Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Sean D Jordan
Referred: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Case #: 4:19-cv-00682
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2019
Case in other court:296th Judicial District Court, 296-04662-2019
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 17, 2020 3:28 AM CDT
Defendant
Swarovski North America Limited
Represented By
Paul G Nason
Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell LLP
contact info
Robin G Shaughnessy
Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kristin Stogner
Represented By
James Michael Owens
Owens Law, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
28 28 3 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 12/08 1:54 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice (JOINT) by Swarovski North America Limited.(Nason, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, November 05, 2020
27 27 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 11/05 3:38 PM
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall submit to the Court all papers necessary for the resolution of the claims between them no later than December 7, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Swarovski North America Limited's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Witnesses and Brief in Support (Dkt.24 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 11/5/2020. (rpc, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
minutes Mediation Conference Thu 11/05 10:38 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak: Mediation Conference held on 11/4/2020. James Michael Owens, Kristin Stogner, and Earth Shah appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Paul Nason, Michael Gamboli, and Dina Raymond appeared on behalf of Defendant. Case resolved. (9:06 a.m. - 8:01 p.m.) (Court Reporter Digital Video Recording.) (klee, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 03, 2020
minutes Telephone Conference Wed 11/04 10:01 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak: Premediation Videoconference held on 11/3/2020. (2:59 p.m. - 3:15 p.m.) (Court Reporter Digital Video Recording.) (klee, )
Related: [-]
Monday, October 05, 2020
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 10/05 4:54 PM
ORDER granting25 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Dispositive Motions Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 10/5/2020. (rpc, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines Mon 10/05 4:55 PM
Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery due by 2/18/2021. Motions due by 3/18/2021. (rpc, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 01, 2020
25 25 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 10/01 12:03 PM
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Dispositive Motions Deadlines by Swarovski North America Limited.(Nason, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, September 24, 2020
24 24 motion Strike Thu 09/24 3:07 PM
MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Witnesses and Brief in Support by Swarovski North America Limited. Responses due by 10/8/2020(Nason, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
23 23 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 09/24 2:18 PM
ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULED MEDIATION. Mediation Videoconference set for 11/4/2020 at 09:00 AM in Video Conf Rm (Sherman) before Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. A premediation videoconference is scheduled for November 3, 2020, at 3:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 9/24/2020. (rpc, )
Related: [-]
Friday, September 18, 2020
22 22 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediator Judge Fri 09/18 3:10 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION. IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall contact the chambers of United States Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak to facilitate mediation in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 9/18/2020. (rpc, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 29, 2020
21 21 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 05/29 6:26 PM
FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. The Court held a hearing to address the Motion on May 5, 2020. See Docket Entry on May 5, 2020. Upon consideration, the Motion (Dkt.17 ) is DENIED AS MOOT, and the relief requested in the Amended Motion (Dkt.20 ) is GRANTED. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/30/2021 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before District Judge Sean D. Jordan., Amended Pleadings due by 7/28/2020., Discovery due by 12/18/2020., Plaintiff's disclosure of expert testimony due by 8/14/2020., Defendant's disclosure of expert testimony due by 9/14/2020., Jury instructions due by 6/16/2021, Mediation deadline due by 11/21/2020., Designation of Mediator due by 10/10/2020, Amended Pleadings by Plaintiff due by 7/28/2020., Amended pleadings by Defendant due by 8/12/2020. Discovery due by 12/18/2020., Jury instructions/Form of Verdict due by 6/16/2021, Mediation Completion due by 11/21/2020., Deadline for motions to dismiss, motions for summary judgment, or other dispositive motions due by 1/15/2021., Notice of intent to offer certified records due by 5/19/2021. Motions in Limine and Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/31/2021. Responses to motions in limine due by 6/16/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 05/29/2020. (las, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 13, 2020
20 20 motion Continue Wed 05/13 3:35 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Trial Setting and Extend Remaining Deadlines (AMENDED) by Swarovski North America Limited.(Nason, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Amended Scheduling Order
Tuesday, May 05, 2020
minutes Telephone Conference Tue 05/05 11:40 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson: Telephone Hearing on Motion to Continue held on 5/5/2020. Attorney Appearances: Paul G. Nason. (time in Court: 11:33 - 11:38) (Court Reporter Digital.) (jwam, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 29, 2020
18 18 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 04/29 10:58 AM
ORDER re17 Joint MOTION to Continue Trial Setting and Extend Remaining Deadlines. Telephone Conference set for 5/5/2020 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 4/29/2020. (rpc, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 28, 2020
17 17 motion Continue Tue 04/28 3:12 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Trial Setting and Extend Remaining Deadlines by Swarovski North America Limited.(Nason, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Amended Scheduling Order,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Amended Scheduling Order
Friday, February 14, 2020
16 16 order Scheduling Order Tue 02/18 2:41 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/27/2021 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before District Judge Sean D. Jordan. Amended Pleadings due by 4/28/2020. Discovery due by 7/21/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 3/17/2020. Jury instructions due by 1/13/2021. Mediation Completion due by 8/21/2020. Designation of Mediator due by 7/10/2020, Motions due by 8/17/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/28/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 2/14/2020. (rpc, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2020
minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 02/13 4:35 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 2/13/2020. (Atty Appearances: James Owens; Paul Nason) Time in court: 5 minutes (Court Reporter Digital.) (jwam, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2020
15 15 13 pgs order Protective Order Thu 02/06 3:15 PM
AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 2/6/2020. (rpc, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2020
14 14 motion Protective Order Wed 02/05 2:29 PM
Agreed MOTION for Protective Order by Swarovski North America Limited.(Nason, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Agreed Protective Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Redlined Protective Order
Friday, January 24, 2020
utility Set/Reset Hearings Fri 01/24 12:31 PM
Rule 16 Management Conference RESET for 2/13/2020 01:30 PM in Ctrm 108 (Plano) before Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (jwam, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2020
13 13 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 01/13 1:55 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Nason, Paul) (rpc, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (1/13/2020) Proposed Scheduling Order
Thursday, January 09, 2020
12 12 notice Notice of Discovery Disclosure Thu 01/09 4:40 PM
NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Swarovski North America Limited (Nason, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2019
11 11 10 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 12/12 3:21 PM
ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/13/2020. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 2/4/2020 at 01:30 PM in Ctrm 108 (Plano) before Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 12/12/2019. (rpc, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2019
10 10 19 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 12/10 10:01 AM
ANSWER to9 Amended Complaint (FIRST) by Swarovski North America Limited.(Nason, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2019
9 9 12 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Wed 11/20 1:14 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Swarovski North America Limited, filed by Kristin Stogner.(Owens, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2019
8 8 service Acknowledgment of Receipt Wed 10/16 12:22 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by James M. Owens (Plaintiff's attorney) as to6 Order. (rpc, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2019
7 7 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 10/11 4:01 PM
REFERRAL ORDER. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §636 and Local Rule CV-72, the undersigned hereby REFERS the cases set forth below to U. S. Magistrate Judge Kimberly C. Priest Johnson for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 10/11/2019. (rpc, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2019
6 6 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 10/04 12:05 PM
ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 10/4/2019. (rpc, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2019
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 09/19 2:42 PM
***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to4 Petition by Swarovski North America Limited.(rpc, )
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Complaint Thu 09/19 2:39 PM
***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** PETITION against Swarovski North America Limited, filed by Kristin Stogner.(rpc, )
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Thu 09/19 1:35 PM
NOTICE by Swarovski North America Limited of CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS (Nason, Paul)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 09/19 1:29 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Swarovski North America Limited identifying Corporate Parent Swarovski U.S. Holding Limited, Corporate Parent Swarovski International Holding AG for Swarovski North America Limited. (Nason, Paul)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs notice Notice of Removal Thu 09/19 1:12 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Swarovski North America Limited from 296th Judicial District Court, case number 296-04662-2019. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7443236), filed by Swarovski North America Limited.(Nason, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Edward J. Capobianco,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 4 2 pgs Exhibit D - Index of Documents,
Att: 5 10 pgs Exhibit D-1 - Plaintiff's Original Answer,
Att: 6 Exhibit D-2 - Civil Case Info. Sheet,
Att: 7 7 pgs Exhibit D-3 - Defendant's Original Answer,
Att: 8 Exhibit E - List of Parties and Status,
Att: 9 Exhibit F - List of Counsel,
Att: 10 Exhibit G - List of Parties Requesting Jury Trial,
Att: 11 Exhibit H - Name and Address of Court
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 09/19 2:36 PM
Case Assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (rpc, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Availability Thu 09/19 2:36 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (rpc, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of ECF Requirement Thu 09/19 2:38 PM
Notified Plaintiff's Attorney, James M. Owens, Per GO 04-12, this court no longer accepts pleadings in paper form. The Clerk will no longer mail or fax notices or orders to parties. All notices and orders generated by this court shall be sent electronically. ***ATTORNEY NOT ADMITTED TO PRACTICE IN OUR COURT ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER SENT VIA EMAIL*** (rpc, )
Related: [-]