Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:19-cv-02607
Nature of Suit245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability
Cause28:1442 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2019
Case in other court:New York Northern, 1:19-cv-01050
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 10, 2020 4:52 AM EDT
Defendant
3M Company
Represented By
Andrew Jonathan Calica
Mayer Brown
contact info
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086
Represented By
Ellen Nunno Corbo
Burns White LLC
contact info
Scott M Press
Goldberg Segalla LLP
contact info
George H Buermann
Goldberg Segalla LLP
contact info
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Represented By
Michael S. Horn
Archer, Greiner Law Firm
contact info
Joseph G Petrosinelli
Williams & Connolly Llp-Dc
contact info
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
Represented By
David R Erickson
Shook Hardy And Bacon LLP
contact info
David B Dwerlkotte
Shook Hardy And Bacon LLP
contact info
Defendant
E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company
Represented By
David R Erickson
Shook Hardy And Bacon LLP
contact info
David B Dwerlkotte
Shook Hardy And Bacon LLP
contact info
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Represented By
John W Cerreta
Day Pitney LLP
contact info
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Keith Edward Smith
Greenberg Traurig LLP
contact info
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Represented By
Michael S. Horn
Archer, Greiner Law Firm
contact info
Joseph G Petrosinelli
Williams & Connolly Llp-Dc
contact info
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
David Jonathan Hammack
U.S. Department Of Justice, Environmental Tort Branch
contact info
Plaintiff
State of New York
Represented By
Matthew J. Sinkman
New York State Attorney General - New York Office
contact info
Brendan S McGrath
New York State Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Philip M Bein
New York State Attorney General'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Friday, November 17, 2023
62 62 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 11/17 10:44 AM
TEXT ORDER This Order Relates to Case Nos. as referenced granting 4033 (in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (282) in case 2:18-cv-03358-RMG; (127) in case 2:18-cv-03435-RMG; (116) in case 2:19-cv-01022-RMG; (53) in case 2:19-cv-01119-RMG; (44) in case 2:19-cv-01120-RMG; (43) in case 2:19-cv-01181-RMG; (48) in case 2:19-cv-01217-RMG; (81) in case 2:19-cv-01223-RMG; (123) in case 2:19-cv-01724-RMG; (70) in case 2:19-cv-02187-RMG; (61) in case 2:19-cv-02607-RMG; (30) in case 2:19-cv-03288-RMG; (31) in case 2:19-cv-03290-RMG; (23) in case 2:20-cv-02030-RMG; (105) in case 2:20-cv-02115-RMG) Motion to Withdraw Geoffrey Cook as Attorney for listed plaintiffs. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 11/17/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
61 61 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 11/16 12:06 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by United States of America, United States Air Force, United States Department of Defense, United States of America, United States Fairchild AFB, United States, United States Air Force, United States of America, United States Air National Guard Bureau, United States Department of the Air Force, The. Response to Motion due by 11/30/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Cook, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]