Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Matthew W Brann
Case #: 3:19-cv-01605
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Sep 17, 2019
Terminated:May 29, 2020
Last checked: Sunday Mar 15, 2020 6:45 AM EDT
Defendant
Keystone Community Resources, Inc.
Represented By
Fara A. Cohen
Post & Schell, PC
contact info
Andrea M. Kirshenbaum
Post & Schell, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicole Rogai
Represented By
Scott E. Schermerhorn
Law Office Of Scott E. Schermerhorn
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, May 29, 2020
15 15 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case (60 Day Settlement Order) Fri 05/29 10:37 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 5/29/2020. (jr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 28, 2020
14 14 misc Letter Thu 05/28 2:09 PM
Letter from Scott E. Schermerhorn, Esq., notifying court of settlement. .(Schermerhorn, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 24, 2020
order Verbal Order Reassigning Case (JMM) Tue 03/24 8:43 PM
VERBAL ORDER by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner - Case Reassigned to Honorable Matthew W. Brann. (cd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2020
13 13 order Scheduling Order Thu 02/20 4:06 PM
CASE MANAGMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 7/1/2020. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 7/15/2020. Defendant Expert Report is due by 8/3/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 8/14/2020.Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 2/20/20. (sm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2020
12 12 misc Case Management Plan Wed 02/12 5:11 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN Joint Case Management Plan by Nicole Rogai. (Schermerhorn, Scott)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2020
11 11 order Scheduling Order Fri 01/31 4:30 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER:Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 2/19/2029 11:30 AM in Scranton before Honorable James M. Munley.Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 1/29/20. (sm)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Standing Order Fri 01/31 4:27 PM
STANDING ORDER #1Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 1/29/20. (sm)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2019
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/13 4:31 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Keystone Community Resources, Inc..(Kirshenbaum, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2019
8 8 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Mon 11/18 5:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Fara A Cohen on behalf of All Defendants. (Cohen, Fara)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2019
7 7 2 pgs order Order Approving Stipulation Scheduling Order Tue 11/12 1:33 PM
ORDER approving re5 Stipulation extending time to respond to the complaint; due 12/13/19. Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 11/12/19. (sm)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2019
6 6 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Fri 11/08 5:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea M. Kirshenbaum on behalf of Keystone Community Resources, Inc. (Kirshenbaum, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2019
5 5 misc Stipulation Thu 11/07 5:01 PM
STIPULATION and order for extension of time to answer, move or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's complaint by Keystone Community Resources, Inc.. (Kirshenbaum, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2019
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 11/04 3:09 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicole Rogai. All Defendants. (Schermerhorn, Scott)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2019
3 3 order Scheduling Order Standing Order Wed 09/18 4:01 PM
ORDER re case assignment and procedures.Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 9/18/19. (sm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2019
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 09/17 3:51 PM
Summons Issued as to Keystone Community Resources, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (ep)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Packet
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/17 3:50 PM
COMPLAINT against Keystone Community Resources, Inc. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4874195), filed by Nicole Rogai.(ep)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Docket Annotation Tue 09/17 4:38 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to Judge Munley. (mfa)
Related: [-]