Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Mark H Cohen
Case #: 3:19-cv-00125
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Case Filed:Sep 17, 2019
Terminated:Mar 18, 2020
Last checked: Sunday Mar 15, 2020 5:52 AM EDT
Defendant
Curtis L. Whitaker, II
Represented By
Jonathan Akins
Schreeder Wheeler & Flint, LLP
contact info
Michael E. Sumner
Sumner Meeker, LLC
contact info
Theodore P. Meeker, III
Sumner Meeker, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Brandon Campbell
Represented By
Tyler Brand Kaspers
The Kaspers Firm, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
27 27 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Sanctions Wed 12/30 12:13 PM
ORDER denying25 Motion for Sanctions under Rule 11. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 12/30/2020. (jed)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 03, 2020
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 11/03 9:37 AM
Submission of25 First MOTION for Sanctions under Rule 11 , to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (jpa)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 16, 2020
26 26 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 10/16 11:16 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re25 First MOTION for Sanctions under Rule 11 filed by Brandon Campbell.(Kaspers, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Campbell Interrogatory Responses,
Att: 2 Exhibit Jarel Bynum Interrogatory Responses,
Att: 3 Exhibit Nolan Interrogatory Responses,
Att: 4 Exhibit Wilkins Interrogatory Responses,
Att: 5 Exhibit Smith Interrogatory Responses,
Att: 6 Exhibit Cox Interrogatory Responses,
Att: 7 Exhibit Harrison email
Friday, October 02, 2020
25 25 motion Sanctions Fri 10/02 12:22 PM
First MOTION for Sanctions under Rule 11 with Brief In Support by Curtis L. Whitaker, II.(Sumner, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law,
Att: 2 Affidavit of Jonathan A. Akins,
Att: 3 Affidavit of Michael E. Sumner
Wednesday, March 18, 2020
24 24 misc Judgment - Clerk Wed 03/18 3:21 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered dismissing action. (dob)
Related: [-]
23 23 11 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 03/18 3:16 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion to Dismiss puruant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6).. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 3/18/2020. (dob)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 03/18 3:22 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (dob)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2020
22 22 order Scheduling Order Thu 02/06 3:55 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER re:16 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 2/6/2020. (jta)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2020
21 21 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 02/04 11:16 AM
ORDER: it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Stay Deadlines Doc.20 is GRANTED. All discovery deadlines and obligations under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Civil Local Rules of Practice for the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia are STAYED until thirty (30) days following the Court's ruling on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Doc.7 . It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Stay Deadlines Doc.19 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 2/4/2020. (jta)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2020
20 20 motion Stay Fri 01/31 12:52 PM
MOTION to Stay Deadlines with Brief In Support by Curtis L. Whitaker, II.(Sumner, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
19 19 motion Stay Fri 01/31 12:34 PM
MOTION to Stay Deadlines with Brief In Support by Curtis L. Whitaker, II. (Sumner, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2020
18 18 misc Certificate of Interested Persons Thu 01/30 5:13 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Brandon Campbell. (Kaspers, Tyler)
Related: [-]
17 17 discov Initial Disclosures Thu 01/30 4:55 PM
Initial Disclosures by Brandon Campbell.(Kaspers, Tyler)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Thu 01/30 4:32 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Brandon Campbell. (Kaspers, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2020
15 15 service Affidavit of Service Tue 01/28 3:53 PM
PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to Defendant Curtis L. Whitaker II by the Daily Report. Notice published on 12/9/19, 12/16/19, 12/23/19 and 12/30/19. (aaq)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2020
utility Submission to District Judge Thu 01/23 3:22 PM
Submission of7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (jta)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2020
14 14 respm Reply Brief Fri 01/17 4:01 PM
REPLY BRIEF re7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Curtis L. Whitaker, II. (Sumner, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2020
13 13 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 01/08 12:02 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Brandon Campbell. (Kaspers, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2020
12 12 30+ pgs order Order Mon 01/06 11:28 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 1/6/2020. (jta)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2020
11 11 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Fri 01/03 3:00 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. recused. Case reassigned to Judge Mark H. Cohen for all further proceedings NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 3:19-cv-0125-MHC. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 1/3/2020. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2020
10 10 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Thu 01/02 9:18 AM
Certification of Consent to Withdraw as attorney Jonathan Akins by Curtis Whitaker. (Akins, Jonathan) Modified on 1/2/2020 to correct docket text (dmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2019
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/31 11:23 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E. Sumner on behalf of Curtis L. Whitaker, II (Sumner, Michael)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice Tue 12/31 11:09 AM
Instructions to Parties and Counsel. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 12/31/19. (rsh)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2019
7 7 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 12/30 7:06 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Curtis L. Whitaker, II.(Akins, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Brief,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Friday, November 15, 2019
6 6 misc Certified Mail Returned Receipt Fri 11/15 3:27 PM
Certified Mail Returned Receipt RE:5 NOTICE of Service by Publication as to Defendant Curtis L. Whitaker, II RE: 4 Order mailed to Daily Report via certified mail/ERR (#9171999991703257178422). DELIVERED 11/13/19. (aaq)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2019
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Fri 11/08 11:00 AM
NOTICE of Service by Publication as to Defendant Curtis L. Whitaker, II RE:4 Order mailed to Daily Report via certified mail/ERR (#9171999991703257178422)(aaq)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Service by Publication,
Att: 2 Copy of check,
Att: 3 Correspondence
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 11/08 11:04 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing (pursuant to O.C.G.A. § 9-11-4(f)(1)(C)) as to Curtis L. Whitaker, II at 4 Whitewater Trial NW, Atlanta, GA 30327 - RE:5 Notice of Service by Publication,4 Order on Motion for Service by Publication, and1 Complaint. (aaq)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2019
4 4 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Service by Publication Fri 11/01 2:25 PM
ORDER GRANTING3 Motion for Service by Publication. The Plaintiff is DIRECTED to deposit the cost of publication, provide the Clerk the desired notice to be published, and the name of the county where the notice is to be published. The Clerk is DIRECTED to effect service by publication per directions set forth in this Order. Please see Order for further specifics and directives. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 10/31/2019. (usw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2019
3 3 motion Service by Publication Tue 10/22 3:21 PM
MOTION for Service by Publication as to Curtis L. Whitaker, II by Brandon Campbell.(Kaspers, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 17, 2019
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 09/17 4:17 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Curtis L. Whitaker, II. (usw)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/17 4:07 PM
COMPLAINT (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8940975) filed by Brandon Campbell.(usw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet