Nassau University Medical Center v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45812 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Sep 24, 2019 |
Case in other court: | New York Eastern, 2:19-cv-04972 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:24 PM EST |
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
RHODES TECHNOLOGIES
|
|
Defendant
RITE AID OF MARYLAND, INC,
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
3411 Silverside Road
Wilmington, DE 19180 |
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
The Kroger Co.
|
|
Defendant
The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Co
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Eastern Co. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Anda Inc
|
|
Defendant
Stuart D. Baker
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
HD Smith Wholesale Drug Co
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Miami-Luken Inc
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Nassau University Medical Center
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/30/2019 11:18 AM EDT |
Friday, August 30, 2019 | ||
FILING FEE: $400, receipt number ANYEDC-11807444 (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from nyed on 9/24/2019.] | ||
1 | 1 311 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by Nassau University Medical Center. (Rodin, Deanna) Modified on 9/6/2019 (Rodin, Deanna). [Transferred from nyed on 9/24/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons | ||
Friday, September 06, 2019 | ||
Incorrect Document Entry Information. Defendants were added to the case incorrectly; docket entry 1 was deleted and re-entered against corrected defendants. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from nyed on 9/24/2019.] | ||
Proposed summonses are rejected; the caption on the summonses do not match the caption of the complaint; specifically, if you use "et al" you must attach a rider; the Clerk's Office cannot issue the summonses with an incorrect caption. Counsel is advised to submit completed proposed summonses using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from nyed on 9/24/2019.] | ||
Case Assigned to Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from nyed on 9/24/2019.] | ||
2 | 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Rodin, Deanna). [Transferred from nyed on 9/24/2019.] | |
Att: 1 (9/6/2019) Additional Corrections | ||
3 | 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) [Transferred from nyed on 9/24/2019.] | |
4 | 4 Proposed Summons. by Nassau University Medical Center (Kassan, Randi) [Transferred from nyed on 9/24/2019.] | |
Thursday, September 19, 2019 | ||
Case transferred to District of Northern District of Ohio. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from nyed on 9/24/2019.] | ||
5 | 5 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order CTO-111: Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. § 1407 to the Northern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the order of December 5, 2017, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from nyed on 9/24/2019.] | |
6 | 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Almonte, Giselle) [Transferred from nyed on 9/24/2019.] | |
7 | 7 CERTIFIED COPY OF JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order CTO-111: Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. § 1407 to the Northern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the order of December 5, 2017, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from nyed on 9/24/2019.] | |
Tuesday, September 24, 2019 | ||
8 | 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New York Eastern. Case number 2:19-cv-04972. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |