Arizona District Court
Judge:David G Campbell
Case #: 2:14-cv-00533
Nature of Suit450 Other Statutes - Commerce
Cause49:14706 Carmack Amendment to the Interstate Commerce Act
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2014
Terminated:Oct 27, 2014
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 21, 2015 1:27 PM MST
Defendant
TCH Carriers LLC
Plaintiff
Knight Brokerage LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey R Simmons
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Cassandra K Gaines
Global Tranz Enterprises Incorporated
contact info
Cassandra Lyn Kalaf
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM MST
Tuesday, March 08, 2016
17 17 order Writ of Garnishment Tue 03/08 12:57 PM
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND SUMMONS issued; Garnishee: Sutter Insurance Company. (Note: Original Certified Writ will be available at Customer Service until 2:30 PM, after 2:30 PM the writ will be mailed to counsel.) (KMG)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 07, 2016
16 16 misc Application for Writ Mon 03/07 1:05 PM
APPLICATION for Writ of of Garnishment (non-earnings) by Knight Brokerage LLC.(Maurer, Julie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, December 02, 2014
15 15 misc Costs Taxed Tue 12/02 4:12 PM
Taxation Judgment in amount of $448.32 against defendant. Signed by Chief Deputy Clerk Michael O'Brien on 12/02/14. (CSL)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 10, 2014
14 14 BILL OF COSTS by Knight Brokerage LLC.(Booth, Venus)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Supporting documentation
Monday, October 27, 2014
13 13 ORDER AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT - Plaintiff's motion for default judgment (Doc.11 ) is granted. Default judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant TCH Carriers, LLC in the principle sum of $221,575.35 plus pre-judgment interest from March 7, 2013 at a rate of 0.09 until the date of this judgment, and post-judgment interest at a rate of 0.09 from the date of this judgment until the judgment is paid in full. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/27/2014. (KMG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 10, 2014
12 12 STATUS REPORT by Knight Brokerage LLC. (Simmons, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
11 11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to TCH Carriers by Knight Brokerage LLC.(Simmons, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Default Judgment
Tuesday, September 09, 2014
10 10 ORDER that counsel for the plaintiff shall file a status report within 14 days of the date of this order concerning the status of this case. ORDERED directing the Clerk of the Court to terminate this matter without further order of this Court if plaintiff fails to comply by September 23, 2014. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/9/2014. (LFIG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2014
9 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to TCH Carriers LLC. (KMG)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2014
8 8 APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Knight Brokerage LLC against TCH Carriers, LLC.(Simmons, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Entry of Default of TCH Carriers, LLC,
Att: 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Jeffrey R. Simmons in Support of Application for Entry of Default
Friday, March 21, 2014
7 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Knight Brokerage LLC: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement of Knight Brokerage, LLC upon TCH Carriers, LLC on 03/17/2014. (Simmons, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2014
6 6 ORDER. Motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/14/2014. (DGC, nvo)
Related: [-]
5 5 Summons Issued as to TCH Carriers LLC. (REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
Related: [-]
4 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX 0970-10226900. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 14-00533 PHX-DGC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
Related: [-]
3 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Knight Brokerage LLC identifying Corporate Parent Knight Transportation Incorporated, Corporate Parent Knight Transportation Services Incorporated for Knight Brokerage LLC. (submitted by Jeffrey Simmons) (REK)
Related: [-]
2 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Knight Brokerage LLC. (submitted by Jeffrey Simmons) (REK)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number PHX 0970-10226900 filed by Knight Brokerage LLC. (submitted by Jeffrey Simmons)(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet