Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:19-cr-02429
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Sep 21, 2019 12:16 AM MST
Defendant
Juan Carlos Barragan-Pesqueira (2)
Defendant
Nyghdra Chetara Foster (1)
Represented By
Jay V Sagar
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info
Christopher Legrand Scileppi
Law Offices Of Christopher L Scileppi PC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Renda Cook Maginnis
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/21/2019 1:21 AM MST
Monday, August 26, 2019
Arrest of Nyghdra Chetara Foster, Juan Carlos Barragan-Pesqueira on 8/25/2019. (SIB) [4:19-mj-02211-N/A-JR]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Nyghdra Chetara Foster, Juan Carlos Barragan-Pesqueira. (SIB) [4:19-mj-02211-N/A-JR]
Related: [-]
4 4 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald: Initial Appearance as to Nyghdra Chetara Foster held on 8/26/2019. FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT TAKEN. Renda Cook Maginnis is assigned counsel for USA. Jay V Sagar is appointed counsel for Nyghdra Chetara Foster with Appointment Type: AFPD. Defendant(s) state true name to be the same. Government's motion for detention and request for continuance of the Detention Hearing is granted. Defense counsel's objections are noted for the record. Defendant temporarily detained in the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Appearances : AUSA Fredrick Cocio, duty for the Government, AFPD Jorge Leo Costales, duty for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Detention Hearing set for 8/28/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald. Preliminary Hearing set for 8/28/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald. Related [+] Hearing held 3:10 pm to 4:20 pm. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BHA) [4:19-mj-02211-N/A-JR]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
Tuesday, August 27, 2019
2 2 SEALED CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Nyghdra Chetara Foster. (KAH) [4:19-mj-02211-N/A-JR]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2019
7 7 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald: Preliminary Hearing as to Nyghdra Chetara Foster waived on 8/28/2019. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. Detention Hearing as to Nyghdra Chetara Foster continued on 8/28/2019. Pretrial Services recommends detention. The Government concurs. Defense counsel requests that Defendant be assessed for treatment at The Haven and moves to continued the matter to 9/13/19. The Court grants defense counsel's request and continues the matter to allow Pretrial Services time to assess the Defendant for possible placement at a treatment facility. Appearances : AUSA Renda Maginnis for the Government, AFPD Jay Sagar for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Detention Hearing continued to 9/13/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich. Related [+] Hearing held 10:30 AM to 11:07 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SIB) [4:19-mj-02211-N/A-JR]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
Tuesday, September 03, 2019
9 9 NOTICE OF INTENT TO DESTROY CONTRABAND by USA as to Nyghdra Chetara Foster, Juan Carlos Barragan-Pesqueira. (Maginnis, Renda) [4:19-mj-02211-N/A-JR]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2019
10 10 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to attorney Jay V. Sagar by Nyghdra Chetara Foster. (Sagar, Jay) [4:19-mj-02211-N/A-JR]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2019
11 11 ORDER that the10 Motion to Withdraw As Counsel of Record as to Defendant Nyghdra Chetara Foster is granted and Christopher Scileppi is appointed as Counsel of record for Defendant in the place and stead of Jay V. Sagar, Assistant Federal Public Defender. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M Rateau on 9/9/2019.(ARC) [4:19-mj-02211-N/A-JR]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2019
13 13 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich: Detention Hearing as to Nyghdra Chetara Foster held on 9/13/2019. Pretrial Services recommends detention and the Government concurs. Defense counsel argues for release or in the alternative, for Pretrial Services to assess the Defendant for inpatient treatment. The Court states its findings on the record and the Defendant is ordered detained pending Trial. Appearances : AUSA, Angela Woolridge, attorney on duty for the Government; CJA Attorney, Christopher Scileppi for Defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Interpreter N/A. Related [+] Hearing held 10:34 AM to 11:18 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CXE) [4:19-mj-02211-N/A-JR]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
Monday, September 16, 2019
14 14 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Nyghdra Chetara Foster. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eric J. Markovich on 9/13/2019.(CXE) [4:19-mj-02211-N/A-JR]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2019
15 15 APPEAL FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE DETENTION ORDER as to Nyghdra Chetara Foster re:14 Order of Detention. (Scileppi, Christopher) [4:19-mj-02211-N/A-JR]
Related: [-]
16 16 NOTICE OF DISTRICT JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Judge Rosemary Marquez re:15 Appeal from Magistrate Judge Detention or Release Order. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAR) [4:19-mj-02211-N/A-JR]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2019
17 17 ORDER as to Nyghdra Chetara Foster re:15 Appeal from Magistrate Judge Detention or Release Order. Hearing is set for 10/1/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5A, 405 West Congress Street, Tucson, AZ 85701 before Judge Rosemary Marquez. It is further ordered that Defendant may file materials in support of her appeal on or before September 23, 2019. The Government's response deadline is September 27, 2019. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 9/17/2019.(BAR) [4:19-mj-02211-N/A-JR]
Related: [-]
18 18 INDICTMENT Related [+] as to Nyghdra Chetara Foster (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Juan Carlos Barragan-Pesqueira (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4. *As to defendant (1) ONLY- Arraignment set for 10/4/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich. TRIAL date is 11/13/2019 at 9:30 AM, PLEA DEADLINE set 10/25/2019. NOTE: Notice of Intent to waive Defendant's Presence at Arraignment shall be filed not later than Wednesday prior to arraignment. (ARC)
Related: [-] dacted for Public Disclosure
21 21 SEALED UNREDACTED INDICTMENT as to Nyghdra Chetara Foster, Juan Carlos Barragan-Pesqueira. (ADI-MFR, )
Related: [-]