Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-03496
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2019
Terminated:Mar 27, 2023
Case in other court:Kentucky Western, 1:19-cv-00115
Last checked: Monday Mar 16, 2020 5:25 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Represented By
Michael J. Bender
Thompson Miller & Simpson PLC
contact info
Byron N. Miller
Thompson Miller & Simpson PLC
contact info
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Represented By
Michael J. Bender
Thompson Miller & Simpson PLC
contact info
Byron N. Miller
Thompson Miller & Simpson PLC
contact info
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Represented By
Michael J. Bender
Thompson Miller & Simpson PLC
contact info
Byron N. Miller
Thompson Miller & Simpson PLC
contact info
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Represented By
Michael J. Bender
Thompson Miller & Simpson PLC
contact info
Byron N. Miller
Thompson Miller & Simpson PLC
contact info
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Represented By
Michael J. Bender
Thompson Miller & Simpson PLC
contact info
Byron N. Miller
Thompson Miller & Simpson PLC
contact info
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By
Michael J. Bender
Thompson Miller & Simpson PLC
contact info
Byron N. Miller
Thompson Miller & Simpson PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
BENJAMIN TYLER MCDOUGLE
Represented By
DOUGLASS ALAN KREIS
Aylstock Witkin Kreis Etc Pllc - Pensacola Fl
contact info
NEIL DUANE OVERHOLTZ
Aylstock Witkin Kreis Etc Pllc - Pensacola Fl
contact info
J. Gerard Stranch, IV
Branstetter Stranch & Jennings, PLLC
contact info
CAITLYN PRICHARD MILLER
Aylstock Witkin Kreis Etc Pllc - Pensacola Fl
contact info
David O'Brien Suetholz
Branstetter, Stranch & Jennings, PLLC
contact info
BRYAN FREDERICK AYLSTOCK
Aylstock Witkin Kreis Etc Pllc - Pensacola Fl
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, March 27, 2023
21 21 30+ pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 04/03 3:24 PM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibits A, B and C are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. Active-duty plaintiffs and non-veterans are hereby granted leave to file a motion to reopen their case which must be accompanied by a statement clarifying their status with respect to military service. Any motion to reopen on this basis must be filed on the individual docket for a plaintiff's case only by April 26, 2023. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/27/2023. (erl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2019
20 20 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 11/06 1:59 PM
CORRECTED MASTER SHORT FORM COMPLAINT AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by BENJAMIN TYLER MCDOUGLE. (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2019
19 19 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 11/05 2:41 PM
MASTER SHORT FORM COMPLAINT AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by BENJAMIN TYLER MCDOUGLE. (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/05 10:04 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by NEIL DUANE OVERHOLTZ on behalf of BENJAMIN TYLER MCDOUGLE (OVERHOLTZ, NEIL)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/05 8:12 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by DOUGLASS ALAN KREIS on behalf of BENJAMIN TYLER MCDOUGLE (KREIS, DOUGLASS)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2019
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/04 11:46 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by CAITLYN PRICHARD MILLER on behalf of BENJAMIN TYLER MCDOUGLE (MILLER, CAITLYN)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2019
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/01 3:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by BRYAN FREDERICK AYLSTOCK on behalf of BENJAMIN TYLER MCDOUGLE (AYLSTOCK, BRYAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2019
14 14 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 09/18 9:44 AM
NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION and ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT to all attorneys of record. re:13 Case transferred in from District of Kentucky Western; Case Number 1:19-cv-00115. (djb)
Related: [-]
13 13 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Wed 09/18 9:37 AM
Case transferred in from District of Kentucky Western; Case Number 1:19-cv-00115. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
12 12 2 pgs order Order Wed 09/18 10:12 AM
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. CTO-35 FLND re:MDL 2885 (MLG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2019
11 11 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to J. Gerard Stranch, IV re1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 9/25/2019. (KJA) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
10 10 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Bryan Frederick Aylstock re1 Notice of Removal.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 9/25/2019. (KJA) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2019
9 9 CLERK'S NOTICE to Warren Circuit Court Clerk and parties, re1 Notice of Removal. (CDF) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
8 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent 3M Company, Corporate Parent 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Corporate Parent Aearo Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Aearo Intermediate, LLC, Corporate Parent Aearo, LLC for Aearo Technologies, LLC, by Aearo Technologies, LLC. (CDF) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
7 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent 3M Company, Corporate Parent 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Corporate Parent Aearo Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Aearo Intermediate, LLC for Aearo, LLC, by Aearo, LLC. (CDF) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
6 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent 3M Company, Corporate Parent 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Corporate Parent Aearo Holdings, LLC for Aearo Intermediate, LLC, by Aearo Intermediate, LLC. (CDF) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
5 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent 3M Company, Corporate Parent 3M Occupational Safety LLC for Aearo Holdings, LLC, by Aearo Holdings, LLC. (CDF) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
4 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent 3M Company for 3M Occupational Safety LLC, by 3M Occupational Safety LLC. (CDF) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3M Company. (CDF) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
2 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (CDF) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company, 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Aearo Holdings, LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC, Aearo, LLC, Aearo Technologies, LLC, from Warren Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-01029. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0644-2934815) (CDF) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 9/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Defendants' Notice and Certificate of Removal,
Att: 2 Exhibit - State Court Class Action Complaint,
Att: 3 Cover Sheet