Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-03503
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2019
Terminated:Apr 08, 2020
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:19-cv-02449
Last checked: Monday Mar 16, 2020 6:30 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Represented By
JERRY W BLACKWELL
Blackwell Burke PA
contact info
Plaintiff
THOMAS J. BRANNAN
Represented By
STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Johnson Becker Pllc - Saint Paul Mn
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 08, 2020
12 12 1 pgs order Order Wed 04/08 9:22 AM
ORDER granting 10 MOTION for Leave for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. This matter is dismissed without prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2). The Clerk is directed to close the file for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/8/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Wed 04/08 7:42 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:11 Defendants' Notice of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's10 MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 07, 2020
11 11 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 04/07 2:47 PM
NOTICE of Non-Opposition by 3M COMPANY re10 MOTION to Dismiss (NOMELLINI, MARK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 25, 2020
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 03/25 1:33 PM
Reset Deadlines as to10 MOTION to Dismiss . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 4/8/2020) . (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2020
10 10 motion Dismiss Mon 01/13 12:44 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by THOMAS J. BRANNAN. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 1/27/2020) . (HAUER, STACY)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2019
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 11/01 3:55 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by THOMAS J. BRANNAN. (HAUER, STACY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2019
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/25 11:26 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by STACY KATHRYN HAUER on behalf of THOMAS J. BRANNAN (HAUER, STACY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2019
7 7 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 09/18 2:43 PM
NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION regarding counsel of record, Blackwell, Faleel and Hulse of Blackwell Burke PA representing 3M COMPANY. (djb)
Related: [-]
6 6 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Wed 09/18 2:42 PM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-02449. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs order Order Wed 09/18 9:55 AM
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-35) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2019
4 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 19-cv-2449 ECT/KMM. (MMG) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re1 Notice of Removal,2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
2 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey County, case number N/A (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7128276) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 9/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet