Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02734

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-03545
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Sep 24, 2019
Case in other court:New York Southern, 1:19-cv-08148
Last checked: Sunday Mar 22, 2020 5:57 AM EDT
Defendant
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By
MITCHELL RUSSELL STERN
Arnold & Porter Llp - New York Ny
contact info
Defendant
OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Defendant
OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Plaintiff
JULIANN DOSSANTOS
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Kirtland & Packard Llp - El Segundo Ca
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, July 17, 2020
15 15 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 07/17 1:01 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (CAMPBELL, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2020
14 14 service Summons Reissued Thu 02/20 3:30 PM
Summons Reissued as to OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (djb)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Thu 02/20 11:35 AM
NOTICE Notice of Filing Summons to Issue by JULIANN DOSSANTOS (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2020
12 12 service Summons Issued Tue 02/18 11:05 AM
Summons Issued as to BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC. (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2020
11 11 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Thu 01/30 3:39 PM
NOTICE Notice of Filing Summons to Issue by JULIANN DOSSANTOS (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Monday, January 06, 2020
10 10 service Summons Issued Mon 01/06 2:38 PM
Summons Issued as to BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2020
9 9 cmp Complaint Fri 01/03 4:30 PM
COMPLAINT against BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD, filed by JULIANN DOSSANTOS. (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons BMS,
Att: 3 Summons Ot Am,
Att: 4 Summons Ot Ph
Tuesday, October 22, 2019
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Tue 10/22 7:22 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:8 ATTORNEY CERTIFICATION FOR FEBRUARY 25, 2019 ORDER REGARDING CASE REVIEW PROCESS (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2019
8 8 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Mon 10/21 4:28 PM
NOTICE of ATTORNEY CERTIFICATION FOR FEBRUARY 25, 2019 ORDER REGARDING CASE REVIEW PROCESS by JULIANN DOSSANTOS (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2019
7 7 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 09/24 7:44 AM
NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION re6 Case Transferred In - District Transfer (mailed to atty, Shayna E Sacks) (djb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 252 Order
6 6 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Tue 09/24 7:33 AM
Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-08148. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2019
5 5 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Northern District of Florida. (Signed by MDL Panel on 9/11/2019) (sjo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2019.]
Related: [-]
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Northern District of Florida. (sjo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2019
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 11/5/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 14A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Fletcher, Donnie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2019
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-08140-JGK. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2019.]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John G. Koeltl. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2019.]
Related: [-]
Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2019
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2019.]
Related: [-]
Case Designated ECF. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2019.]
Related: [-]
CASE REFERRED TO Judge John G. Koeltl as possibly related to 1:19cv8140 (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2019
4 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.(Stern, Mitchell) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-8140. Document filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.(Stern, Mitchell) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2019.]
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Stern, Mitchell) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2019.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 158055/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17524616).Document filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.(Stern, Mitchell) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/24/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service