Montia Sabbag v. Kevin Hart et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Percy Anderson |
Referred: | Paul L Abrams |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-07999 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Sep 16, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 01, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 14, 2020 3:51 AM PDT |
Defendant
Kevin Hart
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jonathan Todd Jackson
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Fameoulous Ent, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Ashley M. Germon
|
|
Defendant
Nevada Property 1 LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Montia Sabbag
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
The Cosmopolitan of Las Vegas
Terminated: 12/16/2019
|
|
Defendant
Marriott International, Inc
Terminated: 12/16/2019
|
|
Defendant
The Blackstone Group, Inc
Terminated: 12/16/2019
|
1. | Kevin Hart's Sex Tape Partner Refiles Lawsuit After Dismissal (radaronline.com) |
Submitted Tue 10/01/2019 | |
2. | Kevin Hart faces $60 million lawsuit over 2017 Las Vegas hotel room recording (usatoday.com) |
Submitted Tue 09/17/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, May 01, 2020 | ||
105 | 105
![]() JUDGMENT by Judge Percy Anderson, Related to: Stipulation to Dismiss Party104 . Pursuant to the Court's April 17, 2020 Order dismissing this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that this action is dismissed without prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (mrgo) |