Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Brian C Wimes
Referred: David P Rush
Case #: 6:19-cv-03337
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause18:241 Conspiracy Against Citizen Rights
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2019
Terminated:Dec 06, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 17, 2020 3:45 AM CDT
Defendant
Kevin Lowe
Defendant
Kenneth Voss
Represented By
Danett L Padgett
Modot- Chief Counsel'S Office
contact info
Scott Truman Sergent
Scott Sergent
contact info
Terri L. Parker
Missouri Highway & Transportation Commission
contact info
Defendant
Tim Smith
Represented By
Christopher Hoeman
City Of Springfield, Mo.
contact info
Defendant
Dan Smith
Represented By
Christopher Hoeman
City Of Springfield, Mo.
contact info
Defendant
John C Russell
Represented By
William F. Ford
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Taryn A Nash
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Defendant
Brandon R. Parrish
Defendant
Brad R. Parrish
Defendant
Miles Parks
Represented By
Christopher Hoeman
City Of Springfield, Mo.
contact info
Defendant
John Parham
Represented By
William F. Ford
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Taryn A Nash
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Defendant
Andrew Mueller
Represented By
Danett L Padgett
Modot- Chief Counsel'S Office
contact info
Scott Truman Sergent
Scott Sergent
contact info
Terri L. Parker
Missouri Highway & Transportation Commission
contact info
Defendant
Richard Moore
Represented By
Danett L Padgett
Modot- Chief Counsel'S Office
contact info
Scott Truman Sergent
Scott Sergent
contact info
Terri L. Parker
Missouri Highway & Transportation Commission
contact info
Defendant
Michael Meinkoth
Represented By
Danett L Padgett
Modot- Chief Counsel'S Office
contact info
Scott Truman Sergent
Scott Sergent
contact info
Terri L. Parker
Missouri Highway & Transportation Commission
contact info
Defendant
Bree McMurray
Represented By
Danett L Padgett
Modot- Chief Counsel'S Office
contact info
Scott Truman Sergent
Scott Sergent
contact info
Terri L. Parker
Missouri Highway & Transportation Commission
contact info
Defendant
Natasha Longpine
Represented By
Joseph Taylor White
Kutak Rock Llp - Springfield
contact info
Defendant
Kirk Juranas
Represented By
Christopher Hoeman
City Of Springfield, Mo.
contact info
Defendant
Adam Humphrey
Represented By
William F. Ford
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Taryn A Nash
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Defendant
Nicole Forir
Defendant
Matt Forir
Represented By
William F. Ford
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Taryn A Nash
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sara Fields
Represented By
Joseph Taylor White
Kutak Rock Llp - Springfield
contact info
Defendant
Bob Dixon
Represented By
William F. Ford
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Taryn A Nash
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Defendant
Kimberly Cooper
Represented By
Joseph Taylor White
Kutak Rock Llp - Springfield
contact info
Defendant
Robert (Bob) Cirtin
Represented By
William F. Ford
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Taryn A Nash
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Defendant
Harold Bengsch
Represented By
William F. Ford
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Taryn A Nash
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jeff Avers
Represented By
William F. Ford
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Taryn A Nash
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Defendant
Rick Artman
Represented By
William F. Ford
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Taryn A Nash
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Gilbert Louis Mobley
5110 S. Woodfield Place
Springfield, MO 65810


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, December 06, 2019
68 68 1 pgs order Clerk's Judgment Fri 12/06 12:33 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff this date. (Baldwin, Joella)
Related: [-]
67 67 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 12/06 12:31 PM
IT IS ORDERED Defendants motions to dismiss (Doc. #38) are GRANTED. It is further ORDERED this case is dismissed for lack of standing under Article III of the Constitution. Copy of order mailed to pro se plaintiff this date. Signed on 12/6/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2019
66 66 service Return of Service of Complaint Unexecuted Wed 12/04 1:25 PM
Return of Service unexecuted by Gilbert Louis Mobley as to Robert (Bob) Cirtin. (Mobley, Gilbert)
Related: [-]
65 65 service Return of Service of Complaint Executed Wed 12/04 1:23 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Gilbert Louis Mobley. Matt Forir served on 10/13/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Mobley, Gilbert)
Related: [-]
64 64 service Return of Service of Complaint Executed Wed 12/04 1:21 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Gilbert Louis Mobley. Tim Smith served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019. (Mobley, Gilbert)
Related: [-]
63 63 service Return of Service of Complaint Executed Wed 12/04 1:18 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Gilbert Louis Mobley. Bob Dixon served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Mobley, Gilbert)
Related: [-]
62 62 service Return of Service of Complaint Executed Wed 12/04 1:16 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Gilbert Louis Mobley. Harold Bengsch served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Mobley, Gilbert)
Related: [-]
61 61 service Return of Service of Complaint Executed Wed 12/04 1:15 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Gilbert Louis Mobley. Rick Artman served on 10/18/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Mobley, Gilbert)
Related: [-]
60 60 service Return of Service of Complaint Executed Wed 12/04 1:12 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Gilbert Louis Mobley. Jeff Avers served on 10/18/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Mobley, Gilbert)
Related: [-]
59 59 service Return of Service of Complaint Executed Wed 12/04 11:36 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Gilbert Louis Mobley. John Parham served on 10/18/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Mobley, Gilbert)
Related: [-]
58 58 service Return of Service of Complaint Executed Wed 12/04 11:27 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Gilbert Louis Mobley. Adam Humphrey served on 10/18/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Mobley, Gilbert)
Related: [-]
57 57 service Return of Service of Complaint Executed Wed 12/04 11:14 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Gilbert Louis Mobley. John C Russell served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019. (Mobley, Gilbert)
Related: [-]
56 56 service Return of Service of Complaint Executed Wed 12/04 10:27 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Gilbert Louis Mobley. Natasha Longpine served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Mobley, Gilbert)
Related: [-]
55 55 service Return of Service of Complaint Executed Wed 12/04 9:42 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Gilbert Louis Mobley. Sara Fields served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Mobley, Gilbert)
Related: [-]
54 54 service Return of Service of Complaint Executed Wed 12/04 9:27 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Gilbert Louis Mobley. Kimberly Cooper served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Mobley, Gilbert)
Related: [-]