1
|
|
1
9
pgs
CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Gary M. Heidenfeldt (1), Joleen M. Wood (2). (emt, ) [1:13-mj-00420-BMK]
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
4
pgs
Government's MOTION TO DETAIN DEFENDANT Gary M. Heidenfeldt Without Bail. (bbb, ) [1:13-mj-00420-BMK]
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
3
pgs
EP : Initial Appearance as to (01) Gary M. Heidenfeldt, (02) Joleen M. Wood held on 5/1/2013. Defendants (01) Gary M. Heidenfeldt and (02) Joleen M. Wood present, both in custody. Defendants sworn to the financial affidavits and request for court appointed attorneys are granted. Salina Althof and the Office of the Federal Public Defender are provisionally appointed as counsel for Defendant (01) Gary M. Heidenfeldt. Klemen Urbanc is appointed as counsel for Defendant (02) Joleen M. Wood. Detention Hearing as to Defendant (01) Gary M. Heidenfeldt set for 5/6/2013 @ 1:30 p.m., Judge Kevin S.C. Chang. Preliminary Hearing as to Defendants (01) Gary M. Heidenfeldt and (02) Joleen M. Wood set for 5/22/2013 @ 3:00 p.m., Judge Barry M. Kurren Motion to Detain as to (02) Joleen M. Wood - DENIED. Bail as to Defendant (02) Joleen M. Wood: $50,000 unsecured bond. (7g1) Surrender any passport and all travel documents to the U.S. District Court Clerk's Office. Do not apply for/obtain a passport. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, the U.S. District Court Clerks Office is directed to return the posted passport to the defendant upon disposition of this case. Surrender no later than: one week following release or provide an Affidavit attesting to not possessing a passport. Release is delayed pending acceptance/bedspace at an approved residentialsubstance abuse treatment program. Defendants (01) and (02) are remanded to the custody of the USMS. (denying 3 Motion to Detain as to Joleen M. Wood (2); ***Procedural Interval start as to Gary M. Heidenfeldt, Joleen M. Wood; Added attorney Salina Kanai Althof for Gary M. Heidenfeldt, Klemen Urbanc for Joleen M. Wood. ; Detention Hearing for (01) Gary M. Heidenfeldt set for 5/6/2013 01:30 PM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG., Preliminary Hearing for (01) Gary M. Heidenfeldt and (02) Joleen M. Wood set for 5/22/2013 03:00 AM before Judge BARRY M. KURREN.; Motion terminated as to Joleen M. Wood: 3 MOTION to Detain filed by USA.; Bond set as to Joleen M. Wood (2) $50,000.00 UNSECURED.) (FTR-Ctrm 7/2:34-2:44 PM.) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(emt, ) No COS issued for this docket entry [1:13-mj-00420-BMK]
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
CJA 23 Financial Affidavit - by (01) Gary M. Heidenfeldt. (emt, ) [1:13-mj-00420-BMK]
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: appearing for Gary M. Heidenfeldt Notice of Change of Counsel (Turk, Jessica) [1:13-mj-00420-BMK]
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
EP : Detention Hearing as to (01) Gary M. Heidenfeldt held on 5/6/2013. Government requests detention. Motion denied and terminated. Bond set as to Gary M. Heidenfeldt (1) $50,000.00 UNSECURED. (7g3) Do not apply for/obtain a passport. Execute an affidavit or declaration which attests that you do not have access to, or are in possession of any passport. Submit to the U.S. District Court Clerk's Office by: May 13, 2013. Release is delayed pending acceptance/bedspace at an approved residential substance abuse treatment program. (denying 2 Motion to Detain as to Gary M. Heidenfeldt (1); Motion terminated as to Gary M. Heidenfeldt: 2 MOTION to Detain filed by USA.; Bond set as to Gary M. Heidenfeldt (1) $50,000.00 UNSECURED) (FTR-Ctrm 5/1:40-1:50 PM.) (JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(emt, ) No COS issued for this docket entry [1:13-mj-00420-BMK]
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
Abstract of Release as to (01) Gary M. Heidenfeldt. (emt, ) [1:13-mj-00420-BMK]
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
1
pgs
NOTICE Statement of Gary M. Heidenfeldt by Gary M. Heidenfeldt (Turk, Jessica) [1:13-mj-00420-BMK]
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
4
pgs
ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS OF RELEASE as to (01) Gary M. Heidenfeldt - signed by JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 5/8/13. (emt, ) [1:13-mj-00420-BMK]
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
APPEARANCE BOND as to (01) Gary M. Heidenfeldt - Signed by JUDGE KEVIN S. C. CHANG on 5/8/13. (emt, ) [1:13-mj-00420-BMK]
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
EO: As to Defendants (01) Gary M. Heidenfeldt and (02) Joleen M. Wood, at government's request, Preliminary Hearing set 5/22/2013 has been continued to 6/24/2013 @ 2:00 PM before Judge Richard L. Puglisi. Jonathan Loo to prepare the Stipulation. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(tyk) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry [1:13-mj-00420-BMK]
Related: [-]
|
18
|
|
18
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Defendant's Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel by Jessica H. Turk. by Gary M. Heidenfeldt.(Turk, Jessica) [1:13-mj-00420-BMK]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Declaration of Counsel,
|
| |
Att: 2
COS
|
19
|
|
19
NOTICE OF HEARING ON18 Defendant's Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel as to (01) Gary M. Heidenfeldt set for 6/24/2013 @ 2:00 PM before JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. (tyk) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry [1:13-mj-00420-BMK]
Related: [-]
|
20
|
|
20
STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING PRELIMINARY HEARING AND TO EXCLUDE TIME as to (01) Gary M. Heidenfeldt, (02) Joleen M. Wood - Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 5/16/13. (Time excluded from 5/22/13 until 6/24/13. Preliminary Hearing continued to 6/24/2013 02:00 PM before JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI.) (emt, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry [1:13-mj-00420-BMK]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Arrest of (01) Gary M. Heidenfeldt on 6/17/13. (emt, ) [1:13-mj-00420-BMK]
Related: [-]
|
22
|
|
22
1
pgs
PS 8 - PETITION FOR ACTION on Conditions of Pretrial Release as to (01) Gary M. Heidenfeldt - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 6/17/13. (emt, ) Modified on 6/18/2013 to unseal petition pursuant to return on bench warrant (emt, ). [1:13-mj-00420-BMK]
Related: [-]
|
24
|
|
24
EP : ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PRETRIAL RELEASE SHOULD NOT BE REVOKED AS TO DEFENDANT (01) GARY M. HEIDENFELDT; Motion Hearing re18 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL as to Gary M. Heidenfeldt (1) held on 6/17/2013. Defendant (01) GARY M. HEIDENFELDT is present, in custody. DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL (Doc.18 ) is GRANTED. Hearing on DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL set for June 24, 2013 before Judge Puglisi is vacated. Discussion held. Further hearing ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PRETRIAL RELEASE SHOULD NOT BE REVOKED AS TO DEFENDANT (01) GARY M. HEIDENFELDT is CONTINUED to June 20, 2013 at 2:00 p.m, Judge Puglisi. Defendant (01) GARY M. HEIDENFELDT is remanded to the custody of the United States Marshals Service. (granting 18 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Jessica Turk withdrawn from case. as to Gary M. Heidenfeldt (1); Motion terminated as to Gary M. Heidenfeldt: 18 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Defendant's Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel by Jessica H. Turk. filed by Gary M. Heidenfeldt.; Added attorney Mark S. Kawata for Gary M. Heidenfeldt. Attorney Jessica Turk terminated in case as to Gary M. Heidenfeldt.; Bond Revocation Hearing as to Gary M. Heidenfeldt held on 6/17/2013; as to Gary M. Heidenfeldt( Bond Revocation Hearing continued to 6/20/2013 02:00 PM before JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI.) (FTR-Ctrm 6/2:06-2:07 PM; 2:19-2:26 PM.) (JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(emt, ) No COS issued for this docket entry [1:13-mj-00420-BMK] (Entered: 06/18/2013)
Related: [-]
|
25
|
|
25
1
pgs
Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 6/17/13 in case as to (01) Gary M. Heidenfeldt. (emt, ) [1:13-mj-00420-BMK]
Related: [-]
|
26
|
|
26
EP : ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PRETRIAL RELEASE SHOULD NOT BE REVOKED AS TO DEFENDANT (01) GARY M. HEIDENFELDT held on 6/20/2013. Defendant (01) GARY M. HEIDENFELDT is present, in custody. Discussion held. Court follows the recommendation of Pretrial Services. DELAYED RELEASE. DELETE: 14. Release is delayed pending acceptance/bedspace at an approved residential substance abuse treatment program. ADD: (6a) The defendant is placed in the Third Party Custodianship of: Tanya Au. (7c) Maintain or actively seek employment, as directed by Pretrial Services. (7p3) Comply with the Location Monitoring program under the direction of Pretrial Services. The Court authorizes release under the CURFEW restriction residence during the curfew hours as determined by Pretrial Services. Pretrial Services has the discretion to waive this condition should the defendant be in residential treatment. (7p4) You must abide by the program requirements and instructions of Pretrial Services related to the proper operation of the specified Location Monitoring technology: RADIO FREQUENCY (RF)/TRADITIONAL ELECTRONIC MONITORING. (7p5) You must abide by the program requirements and instructions of Pretrial Services related to the proper operation of the specified Location Monitoring technology: PASSIVE GLOBAL POSITIONING SATELLITE (GPS) MONITORING. Pretrial Services has the discretion to change the location monitoring equipment as appropriate. Release is delayed pending the availability of location monitoring equipment and confirmation the defendant can return to his employment or until he is eligible to return to SAARC. Defendant (01) GARY M. HEIDENFELDT is remanded to the custody of the United States Marshals Service. (Bond Revocation Hearing as to (01) Gary M. Heidenfeldt held on 6/20/2013. Bond set as to Gary M. Heidenfeldt (1) $50,000.00 UNSECURED) (FTR-Ctrm 6/2:07-2:10 PM.) (JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(emt, ) No COS issued for this docket entry [1:13-mj-00420-BMK]
Related: [-]
|
28
|
|
28
Abstract of Release as to (01) Gary M. Heidenfeldt. (emt, ) [1:13-mj-00420-BMK]
Related: [-]
|
27
|
|
27
EO: as to Defendants (01) Gary M. Heidenfeldt, and (02) Joleen M. Wood. Pursuant to counsel's request and agreement, the Preliminary Hearing is CONTINUED from 6/24/2013 to 7/25/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Counsel shall file a stipulation. (JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry [1:13-mj-00420-BMK]
Related: [-]
|
29
|
|
29
ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS OF RELEASE as to (01) Gary M. Heidenfeldt - signed by JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 6/21/13. (emt, ) [1:13-mj-00420-BMK]
Related: [-]
|
30
|
|
30
APPEARANCE BOND as to (01) Gary M. Heidenfeldt - Signed by JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 6/21/13. (emt, ) [1:13-mj-00420-BMK]
Related: [-]
|
31
|
|
31
EO: as to Defedants (01)Gary M. Heidenfeldt and (02)Joleen M. Wood-Per Government's request, the Preliminary Hearing set for 7/25/2013 has been continued to 8/26/2013 @ 2:00 PM before JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Stipulation to be prepared by Jonathan Loo. (JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tl, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry [1:13-mj-00420-BMK]
Related: [-]
|
32
|
|
32
STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING PRELIMINARY HEARING AND TO EXCLUDE TIME as to (01) Gary M. Heidenfeldt, (02) Joleen M. Wood - Signed by JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 7/26/13. (Time excluded from 7/25/13 until 8/26/13. Preliminary Hearing continued to 8/26/2013 02:00 PM before JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI.) (emt, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry [1:13-mj-00420-BMK]
Related: [-]
|
35
|
|
35
EO: as to Defendants (01) Gary M. Heidenfeldt, and (02) Joleen M. Wood. Pursuant to counsel's request and agreement, the Preliminary Hearing as to Defendants (01) Gary M. Heidenfeldt, and (02) Joleen M. Wood is CONTINUED from 8/26/2013 to 9/26/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6 before JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Counsel for the government shall prepare a stipulation. (JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry [1:13-mj-00420-BMK]
Related: [-]
|
36
|
|
36
STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING PRELIMINARY HEARING AND TO EXCLUDE TIME as to (01) Gary M. Heidenfeldt, (02) Joleen M. Wood - Signed by JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 8/27/13. (Time excluded from 8/26/13 until 9/26/13. Preliminary Hearing continued to 9/26/2013 02:00 PM before JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI.) (emt, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry [1:13-mj-00420-BMK]
Related: [-]
|
37
|
|
37
EO: as to Defendants (01) Gary M. Heidenfeldt, and (02) Joleen M. Wood. Pursuant to counsel's request and agreement, Preliminary Hearing is CONTINUED from 9/26/2013 to 10/25/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Counsel shall prepare a stipulation and proposed order (JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry [1:13-mj-00420-BMK]
Related: [-]
|
38
|
|
38
STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING PRELIMINARY HEARING AND TO EXCLUDE TIME as to (01) Gary M. Heidenfeldt, (02) Joleen M. Wood - Signed by JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 9/30/13. (Time excluded from 9/26/13 until 10/25/13. Preliminary Hearing continued to 10/25/2013 10:00 AM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG.) (emt, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry [1:13-mj-00420-BMK]
Related: [-]
|
39
|
|
39
EO : as to Gary M. Heidenfeldt, Joleen M. Wood : Preliminary Hearing set 10/25/13 shall be continued to 11/25/2013 02:00 PM before JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Jon Loo to submit the Stipulation. (JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(sna, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry [1:13-mj-00420-BMK]
Related: [-]
|
40
|
|
40
EO: as to Defendants (01) Gary M. Heidenfeldt and (02) Joleen M. Wood. Pursuant to counsel's request and agreement, Preliminary Hearing as to Defendants (01) Gary M. Heidenfeldt and (02) Joleen M. Wood is CONTINUED from 11/25/2013 to 12/26/2013 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. Counsel for the government shall prepare a stipulation and proposed order. (JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry [1:13-mj-00420-BMK]
Related: [-]
|
41
|
|
41
STIPULATION and ORDER CONTINUING PRELIMINARY HEARING AND TO EXCLUDE TIME as to (01) Gary M. Heidenfeldt, and (02) Joleen M. Wood. Preliminary hearing previously set for 10/25/2013 is continued to 11/25/2013. * ***Time excluded as to Gary M. Heidenfeldt and Joleen M. Wood: [10/25/2013-11/24/2013]. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 11/22/2013. *[Clerk's notation: Pursuant to the minute order entered November 22, 2013 as docket entry no. (40), the PRELIMINARY HEARING is CONTINUED from 11/25/2013 and is set for 12/26/2013 at 1:30 p.m. before U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren] (afc)
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). All participants are registered to receive electronic notifications. [1:13-mj-00420-BMK]
Related: [-]
|
42
|
|
42
STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING PRELIMINARY HEARING AND TO EXCLUDE TIME as to (01) Gary M. Heidenfeldt, (02) Joleen M. Wood - Signed by JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 12/17/13. (Time excluded from 11/25/13 until 12/26/13. Preliminary Hearing continued to 12/26/2013 01:30 PM before Judge BARRY M. KURREN.) (emt, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry [1:13-mj-00420-BMK]
Related: [-]
|
43
|
|
43
EO: as to Gary M. Heidenfeldt, Joleen M. Wood - The Preliminary Hearing set for 12/23/2013 @ 1:30 p.m. IS ADVANCED TO 10:30 a.m. before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(bbb) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry [1:13-mj-00420-BMK]
Related: [-]
|
44
|
|
44
CORRECTION EO : as to Gary M. Heidenfeldt, Joleen M. Wood - The Preliminary Hearing TIME set for 1:30 p.m., HAS BEEN ADVANCED TO 10:30 a.m. for the same date of 12/26/2013 before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(bbb) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry [1:13-mj-00420-BMK]
Related: [-]
|
45
|
|
45
EO: as to Gary M. Heidenfeldt, Joleen M. Wood - The Preliminary Hearing set for 12/26/2013 IS CONTINUED TO 01/24/2014 @ 1:30 p.m. before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. Government to notify all parties and to prepare a Stipulation and Order. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(bbb) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry [1:13-mj-00420-BMK]
Related: [-]
|
46
|
|
46
STIPULATION and ORDER Continuing Preliminary Hearing and To Exclude Time as to Gary M. Heidenfeldt, Joleen M. Wood, ( Preliminary Hearing set for 1/24/2014 01:30 PM before Judge BARRY M. KURREN.). Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 12/31/2013. (gab, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry [1:13-mj-00420-BMK]
Related: [-]
|
47
|
|
47
EO: as to Gary M. Heidenfeldt, Joleen M. Wood - the Preliminary Hearing set for 01/24/2014 IS CONTINUED TO 03/25/2014 @ 1:30 p.m. before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Government to prepare Stipulation and Order. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(bbb) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry [1:13-mj-00420-BMK]
Related: [-]
|
48
|
|
48
STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING PRELIMINARY HEARING AND TO EXCLUDE TIME as to (01) Gary M. Heidenfeldt, (02) Joleen M. Wood - Signed by JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 2/5/2014. (Time excluded from 1/24/2014 until 3/25/2014. Preliminary Hearing continued to 3/25/2014 01:30 PM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG.) (emt, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry [1:13-mj-00420-BMK]
Related: [-]
|
49
|
|
49
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Michael K. Kawahara appearing for USA. and COS (Kawahara, Michael) [1:13-mj-00420-BMK]
Related: [-]
|
50
|
|
50
3
pgs
INFORMATION as to Gary M. Heidenfeldt (1) count(s) 1, 2. (ecs, )
Related: [-]
|
51
|
|
51
Defendant Information Sheet (ecs, )
Related: [-]
|