Kansas District Court
Judge:Daniel D Crabtree
Referred: James P O'Hara
Case #: 2:19-cv-02564
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Sep 16, 2019
Terminated:Oct 16, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Mar 14, 2020 4:27 AM CDT
Defendant
JUUL Labs, Inc.
Plaintiff
Isaac Gant
Represented By
Kristine K. Kraft
Schlichter, Bogard & Denton, LLP
contact info
Kirk J. Goza
Goza & Honnold, LLC
contact info
Jerome J. Schlichter
Schlichter, Bogard & Denton
contact info
Scott H. Morgan
Schlichter, Bogard & Denton, LLP
contact info
Bradley D. Honnold
Goza & Honnold, LLC
contact info

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, October 24, 2019
misc Docket Annotation Thu 10/24 2:29 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Case opened in California Northern District 19-6922 . (hw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2019
10 10 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 10/16 1:43 PM
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1). Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of California (MDL 2913). ***Terminating Case. (hw)
Related: [-]
utility Case Transferred Out - District Wed 10/16 1:45 PM
Case transferred to District of Northern District of California (MDL 2913).(hw)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2019
9 9 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 10/07 1:13 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Scott H. Morgan for Isaac Gant pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/7/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (heo)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 10/07 10:03 AM
MOTION for attorney Scott H. Morgan to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4940543.) by Plaintiff Isaac Gant Related [+](Kraft, Kristine)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 ECF Registration Form
Thursday, October 03, 2019
7 7 misc Entry of Appearance Thu 10/03 10:14 AM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Bradley D. Honnold on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Honnold, Bradley)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Entry of Appearance Thu 10/03 10:02 AM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kirk J. Goza on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Goza, Kirk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2019
5 5 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 09/18 4:14 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jerome J. Schlichter for Isaac Gant pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/18/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (heo)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 09/18 12:14 PM
MOTION for attorney Jerome J. Schlichter to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4923973.) by Plaintiff Isaac Gant Related [+](Kraft, Kristine)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit,
Att: 2 ECF Registration Form ECF Registration Form
Tuesday, September 17, 2019
3 3 misc Designation of Place of Trial Tue 09/17 3:14 PM
DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Isaac Gant - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Kraft, Kristine)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Tue 09/17 9:12 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (gw)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Tue 09/17 9:16 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to JUUL Labs, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (gw)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Tue 09/17 9:17 AM
***DISREGARD SUMMONS ALREADY ISSUED***SUMMONS ISSUED as to JUUL Labs, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca) Modified on 9/17/2019 (ca)
Related: [-]
***DISREGARD SUMMONS ALREADY ISSUED***SUMMONS ISSUED as to JUUL Labs, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca) Modified on 9/17/2019 (ca).
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2019
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 09/16 6:33 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Isaac Gant. (Kraft, Kristine)
Related: [-]
1 1 45 pgs cmp Complaint (attorney) Mon 09/16 6:32 PM
COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4922255.), filed by Isaac Gant.(Kraft, Kristine)
Related: [-]