 37 discov Notice of Service of Disclosure Fri 09/18 2:42 PM
NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Third Supplemental Disclosure by David McCarley (Horn, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 08, 2020
36 36 discov Notice of Service of Disclosure Tue 09/08 9:30 AM
NOTICE of Service of Third Supplemental Disclosure by City of Pearl, Mississippi (Bland, Mallory)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
35 35 discov Notice of Service of Disclosure Wed 09/02 4:36 PM
NOTICE of Service of Second Supplemental Pre-Discovery Disclosure by City of Pearl, Mississippi (Bland, Mallory)
Related: [-]
34 34 discov Notice to Take Deposition Wed 09/02 12:07 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Lt. Bryant Ellis, Casey Foy, John McHenry, James Thompson, Mayor Jake Windham, and Chief of Police Dean Scott by David McCarley (Horn, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2020
33 33 discov Notice of Service of Disclosure Mon 08/31 9:56 AM
NOTICE of Service of Second Supplemental Disclosure by David McCarley (Horn, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 28, 2020
32 32 discov Notice of Service of Disclosure Fri 08/28 4:47 PM
NOTICE of Service of First Supplemental Disclosure by David McCarley (Horn, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 25, 2020
31 31 discov Notice to Take Deposition Tue 08/25 3:45 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Lt. Bryant Ellis, Casey Foy, John McHenry, and James Thompson by David McCarley (Horn, Dennis)
Related: [-]
30 30 discov Notice to Take Deposition Tue 08/25 2:53 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Plaintiff, David McCarley by City of Pearl, Mississippi (Bland, Mallory)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 06, 2020
order Order on Motion to Extend Deadline Mon 07/06 11:59 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting29 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines. Jury Trial set for a two-week term commencing 3/15/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5A (Jackson) before Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III; Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2021, time to be determined, in Chambers 5.750 (Jackson) before Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III; Discovery due by 9/21/2020; Motions due by 10/5/2020; ADR Report due by 2/5/2021. The settlement conference remains scheduled for 10/6/2020; however, the parties are free to contact the the chambers of Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball if they would like to discuss rescheduling the settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 7/6/2020. (dcw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 02, 2020
29 29 motion Extend Deadline Thu 07/02 4:32 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Extend discovery deadline to September 21, 2020 and motions deadline to October 5, 2020 Deadline (discovery deadline currently August 5, 2020, and motions deadline currently August 19, 2020) by David McCarley (Horn, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 25, 2020
28 28 discov Notice of Service of Disclosure Thu 06/25 1:11 PM
NOTICE of Service of (First Supplemental) Disclosure by City of Pearl, Mississippi (Bland, Mallory)
Related: [-]
27 27 discov Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production Thu 06/25 1:09 PM
NOTICE of Service of (Second Set) Response to Request for Production by City of Pearl, Mississippi (Bland, Mallory)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 27, 2020
26 26 discov Notice of Service of Request for Production Wed 05/27 4:44 PM
NOTICE of Service of Second Request for Production by David McCarley (Horn, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 22, 2020
25 25 discov Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories Wed 04/22 3:23 PM
NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Response to Defendant's Interrogatories Nos. 10, 11, 12, 13, and 23 Propounded to Plaintiff Response to Interrogatories by David McCarley (Horn, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 15, 2020
order Order Wed 04/15 3:23 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER cancelling telephonic discovery conference set for April 16, 2020. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 4/15/2020. (JEJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 13, 2020
utility Set/Reset Hearings Mon 04/13 2:40 PM
Set Hearing: Telephonic Discovery Conference set for 4/16/2020 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. Counsel for Defendant shall set up the conference and contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 23, 2020
24 24 discov Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production Mon 03/23 8:04 AM
NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Response to Request for Production by David McCarley (Horn, Dennis)
Related: [-]
23 23 discov Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories Mon 03/23 8:03 AM
NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Response to Interrogatories by David McCarley (Horn, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 13, 2020
22 22 discov Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production Fri 03/13 11:22 AM
NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by City of Pearl, Mississippi (Bland, Mallory)
Related: [-]
21 21 discov Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories Fri 03/13 11:19 AM
NOTICE of Service of Response to Interrogatories by City of Pearl, Mississippi (Bland, Mallory)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 05, 2020
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 03/05 8:31 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting Unopposed Motion20 for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Plaintiff David McCarley's responses to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents are due March 23, 2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 3/5/2020. (dcw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 04, 2020
20 20 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 03/04 2:25 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery until March 23, 2020, in which to serve his Responses to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents by David McCarley (Horn, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2020
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 02/28 11:23 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting Unopposed Motion19 for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests. The City of Pearl, Mississippi's responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and First Set of Requests for Production of Documents are due by 3/13/2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 2/28/2020. (dcw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2020
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 02/27 2:19 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to13 Notice of Service of Interrogatories,14 Notice of Service of Request for Production by City of Pearl, Mississippi (Bland, Mallory)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
18 18 discov Notice of Service of Response to Request for Admissions Wed 02/26 1:55 PM
NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Admissions by City of Pearl, Mississippi (Bland, Mallory)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2020
17 17 discov Notice of Service of Request for Production Thu 02/06 1:47 PM
NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by City of Pearl, Mississippi (Bland, Mallory)
Related: [-]
16 16 discov Notice of Service of Interrogatories Thu 02/06 1:45 PM
NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by City of Pearl, Mississippi (Bland, Mallory)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2020
15 15 discov Notice of Service of Request for Admissions Thu 01/30 2:42 PM
NOTICE of Service of Request for Admissions by David McCarley (Horn, Dennis)
Related: [-]
14 14 discov Notice of Service of Request for Production Thu 01/30 2:41 PM
NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by David McCarley (Horn, Dennis)
Related: [-]
13 13 discov Notice of Service of Interrogatories Thu 01/30 2:40 PM
NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by David McCarley (Horn, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2020
12 12 order Case Management Order Thu 01/16 2:56 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Jury Trial set for a two-week term of court commencing 1/19/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5A (Jackson) Jordan before Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III; Pretrial Conference set for 12/11/2020, time to be determined, in Chambers 5.750 (Jackson) Jordan before Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III; Discovery due by 8/5/2020; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 2/14/2020; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 2/14/2020; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 5/5/2020; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 6/5/2020; Motions due by 8/19/2020; Settlement Conference set for 10/6/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5D (Jackson) Ball before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. Seven (7) days before the settlement conference, the parties must submit via e-mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov an updated CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT MEMORANDUM. All parties, including a person with full settlement authority, are required to be present at the conference unless excused by the Court. If a party believes the scheduled settlement conference would not be productive and should be cancelled, the party is directed to inform the Court via e-mail of the grounds for their belief at least seven (7) days prior to the conference. ADR Report due by 12/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 1/16/2020. (JEJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2020
minutes Telephonic Case Management Conference Thu 01/16 2:29 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 1/15/2020 in Jackson, MS. Appearing: Shirley Payne and Mallory Bland. (JEJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2020
11 11 discov Notice of Service of Disclosure Tue 01/14 4:02 PM
NOTICE of Service of Pre-Discovery Disclosure by City of Pearl, Mississippi (Bland, Mallory)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2020
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/09 12:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Shirley Payne on behalf of David McCarley (Payne, Shirley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2020
9 9 discov Notice of Service of Disclosure Wed 01/08 5:22 PM
NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosure by David McCarley (Horn, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2019
8 8 notice Rule 16(a) Initial Order Fri 11/15 2:14 PM
Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/15/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2019
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 11/13 11:31 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint (and Affirmative Defenses) by City of Pearl, Mississippi.(Bland, Mallory)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2019
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 09/27 10:29 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. City of Pearl, Mississippi answer due 11/14/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 9/27/2019. (dcw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2019
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/26 5:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Todd Butler on behalf of City of Pearl, Mississippi (Butler, Gregory)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 09/26 5:06 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by City of Pearl, Mississippi (Bland, Mallory)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/26 5:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mallory K. Bland on behalf of City of Pearl, Mississippi (Bland, Mallory)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2019
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/25 10:38 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by David McCarley. City of Pearl, Mississippi served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Horn, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2019
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 09/16 12:23 PM
Summons Issued as to City of Pearl, Mississippi. (KNS)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/16 12:22 PM
COMPLAINT against City of Pearl, Mississippi ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4089289), filed by David McCarley.(KNS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet