Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-23211

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Rosemary Gambardella
Case #: 2:19-ap-02147
Nature of Suit65 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - other
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2019
Terminated:Jan 31, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ilan Adika
135 Truman Drive
Cresskill, NJ 07626
Represented By
Ilan Adika
contact info
Plaintiff
Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC
P.O. Box 131265
Roseville, MN 55113
Represented By
John R. Morton, Jr.
Law Offices Of John R. Morton, Jr.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
12 12 misc Warrant to Satisfy Judgment Wed 06/07 12:32 PM
Warrant to Satisfy Judgment against Ilan Adika Related [+]. Filed by John R. Morton Jr. on behalf of Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC. (Morton, John)
Related: [-] 10 Money Judgment
Friday, January 31, 2020
utility Close Adversary Case Fri 01/31 12:38 PM
Adversary Case (2:19-ap-2147) Closed. (rh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2020
court Hearing Held Mon 02/03 11:19 AM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Consent Judgment Entered on 12/23/19 Related [+] (car)
Related: [-] 6 Alias Summons Issued
court Hearing Held Mon 02/03 11:20 AM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Consent Judgment entered on 12/23/19 Related [+] (car)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
court Hearing Held Mon 02/03 11:21 AM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Consent Judgment entered on 12/23/19 Related [+] (car)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Saturday, December 28, 2019
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sun 12/29 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/28/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2019
10 10 2 pgs order Money Judgment Thu 12/26 11:45 AM
Consent Judgment Declaring Defendant's Debt To Plaintiff NonDischargable. RE : Money Judgment in favor of Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC and against Ilan Adika in the amount of $ $161,734.32 Related [+] . Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/23/2019. (slm)
Related: [-] 9 Certificate of Consent (Adversary) filed by Plaintiff Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC
Wednesday, December 18, 2019
9 9 misc Certificate of Consent Wed 12/18 5:14 PM
Certificate of Consent Related [+]. Filed by John R. Morton Jr. on behalf of Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC. (Morton, John)
Related: [-] 8 Application re: for entry of a consent judgment declaring defendant's debt to plaintiff nondischargeable Filed by Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC.Objection deadline is 12/26/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Consent Order) filed by Plaintiff Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC
8 8 motion Application (Generic) - Only use if no other event is applicable Wed 12/18 5:13 PM
Application re: for entry of a consent judgment declaring defendant's debt to plaintiff nondischargeable Filed by Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC.Objection deadline is 12/26/2019. (Morton, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Consent Order
Wednesday, December 11, 2019
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Thu 12/12 5:10 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 12/11/2019 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 01/29/2020 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (car)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Thu 12/12 5:10 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 12/11/2019 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 01/29/2020 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (car)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Wednesday, October 30, 2019
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Wed 10/30 3:55 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by John R. Morton Jr. on behalf of Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC. (Morton, John)
Related: [-] 6 Alias Summons Issued to Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC for service on Ilan Adika Answer due on 12/2/2019 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 1/29/2020 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (Attachments: # 1 Pre Trial Instructions) (dlr)
Tuesday, October 29, 2019
6 6 court Alias Summons Issued Tue 10/29 2:02 PM
Alias Summons Issued to Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC for service on Ilan Adika Answer due on 12/2/2019 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 1/29/2020 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (dlr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pre Trial Instructions
Thursday, October 24, 2019
5 5 misc Request for Alias Summons Thu 10/24 11:15 AM
Request for Alias Summons Related [+] filed by John R. Morton Jr. on behalf of Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC. (Morton, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC
Att: 1 Alias Summons
Monday, September 23, 2019
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Mon 09/23 4:03 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by John R. Morton Jr. on behalf of Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC. (Morton, John)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 19-02147 Complaint by Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC against Ilan Adika. Fee Amount $ 350.. (65 (Dischargeability - other)) (Attachments: # 1 Summons # 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet) filed by Plaintiff Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC,3 Summons Issued to Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LL for Service on Ilan Adika Answer due on 10/21/2019 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 12/11/2019 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (Attachments: # 1 Pre Trial Instructions) (dlr)
Friday, September 20, 2019
3 3 court Summons Issued Fri 09/20 3:40 PM
Summons Issued to Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LL for Service on Ilan Adika Answer due on 10/21/2019 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 12/11/2019 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (dlr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pre Trial Instructions
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 09/20 3:20 PM
Summons Issued to Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC for Service on Ilan Adika Answer due on 10/21/2019 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 12/11/2019 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (dlr)ENTERED IN ERROR; INCORRECT PDF ATTACHED Modified on 9/20/2019 (dlr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pre Trial Instructions
court Notice of Docketing Error Fri 09/20 3:39 PM
Correction Notice in Electronic Filing Related [+]. Type of Error: WRONG PDF ATTACHED, filed by THE COURT. Please correct and refile with the court. (dlr)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
court Hearing Withdrawn (Document) Fri 09/20 3:41 PM
Hearing Withdrawn Related [+] (dlr)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued to Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC for Service on Ilan Adika Answer due on 10/21/2019 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 12/11/2019 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (Attachments: # 1 Pre Trial Instructions) (dlr)ENTERED IN ERROR; INCORRECT PDF ATTACHED Modified on 9/20/2019 (dlr).
Thursday, September 19, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/19 2:11 PM
Adversary case 19-02147 Complaint by Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC against Ilan Adika. Fee Amount $ 350.. (65 (Dischargeability - other)) (Morton, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet