Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02734

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-03518
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2019
Terminated:Jul 14, 2021
Case in other court:New York Southern, 1:19-cv-08142
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 18, 2020 5:05 AM EDT
Defendant
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By
MITCHELL RUSSELL STERN
Arnold & Porter Llp - New York Ny
contact info
Defendant
OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Defendant
OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Plaintiff
CHERYLE LAFOREY
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Kirtland & Packard Llp - El Segundo Ca
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, July 14, 2021
15 15 3 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 07/14 2:19 PM
ORDER - The cases identified on Exhibit A are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE from the active docket of the Court. The Clerk is directed to enter this Order on the docket for each of the cases identified on Exhibit A and then to close those cases for administrative purposes. At the expiration of 30 days without activity, the Clerk must close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/14/2021. (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2020
14 14 service Summons Reissued Thu 02/20 3:29 PM
Summons Reissued as to OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (djb)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Thu 02/20 11:43 AM
NOTICE Notice of Filing Summons to Issue by CHERYLE LAFOREY (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2020
12 12 service Summons Reissued Tue 02/04 9:18 AM
Summons Reissued as to BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC. (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2020
11 11 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Thu 01/30 6:34 PM
NOTICE Notice of Filing Summons to Issue by CHERYLE LAFOREY (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Monday, January 06, 2020
10 10 service Summons Issued Mon 01/06 2:36 PM
Summons Issued as to BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2020
9 9 cmp Complaint Fri 01/03 5:01 PM
COMPLAINT against BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD, filed by CHERYLE LAFOREY. (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons BMS,
Att: 3 Summons Ot Am,
Att: 4 Summons Ot Ph
Monday, October 21, 2019
8 8 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Mon 10/21 3:46 PM
NOTICE of ATTORNEY CERTIFICATION FOR FEBRUARY 25, 2019 ORDER REGARDING CASE REVIEW PROCESS by CHERYLE LAFOREY (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Mon 10/21 4:13 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:8 ATTORNEY CERTIFICATION FOR FEBRUARY 25, 2019 ORDER REGARDING CASE REVIEW PROCESS (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2019
7 7 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Fri 09/20 3:12 PM
NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE re6 Case Transferred In - District Transfer (mailed to atty, Shayna Sacks) (djb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 252 Order
6 6 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Fri 09/20 2:47 PM
Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-08142. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs order Order Fri 09/20 9:18 AM
CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Northern District of Florida. (Signed by MDL Panel on 9/11/2019) (sjo)
Related: [-]
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Northern District of Florida. (sjo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/20/2019.]
Related: [-]
transfer Case Transferred Out - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Fri 09/20 9:19 AM
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Northern District of Florida. (sjo)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2019
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 11/5/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 14A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Fletcher, Donnie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/20/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2019
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-08140-JGK. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/20/2019.]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John G. Koeltl. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/20/2019.]
Related: [-]
Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/20/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2019
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/20/2019.]
Related: [-]
Case Designated ECF. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/20/2019.]
Related: [-]
CASE REFERRED TO Judge John G. Koeltl as possibly related to 1:19cv8140 (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/20/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2019
4 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.(Stern, Mitchell) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/20/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-8140. Document filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.(Stern, Mitchell) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/20/2019.]
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Stern, Mitchell) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/20/2019.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 158054/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17524127).Document filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.(Stern, Mitchell) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/20/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service